This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/24/2021 at 06:13:30 (UTC).

Constr. Industry and Laborers Joint Pension Trust v. Carbonite, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 Constr Industry and Laborers Joint Pension Trust filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Carbonite, Inc ,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2110

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RUBEN A. LUNA, individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated

WILLIAM FENG, individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated

VALERIE COSGROVE, derivatively on behalf of CARBONITE, INC.

MICHAEL RANDOLPH, derivatively on behalf of CARBONITE, INC.

Defendants

LINDA CONNLY

MARINA LEVINSON

CHARLES F. KANE

TODD KRASNOW

DAVID FRIEND

SCOTT A. DANIELS

STEPHEN MUNFORD

Defendant / Appellees

ANTHONY FOLGER

MOHAMAD S. ALI

CARBONITE, INC.

Interested Parties

CAMELOT EVENT DRIVEN FUND, A Series of Frank Funds Trust

TOM JOHNATAN OR-PAZ

PETER WU

PEORIA POLICE PENSION FUND

Plaintiff / Appellant

CONSTRUCTION INDUSTRY AND LABORERS JOINT PENSION TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party and Plaintiff Attorneys

Shannon L. Hopkins

Attorney at Levi & Korsinsky LLP

1111 Summer St, Ste 403

Stamford, CT 06905

Theodore Michael Hess-Mahan

Attorney at Hutchings Barsamian Mandelcorn LLP

110 Cedar St, Ste 250

Wellesely Hills, MA 02481-0000

Daryl DeValerio Andrews

Attorney at Andrews DeValerio LLP

Po Box 67101

Chestnut Hill, MA 02110

Michael Ira Fistel Jr.

Attorney at Johnson Fistel LLP

40 Powder Springs St

Marietta, GA 30064

Joseph P. Calandrelli

Attorney at O'Connor Carnathan & Mack LLC

1 Van De Graaff Dr, Landmark One, Ste 104

Burlington, MA 01803-0000

Guillaume Buell

Attorney at Thornton Law Firm LLP

1 Lincoln St

Boston, MA 02111

Leslie R. Stern

Attorney at Berman Tabacco

1 Liberty Sq, 8Th Flr

Boston, MA 02109

Defendant / Appellee and Defendant Attorneys

Alisha Q. Nanda

Attorney at Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

500 Boylston St, 23Rd Flr

Boston, MA 02116-0000

James R. Carroll

Attorney at Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

500 Boylston St, 23Rd Flr

Boston, MA 02116-0000

Immanuel Foster

Attorney at Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

500 Boylston St, 23Rd Flr

Boston, MA 02116-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert D. Gerson

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

58 S Service Rd, Ste 200

Melville, NY 11747

Andrew Love

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

1 Montgomery St, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94104

Theodore Michael Hess-Mahan

Attorney at Hutchings Barsamian Mandelcorn LLP

110 Cedar St, Ste 250

Wellesely Hills, MA 02481-0000

David Avi Rosenfeld

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

58 S Service Rd, Ste 200

Melville, NY 11747

Samuel Howard Rudman

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

58 S Service Rd, Ste 200

Melville, NY 11747

Philip Thomas Merenda III

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

58 S Service Rd, Ste 200

Melville, NY 11747

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Electronic Record

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #1

Appellant's Briefing Notice

Open Document #2

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document

Open Document

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Construction Industry and Laborers Joint Pension Trust. Brief due February 24, 2021 for appellant Construction Industry and Laborers Joint Pension Trust. Appendix due 02/24/2021 for appellant Construction Industry and Laborers Joint Pension Trust. [20-2110] (AL) [Entered: 12/23/2020 06:48 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Construction Industry and Laborers Joint Pension Trust. Certificate of service dated 12/21/2020. [20-2110] (AL) [Entered: 12/21/2020 04:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 01/25/2021 for appellant Construction Industry and Laborers Joint Pension Trust. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [20-2110] (AL) [Entered: 12/15/2020 10:44 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. After 12/29/2020, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Robert D. Gerson and Philip T. Merenda for Construction Industry and Laborers Joint Pension Trust. [20-2110] (AL) [Entered: 12/15/2020 08:52 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Construction Industry and Laborers Joint Pension Trust indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 12/14/2020. [20-2110] (AL) [Entered: 12/14/2020 12:09 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Construction Industry and Laborers Joint Pension Trust. Certificate of service dated 12/14/2020. [20-2110] (AL) [Entered: 12/14/2020 12:08 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Carbonite, Inc., Mohamad S. Ali and Anthony Folger filed by Attorney Immanuel R. Foster. Certificate of service dated 12/11/2020. [20-2110] (IF) [Entered: 12/11/2020 12:49 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Carbonite, Inc., Mohamad S. Ali and Anthony Folger filed by Attorney Alisha Q. Nanda. Certificate of service dated 12/11/2020. [20-2110] (AQN) [Entered: 12/11/2020 12:46 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Carbonite, Inc., Mohamad S. Ali and Anthony Folger filed by Attorney James R. Carroll. Certificate of service dated 12/11/2020. [20-2110] (JRC) [Entered: 12/11/2020 12:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Construction Industry and Laborers Joint Pension Trust filed by Attorney Andrew S. Love. Certificate of service dated 12/01/2020. [20-2110] (AL) [Entered: 12/01/2020 07:01 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #66) filed by Appellant Construction Industry and Laborers Joint Pension Trust. Docketing Statement due 12/14/2020. Transcript Report/Order form due 12/14/2020. Appearance form due 12/14/2020. [20-2110] (AL) [Entered: 11/30/2020 12:57 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Carbonite, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Peoria Police Pension Fund is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daryl DeValerio Andrews