This case was last updated from PACER on 01/26/2020 at 06:09:40 (UTC).

Lowell v. Vermont Department of Children

Case Summary

On 11/27/2019 Lowell filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Vermont Department of Children. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3987

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant

John and Jane Does 1-10

Defendant / Appellees

Karen Shea, Deputy Commissioner for the Family Services Division ("FSD"), DCF

Catherine Clark, Director, Commissioner's Registry Review Unit, DCF

Kathleen Greenmun, Substantiation Hearing Officer, DCF

Emily Carrier, District Director, DCF

Christine Johnson, Deputy Commissioner for FSD, DCF

Christine Gadwah, Family Services Worker, DCF

Kenneth Schatz, Comissioner, DCF

Vermont Department of Children and Families, "DCF"

Kathleen Smith, Family Services Supervisor, DCF

Plaintiff / Appellants

Miriam Lowell

Seth Healey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

David R. Groff

Attorney at Vermont Office of the Attorney General

109 State Street

Montpelier, VT 05609

Benjamin Battles Esq.

Attorney at Vermont Office of the Attorney General

109 State Street

Montpelier, VT 05609

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Colin Hagan Esq.

Attorney at Shlansky Law Group, LLP

1 Winnisimmet Street

Chelsea, MA 02150

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT DECISION, dated 11/18/2019, RECEIVED.[2718998] [19-3987] [Entered: 12/02/2019 03:29 PM]

#12

(#12) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Seth Healey and Miriam Lowell, FILED. Service date 12/16/2019 by CM/ECF.[2729958] [19-3987] [Entered: 12/16/2019 10:35 AM]

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

#8

(#9) CURED DEFECTIVE Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, [ # 8 ], on behalf of Appellees Emily Carrier, Catherine Clark, Christine Gadwah, Kathleen Greenmun, Christine Johnson, Kenneth Schatz, Karen Shea, Kathleen Smith and Vermont Department of Children and Families, FILED.[2727321] [19-3987] [Entered: 12/12/2019 09:18 AM]

#11

(#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Seth Healey and Miriam Lowell, FILED. Service date 12/16/2019 by CM/ECF.[2729950] [19-3987] [Entered: 12/16/2019 10:32 AM]

#31

(#31) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellants Seth Healey and Miriam Lowell Brief due date as 02/28/2020. Joint Appendix due date as 02/28/2020, FILED.[2746284] [19-3987] [Entered: 01/08/2020 08:40 AM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#32

(#32) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Emily Carrier, Catherine Clark, Christine Gadwah, Kathleen Greenmun, Christine Johnson, Kenneth Schatz, Karen Shea, Kathleen Smith and Vermont Department of Children and Families, FILED. Service date 01/08/2020 by CM/ECF. [2746392] [19-3987] [Entered: 01/08/2020 09:48 AM]

#18

(#18) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Seth Healey and Miriam Lowell, FILED. Service date 12/20/2019 by CM/ECF.[2735353] [19-3987] [Entered: 12/20/2019 10:19 AM]

26 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#28

(#28) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Seth Healey and Miriam Lowell, informing Court of proposed due date 02/28/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 01/06/2020 by CM/ECF.[2744957] [19-3987] [Entered: 01/06/2020 05:22 PM]

5 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

26 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

#25

(#25) NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[2736374] [19-3987] [Entered: 12/20/2019 05:07 PM]

#15

No Description Available

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) ATTORNEY, Benjamin D. Battles, [ # 32 ], in place of attorney David R. Groff, SUBSTITUTED.[2746537] [19-3987] [Entered: 01/08/2020 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Emily Carrier, Catherine Clark, Christine Gadwah, Kathleen Greenmun, Christine Johnson, Kenneth Schatz, Karen Shea, Kathleen Smith and Vermont Department of Children and Families, FILED. Service date 01/08/2020 by CM/ECF. [2746392] [19-3987] [Entered: 01/08/2020 09:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellants Seth Healey and Miriam Lowell Brief due date as 02/28/2020. Joint Appendix due date as 02/28/2020, FILED.[2746284] [19-3987] [Entered: 01/08/2020 08:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Seth Healey and Miriam Lowell, informing Court of proposed due date 02/28/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 01/06/2020 by CM/ECF.[2744957] [19-3987] [Entered: 01/06/2020 05:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2741238] [19-3987] [Entered: 01/02/2020 11:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[2736374] [19-3987] [Entered: 12/20/2019 05:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) CURED DEFECTIVE Form C, [ # 18 ], on behalf of Appellants Seth Healey and Miriam Lowell, FILED.[2735671] [19-3987] [Entered: 12/20/2019 12:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Seth Healey and Miriam Lowell, FILED. Service date 12/20/2019 by CM/ECF.[2735353] [19-3987] [Entered: 12/20/2019 10:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [16], on behalf of Appellants Seth Healey and Miriam Lowell, FILED.[2735280] [19-3987] [Entered: 12/20/2019 09:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • (#16) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Seth Healey and Miriam Lowell, FILED. Service date 12/19/2019 by CM/ECF.[2735140] [19-3987] [Entered: 12/19/2019 08:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2019
  • (#13) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Seth Healey and Miriam Lowell, FILED. Service date 12/19/2019 by CM/ECF.[2735082] [19-3987] [Entered: 12/19/2019 05:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Seth Healey and Miriam Lowell, FILED. Service date 12/16/2019 by CM/ECF.[2729958] [19-3987] [Entered: 12/16/2019 10:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Seth Healey and Miriam Lowell, FILED. Service date 12/16/2019 by CM/ECF.[2729950] [19-3987] [Entered: 12/16/2019 10:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CURED DEFECTIVE Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, [ # 8 ], on behalf of Appellees Emily Carrier, Catherine Clark, Christine Gadwah, Kathleen Greenmun, Christine Johnson, Kenneth Schatz, Karen Shea, Kathleen Smith and Vermont Department of Children and Families, FILED.[2727321] [19-3987] [Entered: 12/12/2019 09:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Emily Carrier, Catherine Clark, Christine Gadwah, Kathleen Greenmun, Christine Johnson, Kenneth Schatz, Karen Shea, Kathleen Smith and Vermont Department of Children and Families, FILED. Service date 12/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2727246] [19-3987] [Entered: 12/12/2019 08:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [6], on behalf of Appellees Emily Carrier, Catherine Clark, Christine Gadwah, Kathleen Greenmun, Christine Johnson, Kenneth Schatz, Karen Shea, Kathleen Smith and Vermont Department of Children and Families, FILED.[2727179] [19-3987] [Entered: 12/11/2019 05:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • (#6) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Emily Carrier, Catherine Clark, Christine Gadwah, Kathleen Greenmun, Christine Johnson, Kenneth Schatz, Karen Shea, Kathleen Smith and Vermont Department of Children and Families, FILED. Service date 12/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2726457] [19-3987] [Entered: 12/11/2019 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2723545] [19-3987] [Entered: 12/06/2019 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT DECISION, dated 11/18/2019, RECEIVED.[2718998] [19-3987] [Entered: 12/02/2019 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants Seth Healey and Miriam Lowell, FILED. [2718992] [19-3987] [Entered: 12/02/2019 03:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.