This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/05/2020 at 06:00:44 (UTC).

Lu v. Carrasco, et al

Case Summary

On 09/06/2020 Lu filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Carrasco. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1842

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

DAVID CARRASCO

WILLARD J. BOULTER, III

DAVID J. O'CONNOR

MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY

CHRISTOPHER SAMUEL

Plaintiff / Appellant

FRIEDRICH LU

Boston, MA 02116-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Samuel R. Gates

Attorney at Hirsch Roberts Weinstein LLP

24 Federal St, 12Th Flr

Boston, MA 02110

Scott Alan Roberts

Attorney at Hirsch Roberts Weinstein LLP

24 Federal St, 12Th Flr

Boston, MA 02110

Paul S. Kawai

Attorney at Cambridge Law Department

795 Massachusetts Ave, City Hall 3Rd Flr

Cambridge, MA 02139-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Friedrich Lu

39 Boylston Street

Boston, MA 02116-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #4

Notice to Counsel and Pro Se Litigants

Open Document #1

Appellant's Briefing Notice

Open Document #2

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to dismiss case filed by Appellees Willard J. Boulter, III, David Carrasco, Massachusetts Institute of Technology and David J. O'Connor. Certificate of service dated 10/29/2020. [20-1842] (SRG) [Entered: 10/29/2020 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for Summary Reversal in Lieu of Opening Brief filed by Appellant Friedrich Lu. Certificate of service was not included. [20-1842]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was docketed in the wrong case. Please disregard. (GB) [Entered: 10/26/2020 01:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to correct record on appeal, MOTION to direct district court to send appellant the memorandum & order of dismissal, and MOTION to suspend briefing notice filed by Appellant Friedrich Lu. Certificate of service was not included. [20-1842] (GB) [Entered: 09/21/2020 11:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 10/20/2020 for appellant Friedrich Lu. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [20-1842] (GB) [Entered: 09/10/2020 02:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #39) filed by Appellant Friedrich Lu. [20-1842]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (GB) [Entered: 09/06/2020 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #39) filed by Appellant Friedrich Lu. Fee due 09/21/2020 . [20-1842] (GB) [Entered: 09/06/2020 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Friedrich Lu