This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/11/2019 at 06:04:53 (UTC).

LSCC LLC v. Wilco Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/12/2019 LSCC LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Wilco Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-56075

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

LSCC LLC, an Arkansas limited liability corporation, individually and on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated

Defendant / Appellee

WILCO LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, FKA Conseco Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Manfred P. Muecke

Attorney at Bonnett Fairbourn Friedman & Balint PC

600 West Broadway, Suite 900

San Diego, CA 92101

Francis Joseph Balint Jr.

Attorney at Bonnett Fairbourn Friedman & Balint, PC

2325 E. Camelback Road, Suite 300

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Patricia N. Syverson Esquire

Attorney at Bonnett Fairbourn Friedman & Balint PC

600 West Broadway, Suite 900

San Diego, CA 92101

Andrew S. Friedman

Attorney at Bonnett Fairbourn Friedman & Balint, PC

2325 E. Camelback Road, Suite 300

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Kathryn Elizabeth Panish

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

333 South Hope Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

John C. O'Quinn

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Ryan Moorman

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

300 North Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Andrew A. Kassof

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

300 North Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Kristin Elizabeth Rose

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

333 South Hope Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter

1 #2

Mediation Letter

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

#4

#10

#13

#14

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2019
  • Docket(#16) Streamlined request [15] by Appellant LSCC LLC to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant LSCC LLC opening brief due 12/12/2019. Appellee Wilco Life Insurance Company answering brief due 01/13/2020. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11488307] (JN) [Entered: 11/04/2019 02:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • Docket(#15) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant LSCC LLC. New requested due date is 12/12/2019. [11487890] [19-56075] (Friedman, Andrew) [Entered: 11/04/2019 01:14 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [11472432] (VS) [Entered: 10/22/2019 09:06 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Notice of change of email address received from counsel (Frank E. McLain counsel only in lower court). No action taken. [11459776] (TYL) [Entered: 10/09/2019 02:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Docket(#12) Added Attorney(s) John C. O'Quinn for party(s) Appellee Wilco Life Insurance Company, in case 19-56075. [11456232] (QDL) [Entered: 10/07/2019 01:06 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Docket(#11) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of John C. O'Quinn (Kirkland & Ellis LLP, 1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W., Washington, D.C. 20004) for Appellee Wilco Life Insurance Company. Date of service: 10/07/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11455963] [19-56075] (O'Quinn, John) [Entered: 10/07/2019 11:31 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 10/15/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11449631] (VS) [Entered: 10/01/2019 09:22 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Docket(#9) Added Attorney(s) Ryan Moorman for party(s) Appellee Wilco Life Insurance Company, in case 19-56075. [11444847] (QDL) [Entered: 09/26/2019 01:01 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Ryan J. Moorman (Kirkland & Ellis, LLP, 300 North LaSalle, Chicago, IL 60654) for Appellee Wilco Life Insurance Company. Date of service: 09/26/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11444772] [19-56075] (Moorman, Ryan) [Entered: 09/26/2019 12:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • Docket(#7) Added Attorney(s) Kristin Elizabeth Rose for party(s) Appellee Wilco Life Insurance Company, in case 19-56075. [11438241] (QDL) [Entered: 09/20/2019 08:45 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Docket(#6) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/19/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11438058][19-56075] (AD) [Entered: 09/19/2019 06:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Kristin E. Rose (Kirkland & Ellis LLP 333 South Hope Street, 29th Floor Los Angeles, CA 90071) for Appellee Wilco Life Insurance Company. Date of service: 09/19/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11437994] [19-56075] (Rose, Kristin) [Entered: 09/19/2019 05:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellant LSCC LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/19/2019. [11437365] [19-56075] (Friedman, Andrew) [Entered: 09/19/2019 01:32 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Docket(#3) Added Attorney(s) Andrew A. Kassof for party(s) Appellee Wilco Life Insurance Company, in case 19-56075. [11436436] (QDL) [Entered: 09/18/2019 04:23 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Andrew A. Kassof (Kirkland & Ellis LLP) for Appellee Wilco Life Insurance Company. Date of service: 09/18/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11436406] [19-56075] (Kassof, Andrew) [Entered: 09/18/2019 04:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/19/2019. Appellant LSCC LLC opening brief due 11/12/2019. Appellee Wilco Life Insurance Company answering brief due 12/10/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11429346] (JBS) [Entered: 09/12/2019 10:04 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wilco Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristin Rose

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew A. Kassof