This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:04:54 (UTC).

Luna Distributing LLC v. Stoli Group USA LLC

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Luna Distributing LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Stoli Group USA LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-55813

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

STOLI GROUP USA LLC

Plaintiff / Appellant

LUNA DISTRIBUTING LLC, a California Limited Liability Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Cyndie M. Chang Esquire

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

865 South Figueroa Street, Suite 3100

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5450

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Michael Mogan

Attorney at Law Office of Michael Mogan P.C.

4470 W. Sunset Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90027

 

Court Documents

1 #3

Mediaiton Questionnaire Instructions

1 #2

Mediation Letter

#7

(#7) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. The briefing schedule previously established by the court remains in effect. [11424788] (LW) [Entered: 09/09/2019 10:52 AM]

#6

(#6) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - Assessment Conference, 08/28/2019, 2:30 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11375668] (LW) [Entered: 07/24/2019 03:42 PM]

#4

(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellant Luna Distributing LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/22/2019. [11371547] [19-55813] (Mogan, Michael) [Entered: 07/22/2019 12:21 PM]

1 #6

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

#1

Docketing Letter

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2019
  • (#9) Streamlined request [8] by Appellant Luna Distributing LLC to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Luna Distributing LLC opening brief due 10/15/2019. Appellee Stoli Group USA LLC answering brief due 11/14/2019. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11426163] (DLM) [Entered: 09/10/2019 08:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • (#8) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Luna Distributing LLC. New requested due date is 10/15/2019. [11426008] [19-55813] (Mogan, Michael) [Entered: 09/09/2019 05:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. The briefing schedule previously established by the court remains in effect. [11424788] (LW) [Entered: 09/09/2019 10:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - Assessment Conference, 08/28/2019, 2:30 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11375668] (LW) [Entered: 07/24/2019 03:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#5) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 07/22/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11371580][19-55813] (AD) [Entered: 07/22/2019 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed (ECF) Appellant Luna Distributing LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/22/2019. [11371547] [19-55813] (Mogan, Michael) [Entered: 07/22/2019 12:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • (#3) Attorney Rolando Javellana Tong in 19-55813 substituted by Attorney Michael Mogan in 19-55813 [11366683] (CW) [Entered: 07/17/2019 01:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Michael Scott Mogan (Law Office Of Michael Mogan PC) for Appellant Luna Distributing LLC. Substitution for Attorney Rolando Javellana Tong for Appellant Luna Distributing LLC. Date of service: 07/17/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11366645] [19-55813] (Mogan, Michael) [Entered: 07/17/2019 01:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/23/2019. Appellant Luna Distributing LLC opening brief due 09/13/2019. Appellee Stoli Group USA LLC answering brief due 10/15/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11365084] (RT) [Entered: 07/16/2019 12:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.