This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/21/2019 at 06:06:05 (UTC).

Lower Elwha Klallam Tribe, et al v. Lummi Nation

Case Summary

On 07/23/2019 Lower Elwha Klallam Tribe filed an Other lawsuit against Lummi Nation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-35611

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LOWER ELWHA KLALLAM INDIAN TRIBE

Not Classified By Court

STATE OF WASHINGTON

SKOKOMISH INDIAN TRIBE

MAKAH INDIAN TRIBE

UPPER SKAGIT INDIAN TRIBE

NISQUALLY INDIAN TRIBE

SWINOMISH INDIAN TRIBAL COMMUNITY

STILLAGUAMISH TRIBE

SUQUAMISH TRIBE

SQUAXIN ISLAND TRIBE

TULALIP TRIBES

Respondent / Appellee

LUMMI NATION

Petitioner / Appellants

PORT GAMBLE S'KLALLAM TRIBE

JAMESTOWN S'KLALLAM TRIBE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Samuel D. Hough Esquire

Attorney at Lower Elwha Klallam Tribe

2851 Lower Elwha Rd.

Port Angeles, WA 98363

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Michael S. Grossmann

Attorney at AGWA - Office of the Washington Attorney General (Olympia)

P.O. Box 40100, 1125 Washington St., Se

Olympia, WA 98504-0100

Earle David Lees III

Attorney at Skokomish Indian Tribe

80 N Tribal Center Road

Shelton, WA 98584

Brian C. Gruber

Attorney at Ziontz Chestnut

2101 4Th Avenue

Seattle, WA 98121

Marc D. Slonim

Attorney at Ziontz Chestnut Varnell Berley & Slonim

2101 4Th Avenue

Seattle, WA 98121

David Stoller Hawkins

Attorney at UPPER SKAGIT INDIAN TRIBE

25944 Community Plaza Way

Sedro Wooley, WA 98284

Jay J. Manning Esquire

Attorney at Cascadia Law Group PLLC

606 Columbia Street Nw, Suite 212

Olympia, WA 98501

Meghan Elizabeth Gavin

Attorney at CASCADIA LAW GROUP PLLC

1201 Third Ave

Seattle, WA 98101

Emily Hutchinson Haley

Attorney at Office of the Tribal Attorney

11404 Moorage Way

La Conner, WA 98257-0817

James M. Jannetta

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE TRIBAL ATTORNEY

P.O. Box 817

La Conner, WA 98257-0817

Rob Roy Smith

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP

1420 Fifth Avenue, Suite 3700

Seattle, WA 98101

James Rittenhouse Bellis Esquire

Attorney at Office of the Reservation Attorney

P.O. Box 498

Suquamish, WA 98392

Howard G. Arnett

Attorney at Karnopp Petersen LLP

360 Sw Bond Street

Bend, OR 97702

John W. Ogan

Attorney at Law Office of John W Ogan

P.O. Box 1192

Sisters, OR 97759

David Babcock

Attorney at SQUAXIN ISLAND LEGAL DEPT

3711 Se Old Olympic Highway

Shelton, WA 98584

Kevin Lyon

Attorney at SQUAXIN ISLAND LEGAL DEPT

3711 Se Old Olympic Highway

Shelton, WA 98584

Sharon I. Haensly Esquire

Attorney at SQUAXIN ISLAND LEGAL DEPT

3711 Se Old Olympic Highway

Shelton, WA 98584

Mason D. Morisset

Attorney at Morisset, Schlosser Jozwiak & Somerville

811 First Avenue, Suite 218

Seattle, WA 98104-1509

Timothy Brewer

Attorney at Tulalip Reservation Attorneys Office

6406 Marine Drive

Tulalip, WA 98271

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Mary Michelle Neil

Attorney at LUMMI INDIAN NATION

2665 Kwina Road

Bellingham, WA 98226

7 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#19

#18

#17

16 #2

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO ADD INTERESTED PARTY BRIEFING AND MODIFY THE BRIEFING SCHEDU

16 #1

Main Document

#15

#9

#5

#2

1 #4

Cross-Appeal Briefing Chart

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Mediation Letter

#1

Docketing Letter

#3

2 #4

Cross-Appeal Briefing Chart

2 #3

Case Opening Packet

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Filed (ECF) Appellees Jamestown S'Klallam Tribe and Port Gamble S'Klallam Tribe in 19-35610, Appellants Jamestown S'Klallam Tribe and Port Gamble S'Klallam Tribe in 19-35611 response to motion (motion for miscellaneous relief). Date of service: 09/19/2019. [11437695] [19-35610, 19-35611, 19-35638] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct ECF filing type. 9/20/2019 by TYL] (Rasmussen, Lauren) [Entered: 09/19/2019 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Filed (ECF) Appellant Lummi Nation in 19-35610, Appellee Lummi Nation in 19-35611, 19-35638 Motion for miscellaneous relief [Cross-Motion to Modify the Briefing Schedule] and Response opposing motion ([ # 15 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 15 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 16 ] Motion and Response to Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 16 ] Motion and Response to Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 09/18/2019. [11435728] [19-35610, 19-35611, 19-35638] (Maynard, Deanne) [Entered: 09/18/2019 11:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Filed (ECF) Appellee Lower Elwha Klallam Indian Tribe in 19-35610, Appellant Lower Elwha Klallam Indian Tribe in 19-35638 Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule] and Response opposing motion ([ # 15 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 15 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 09/16/2019. [11433406] [19-35611, 19-35610, 19-35638] (Hough, Samuel) [Entered: 09/16/2019 06:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Filed (ECF) Appellants Jamestown S'Klallam Tribe and Port Gamble S'Klallam Tribe in 19-35611, Appellees Jamestown S'Klallam Tribe and Port Gamble S'Klallam Tribe in 19-35610 Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion For Leave to Add Interested Party Briefing and Modify the Briefing Schedule]. Date of service: 09/11/2019. [11428992] [19-35611, 19-35610, 19-35638] (Rasmussen, Lauren) [Entered: 09/11/2019 07:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. The briefing schedule previously established by the court remains in effect. [11402018] [19-35610, 19-35611, 19-35638] (LW) [Entered: 08/19/2019 12:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • Docket(#13) Added Attorney(s) Brian Matsui, Deanne Maynard, James Sigel for party(s) Appellant Lummi Nation, in case 19-35610 Attorney(s) Brian Matsui, Deanne Maynard, James Sigel for party(s) Appellee Lummi Nation, in case 19-35611 Attorney(s) Brian Matsui, Deanne Maynard, James Sigel for party(s) Appellee Lummi Nation, in case 19-35638. [11399457] [19-35610, 19-35611, 19-35638] (QDL) [Entered: 08/16/2019 09:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • Docket(#12) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of James R. Sigel (Morrison & Foerster LLP, 425 Market Street, San Francisco, CA 94105-2482) for Appellant Lummi Nation in 19-35610, Appellee Lummi Nation in 19-35611, 19-35638. Date of service: 08/16/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11399260] [19-35610, 19-35611, 19-35638] (Sigel, James) [Entered: 08/16/2019 05:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • Docket(#11) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Brian R. Matsui (Morrison & Foerster LLP, 2000 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W., Washington, D.C. 20006) for Appellant Lummi Nation in 19-35610, Appellee Lummi Nation in 19-35611, 19-35638. Date of service: 08/16/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11399259] [19-35610, 19-35611, 19-35638] (Matsui, Brian) [Entered: 08/16/2019 05:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • Docket(#10) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Deanne E. Maynard (Morrison & Foerster LLP, 2000 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W., Washington, D.C. 20006) for Appellant Lummi Nation in 19-35610, Appellee Lummi Nation in 19-35611, 19-35638. Date of service: 08/16/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11399258] [19-35610, 19-35611, 19-35638] (Maynard, Deanne) [Entered: 08/16/2019 05:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • Docket(#9) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 08/06/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11389311][19-35611] (AD) [Entered: 08/06/2019 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) Appellant Lower Elwha Klallam Indian Tribe in 19-35638 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/06/2019. [11389277] [19-35638, 19-35610, 19-35611] (Hough, Samuel) [Entered: 08/06/2019 05:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 08/16/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11381757] [19-35610, 19-35611, 19-35638] (MS) [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • Docket(#6) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 07/30/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11381208][19-35611] (AD) [Entered: 07/30/2019 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/06/2019. First cross appeal brief due 10/28/2019 for Lummi Nation. Second brief on cross appeal due 11/27/2019 for Jamestown S'Klallam Tribe, Lower Elwha Klallam Indian Tribe and Port Gamble S'Klallam Tribe. Third brief on cross appeal due 12/27/2019 for Lummi Nation. Optional cross appeal reply brief is due within 21 days of service of third brief on cross appeal. [11380879] [19-35638, 19-35610, 19-35611] (JBS) [Entered: 07/30/2019 10:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellant Lummi Nation in 19-35610, Appellee Lummi Nation in 19-35611 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/30/2019. [11380523] [19-35610, 19-35611] (Neil, Mary) [Entered: 07/30/2019 08:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 07/23/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11374395][19-35611] (AD) [Entered: 07/23/2019 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Jamestown S'Klallam Tribe and Port Gamble S'Klallam Tribe in 19-35611, Appellees Jamestown S'Klallam Tribe and Port Gamble S'Klallam Tribe in 19-35610 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/23/2019. [11373659] [19-35611, 19-35610] (Rasmussen, Lauren) [Entered: 07/23/2019 01:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/30/2019. First cross appeal brief due 10/28/2019 for Lummi Nation. Second brief on cross appeal due 11/27/2019 for Jamestown S'Klallam Tribe, Lower Elwha Klallam Indian Tribe and Port Gamble S'Klallam Tribe. Third brief on cross appeal due 12/27/2019 for Lummi Nation. Optional cross appeal reply brief is due within 21 days of service of third brief on cross appeal. [11373358] [19-35611, 19-35610] (JBS) [Entered: 07/23/2019 11:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Swinomish Indian Tribal Community is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mary Michelle Neil