Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/12/2021 at 06:12:05 (UTC).

Lula Taylor v. Julia Kelety, et al

Case Summary

On 06/04/2021 Lula Taylor filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Julia Kelety. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-55584

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

DOES 1-20

JULIA CRAIG KELETY, individually and in her official Capacity as a Judge

SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, for the County of San Diego

TRACEY D. RYMAL, individually and in her appointed official Capacity as Administer to the Estate of Nick Martino, AKA Tracey D. Martino

JOHN J. STIFTER, IV

JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA

STIFTER LAW CORP

Plaintiff / Appellant

LULA TAYLOR, individually and as surviving spouse and successor-in-interest to the Estate of Nick Martino, AKA Lula Mae Tylor-Martino, AKA Lula Mae Zambito-Martino

Reno, NV 89511

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Matthew L. Green

Attorney at Best Best & Krieger LLP

655 West Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101

John J. Stifter Esquire

Attorney at Stifter Law Corp

1181 Puerta Del Sol, Suite 100

San Clemente, CA 92673

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Lula Taylor

8175 S. Virginia St.

Reno, NV 89511

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Filed Appellant Lula Taylor motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 05/31/2021. [12134707] (WL) [Entered: 06/04/2021 04:29 PM]

1 #4

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed Appellant Lula Taylor motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 05/31/2021. [12134707] (WL) [Entered: 06/04/2021 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Lula Taylor opening brief due 08/02/2021. Appellees Does 1-20, Judicial Council of California, Julia Craig Kelety, Tracey D. Rymal, John J. Stifter, Stifter Law Corp and Superior Court of California answering brief due 09/01/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12134690] (WL) [Entered: 06/04/2021 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant