This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/27/2020 at 06:13:09 (UTC).

LREP Arizona LLC v. 597 Broadway Realty LP, et al

Case Summary

On 05/28/2020 LREP Arizona LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against 597 Broadway Realty LP. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-16021

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

LREP ARIZONA LLC, a Texas limited liability company

Defendant / Appellants

597 BROADWAY REALTY LP, a New Jersey limited partnership

SHUI YEE LEE

SABETH I. SIDDIQUE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Joseph Nathaniel Roth

Attorney at Osborn Maledon, PA

2929 N. Central Avenue, Suite 2100

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Colin F. Campbell Esquire

Attorney at Osborn Maledon, PA

2929 N. Central Avenue, Suite 2100

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Warren John Stapleton Esquire

Attorney at Osborn Maledon, PA

2929 N. Central Avenue, Suite 2100

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Benjamin William Reeves

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer L.L.P.

One Arizona Center, 400 East Van Buren Street

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2202

Colin Higgins Esquire

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer LLP

600 Anton Boulevard, Suite 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Michael B. Reynolds Esquire

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer LLP

600 Anton Boulevard, Suite 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #5

Case Opening Packedt

#2

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LK): Appellants unopposed motions (Docket Entry No. [ # 11746072-2 ] in No. 20-15589 and Docket Entry No. [ # 5 ] in No. 20-16021) to consolidate are granted. Nos. 20-15589 and 20-16021 are consolidated. The consolidated opening brief is due September 4, 2020. The consolidated answering brief is due October 5, 2020. The optional consolidated reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the consolidated answering brief. [11747178] [20-15589, 20-16021] (JPD) [Entered: 07/09/2020 10:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) Appellants 597 Broadway Realty LP, Sabeth I. Siddique and Shui Yee Lee Motion to consolidate cases 20-16021 and 20-15589. Date of service: 07/08/2020. [11746197] [20-16021] (Reeves, Benjamin) [Entered: 07/08/2020 02:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11726918] (CL) [Entered: 06/18/2020 08:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 06/10/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11717485]. [20-16021] (AD) [Entered: 06/10/2020 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants 597 Broadway Realty LP, Sabeth I. Siddique and Shui Yee Lee Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/10/2020. [11717300] [20-16021] (Reeves, Benjamin) [Entered: 06/10/2020 11:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants 597 Broadway Realty LP, Sabeth I. Siddique and Shui Yee Lee Mediation Questionnaire due on 06/04/2020. Transcript ordered by 06/26/2020. Transcript due 07/27/2020. Appellants 597 Broadway Realty LP, Sabeth I. Siddique and Shui Yee Lee opening brief due 09/04/2020. Appellee LREP Arizona LLC answering brief due 10/05/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11703511] (RT) [Entered: 05/28/2020 09:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LREP Arizona, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Colin R Higgins

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael B Reynolds