Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/16/2020 at 06:20:14 (UTC).

Lucretia Scott v. David Salyers, et al

Case Summary

On 03/17/2020 Lucretia Scott filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against David Salyers. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1555

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

John Doe 3, an individual

John Doe 2

John Doe, I

David Salyers, an individual

Terry Wallers, an individual

Sandra Jernigan, an individual

Lloyd Gouveia, an individual

Gregory Kase, an individual

Doe Source of Unknown Technology

Steve Howe

Plaintiff / Appellant

Lucretia Scott, an individual

Keokuk, IA 52632

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Lucretia Scott

111 S. Second Street

Keokuk, IA 52632

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Judgment: Judge Directed

Open Document #1

Cover Letter

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document #1

Motion for appointment of counsel

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document #1

Motion for extension of time to file brief

Open Document

BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: If the original file of the U.S. District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with 8th Circuit Local Rule 30A (a)(2), the clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Lucretia Scott due 04/27/2020. [4892338] [20-1555] (CAH) [Entered: 03/17/2020 03:09 PM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, order 2/6/20, order 3/6/20. [4892336] [20-1555] (CAH) [Entered: 03/17/2020 03:07 PM]

Open Document

Civil case docketed. [4892328] [20-1555] (CAH) [Entered: 03/17/2020 02:58 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT FILED - This case is summarily affirmed in accordance with Eighth Circuit Rule 47A.; Appellant's [ # 4905140-2 ] & [ # 4905136-2 ] motions for appointment of counsel and for extension of time to file the brief are denied as moot. RAYMOND W. GRUENDER, BOBBY E. SHEPHERD and JANE KELLY Adp Apr 2020 [4910725] [20-1555] (HAG) [Entered: 05/07/2020 09:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketCASE SUBMITTED Ad Panel Submission before Judges Raymond W. Gruender, Bobby E. Shepherd, Jane Kelly in St. Louis [4910721] [20-1555] (HAG) [Entered: 05/07/2020 09:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for appointment of counsel, filed by Appellant Ms. Lucretia Scott w/service by USCA8 04/21/2020. [4905140] [20-1555] (HAG) [Entered: 04/21/2020 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for extension of time to file brief, filed by Appellant Ms. Lucretia Scott w/service by USCA8 04/21/2020. [4905136] [20-1555] (HAG) [Entered: 04/21/2020 01:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: If the original file of the U.S. District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with 8th Circuit Local Rule 30A (a)(2), the clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Lucretia Scott due 04/27/2020. [4892338] [20-1555] (CAH) [Entered: 03/17/2020 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, order 2/6/20, order 3/6/20. [4892336] [20-1555] (CAH) [Entered: 03/17/2020 03:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [4892328] [20-1555] (CAH) [Entered: 03/17/2020 02:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less