This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2021 at 05:15:02 (UTC).

Luis Galvez v. western Refining Retail, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 10/20/2021 Luis Galvez filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against western Refining Retail, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-56155

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

 

Party Details

Defendants

WESTERN REFINING SOUTHWEST, INC., an Arizona corporation

WESTERN REFINING, INC., a Delaware corporation

DOES, 1 through 20, inclusive

Plaintiff / Appellant

LUIS POLO GALVEZ, an individual

Defendant / Appellee

WESTERN REFINING RETAIL, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Ramin R. Younessi Esquire

Attorney at Law Office of Ramin R. Younessi A.P.L.C.

3435 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Laura M. Booth

Attorney at SHOOK HARDY & BACON LLP

5 Park Plaza, Suite 1600

Irvine, CA 92614

Matt Light

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP

2049 Century Park, E, Suite 3000

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Luis Polo Galvez Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/27/2021. Appellant Luis Polo Galvez opening brief due 12/20/2021. Appellee western Refining Retail, LLC answering brief due 01/20/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12263322] (RT) [Entered: 10/20/2021 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Western Refining, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Western Refining Retail LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matt Light

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laura M Booth