This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/23/2019 at 06:05:19 (UTC).

Loxo Oncology, et al v. Array Biopharma

Case Summary

On 07/25/2019 Loxo Oncology, filed an Other lawsuit against Array Biopharma. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1266

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STEVEN ANDREWS

GABRIELLE KOLAKOWSKI

LOXO ONCOLOGY, INC.

MEGAN MCKENNEY

ANDREW METCALF

TONY MORALES

JOSHUA BALLARD

ELIZABETH MCFADDIN

BARBARA BRANDHUBER

SHANE WALLS

Counter Claimant

ARRAY BIOPHARMA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Catherine Harding McCord

John-Paul S. Deol

Patrick Eugene Premo

Mary Virginia Sooter

Matthew John Worthington

Regina Marie Rodriguez

Robert E. Counihan

Jeffrey Allen Ware

Jedediah Wakefield

Adam Gahtan

Kathryn Easterling

Counter Claimant Attorneys

Sean Robert Gallagher

Charles Kramer Verhoeven

Andrew Michael Holmes

James D. Judah

Felipe Corredor

Bina G. Patel

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #2

Declaration

Open Document #1

Plaintiffs-Counter-Defendants-Appellees Opposition to Motion for Expedited Oral

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Restricted Document #7

Appendix, Volume VII

Open Restricted Document #6

Appendix, Volume VI

Open Restricted Document #5

Appendix, Volume V

Open Restricted Document #4

Appendix, Volume IV

Open Restricted Document #3

Appendix, Volume III

Open Restricted Document #2

Appendix, Volume II

Open Restricted Document #1

Appendix, Volume I

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10679722] Calendar notice sent to counsel. Arguments to be held on 11/19/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom III, Byron White United States Courthouse, Denver, CO. Arguing counsel is required to go to http://www.ca10.uscourts.gov under the argument calendar tab to obtain an important notice regarding calendared cases and required forms. The calendar acknowledgment form must be completed and filed with the clerk via Electronic Case Filing within 10 days of today's date. [19-1266] [Entered: 09/19/2019 10:13 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10678928] Order filed by Clerk of the Court referring reply in support of motion to expedite oral argument and decsision [ # 10678859-2 ] to the panel of judges that will later be assigned to consider this case on the merits (no ruling will issue at this time). Served on 09/17/2019. [19-1266] [Entered: 09/17/2019 08:54 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10678859] Reply filed by Array Biopharma, Inc. to Plaintiffs-Counter-Defendants-Appellees' Opposition to Motion for Expedited Oral Argument and Decision. Served on 09/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1266] CKV [Entered: 09/16/2019 08:25 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • Docket[10677605] Minute order filed - Appellees' brief now due 09/30/2019 for Loxo Oncology, Inc., Shane Walls, Elizabeth McFaddin, Megan McKenney, Andrew Metcalf, Tony Morales, Steven Andrews, Joshua Ballard, Barbara Brandhuber and Gabrielle Kolakowski. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-1266] [Entered: 09/11/2019 12:12 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10677286] Order filed by Clerk of the Court referring Appellees' Opposition (response) [ # 10677151-2 ] to the panel of judges that will later be assigned to consider this case on the merits (no ruling will issue at this time). Served on 09/10/2019. [19-1266] [Entered: 09/10/2019 11:16 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketThis entry has been removed from the docket. [lg] This pleading was filed twice to attach a declaration, which has now been uploaded to the first filing. [10677153] Response filed by Steven Andrews, Joshua Ballard, Barbara Brandhuber, Gabrielle Kolakowski, Loxo Oncology, Inc., Elizabeth McFaddin, Megan McKenney, Andrew Metcalf, Tony Morales and Shane Walls to Motion for Expedited Oral Argument and Decision. Served on 09/09/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1266] REC [Entered: 09/09/2019 09:12 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10677151] Response filed by Steven Andrews, Joshua Ballard, Barbara Brandhuber, Gabrielle Kolakowski, Loxo Oncology, Inc., Elizabeth McFaddin, Megan McKenney, Andrew Metcalf, Tony Morales and Shane Walls to Motion for Expedited Oral Argument and Decision. Served on 09/09/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1266] REC [Entered: 09/09/2019 08:07 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10675389] Order filed by Clerk of the Court referring appellant's motion for expedited oral argument and decision [ # 10675166-2 ] to the panel of judges that will later be assigned to consider this case on the merits (no ruling will issue at this time). Any response and/or reply to the motion is alos referred to the merits panel. Served on 09/03/2019. [19-1266] [Entered: 09/03/2019 12:43 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10675310] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting appellant's motion to seal the unredacted brief and volumes 5-7 of its appendix. Unless the merits panel orders otherwise, the unredacted versions of Appellant's brief and volumes 5-7 shall remain under seal. Served on 09/03/2019. [19-1266] [Entered: 09/03/2019 10:55 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10675166] Motion filed by Appellant Array Biopharma, Inc. to expedite case. Served on: 08/30/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1266] CKV [Entered: 08/30/2019 07:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10668220] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. James D. Judah for Array Biopharma, Inc. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y(The parties listed were previously disclosed). Served on 08/05/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1266] [Entered: 08/05/2019 12:12 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10668216] Entry of appearance filed by Andrew Michael Holmes for Array Biopharma, Inc.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 08/05/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1266] [Entered: 08/05/2019 12:07 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Docket[10668212] Entry of appearance submitted by Bina G. Patel for Appellant Array Biopharma, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/05/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1266] [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed-- Edited 08/05/2019 by NA] BGP [Entered: 08/05/2019 12:04 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Docket[10668207] Entry of appearance submitted by Felipe Corredor for Appellant Array Biopharma, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/05/2019. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 08/05/2019 by LAB to remove PDF from entry as pleading was filed 8/5/2019.] [19-1266] FC [Entered: 08/05/2019 12:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10668205] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Sean Robert Gallagher for Array Biopharma, Inc. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y(Two of the parties listed are or were counsel of record). Served on 08/05/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1266] [Entered: 08/05/2019 11:59 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Docket[10668201] Entry of appearance submitted by James D. Judah for Appellant Array Biopharma, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/05/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1266] --[Edited 08/05/2019 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 8/5/2019.] JDJ [Entered: 08/05/2019 11:56 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Docket[10668195] Entry of appearance submitted by Andrew M. Holmes for Appellant Array Biopharma, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/05/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1266]--[Edited 08/05/2019 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 8/5/2019] AMH [Entered: 08/05/2019 11:52 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Docket[10668191] Entry of appearance submitted by Charles K. Verhoeven for Appellant Array Biopharma, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/05/2019. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 08/05/2019 by LAB to remove PDF from entry as pleading was filed 8/5/2019.] [19-1266] CKV [Entered: 08/05/2019 11:43 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Docket[10668189] Entry of appearance submitted by Sean Robert Gallagher for Appellant Array Biopharma, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/05/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1266] --[Edited 08/05/2019 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 8/5/2019.] SRG [Entered: 08/05/2019 11:36 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10665690] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/24/2019. Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 08/08/2019 for Array Biopharma, Inc. Notice of appearance due on 08/08/2019 for Steven Andrews, Joshua Ballard, Barbara Brandhuber, Gabrielle Kolakowski, Loxo Oncology, Inc., Elizabeth McFaddin, Megan McKenney, Andrew Metcalf, Tony Morales and Shane Walls. [19-1266] [Entered: 07/25/2019 10:47 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less