This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:05:47 (UTC).

Lukely Riley v. Governor of the State of Fl., et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Lukely Riley filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Governor of the State of Fl . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-12679

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

GOVERNOR OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA

SECRETARY, DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

Plaintiff / Appellant

LUKELY RILEY

Florida City, FL 33034-6409

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Dade CI Warden

Attorney at Dade CI - Inmate Trust Fund

19000 Sw 377Th St

Florida City, FL 33034-6409

Lukely Riley

Attorney at Dade CI - Inmate Legal Mail

19000 Sw 377Th St

Florida City, FL 33034-6409

 

Court Documents

Open Document #3

DC Order accepting R&R Doc 50

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Party Lukely Riley. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:55 PM]

Open Document #2

PLRA Prisoner Case Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document

This APPELLANT has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required filing fee has been received or a motion for relief from the obligation to pay in advance is filed in the District Court. The appellant is being served with this letter. [Entered: 08/06/2019 11:52 AM]

Open Document #1

PLRA-5 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

USDC Order denying Motion on Fees (PLRA)

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #4

DC R&R Doc 46

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Lukely Riley. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 08/01/2019 11:46 AM]

Open Document #5

DC Judgment Doc 51

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • USDC Order Denying appellant Leave to Proceed with Fees NOT Assessed. Filed on 08/29/2019. Docket Entry 59. [Entered: 09/06/2019 10:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • This APPELLANT has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required filing fee has been received or a motion for relief from the obligation to pay in advance is filed in the District Court. The appellant is being served with this letter. [Entered: 08/06/2019 11:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Lukely Riley. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 08/01/2019 11:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Party Lukely Riley. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRISONER (PLRA) APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Lukely Riley on 07/15/2019. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 07/18/2019 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.