This case was last updated from PACER on 06/08/2019 at 06:11:09 (UTC).

Luis Cano v. USA

Case Summary

On 04/09/2019 Luis Cano filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-11369

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Petitioner / Appellant

LUIS H. CANO

Terre Haute, IN 47808

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Carol Herman

Attorney at U.S. Attorney Service - SFL

99 Ne 4Th St 5Th Fl

Miami, FL 33132-2111

Emily M. Smachetti

Attorney at U.S. Attorney Service - SFL

99 Ne 4Th St 5Th Fl

Miami, FL 33132-2111

U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Florida

Attorney at U.S. Attorney Service - SFL

99 Ne 4Th St 5Th Fl

Miami, FL 33132-2111

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Luis H. Cano

Attorney at FCI Terre Haute - Inmate Legal Mail

Po Box 33

Terre Haute, IN 47808

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Appeal clerically reinstated as to Appellant Luis H. Cano because appeal was erroneously dismissed on 05/29/2019. The appeal was dismissed on 5/29/19 for failure to file the brief. A motion for extension and the brief were received on 5/31/19. Service date of the brief is 5/20/19, the brief is therefore timely. [Entered: 06/03/2019 02:37 PM]

Open Document

Appellant's brief filed by Luis H. Cano. Service date: 05/20/2019 [19-11369] Attorney for Appellee: Herman - email; Attorney for Appellee: Smachetti - email; Attorney for Appellee: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Florida - email. [Entered: 06/03/2019 02:46 PM]

Open Document #2

MOT-11 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #1

Motion or Document Returned Unfiled

Open Document

ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R. 42-2(c), this appeal is hereby DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Luis H. Cano has failed to file an appellant's brief within the time fixed by the rules [Entered: 05/29/2019 01:47 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Luis H. Cano. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 05/29/2019 11:04 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Luis H. Cano. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 05/13/2019 11:52 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Luis H. Cano. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 04/25/2019 02:18 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Emily M. Smachetti for USA Ariana Fajardo Orshan.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11369] (ECF: Emily Smachetti) [Entered: 04/22/2019 03:20 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Carol Herman for USA [19-11369] (ECF: Carol Herman) [Entered: 04/22/2019 10:04 AM]

Open Document

USDC order granting IFP as to Appellant Luis H. Cano was filed on 02/06/2019. Docket Entry 17. [Entered: 04/17/2019 10:23 AM]

Open Document #3

USDC Order- Doc #21

Open Document #2

Habeas Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appeal clerically reinstated as to Appellant Luis H. Cano because appeal was erroneously dismissed on 05/29/2019. The appeal was dismissed on 5/29/19 for failure to file the brief. A motion for extension and the brief were received on 5/31/19. Service date of the brief is 5/20/19, the brief is therefore timely. [Entered: 06/03/2019 02:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's brief filed by Luis H. Cano. Service date: 05/20/2019 [19-11369] Attorney for Appellee: Herman - email; Attorney for Appellee: Smachetti - email; Attorney for Appellee: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Florida - email. [Entered: 06/03/2019 02:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED UNFILED: Motion for enlargement of time filed by Luis H. Cano is returned as unnecessary. [Entered: 06/03/2019 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R. 42-2(c), this appeal is hereby DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Luis H. Cano has failed to file an appellant's brief within the time fixed by the rules [Entered: 05/29/2019 01:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Luis H. Cano. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 05/29/2019 11:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Luis H. Cano. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 05/13/2019 11:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Luis H. Cano. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 04/25/2019 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Emily M. Smachetti for USA Ariana Fajardo Orshan.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11369] (ECF: Emily Smachetti) [Entered: 04/22/2019 03:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Carol Herman for USA [19-11369] (ECF: Carol Herman) [Entered: 04/22/2019 10:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • USDC order granting IFP as to Appellant Luis H. Cano was filed on 02/06/2019. Docket Entry 17. [Entered: 04/17/2019 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HABEAS APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Luis H. Cano on 04/08/2019 04/09/2019. Fee Status: IFP Granted. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 04/17/2019 10:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.