This case was last updated from PACER on 05/20/2019 at 06:07:16 (UTC).

Lowell Green v. Lorie Davis, Director

Case Summary

On 03/21/2019 Lowell Green filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Lorie Davis, Director. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-10322

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

LOWELL QUINCY GREEN

Livingston, TX 77351-0000

Respondent / Appellee

LORIE DAVIS, DIRECTOR, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE, CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTIONS DIVISION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Lowell Quincy Green

Attorney at CID Polunsky Prison

3872 Fm 350, S.

Livingston, TX 77351-0000

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Susan Frances San Miguel Esq.

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 12548

Austin, TX 78711-2548

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

BR-9 Letter

Open Document #2

Unfiled Document Captioned to DC

Open Document #1

Unfiled Document

Open Document #1

Unfiled Correspondence

Open Document #4

Unfiled Document

Open Document #1

Unfiled Correspondence

Open Document #1

Unfiled Document Ref Dkt #39

Open Document #3

BR-9 Letter

Open Document #1

MOT-2 Letter

Open Document

PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Lowell Quincy Green [19-10322] (SMC) [Entered: 03/21/2019 03:22 PM]

Open Document #2

BR-9 Letter

Open Document #2

Court Order

Open Document #2

BR-9 Letter

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the untitled documents referencing d.c. dkt #39 and captioned to district court received from Appellant Mr. Lowell Quincy Green. We are unable to determine the relief appellant is seeking or the intent of these documents. [19-10322] (CNF) [Entered: 05/15/2019 12:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the document captioned to district court received from Appellant Mr. Lowell Quincy Green. We cannot determine the intent nor the relief appellant is seeking. The document is captioned to the district court [19-10322] (CNF) [Entered: 05/15/2019 11:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT ORDER granting jurisdictional review to remand case (IN DETAIL) [9026717-2] [19-10322] (RAJ) [Entered: 05/15/2019 11:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken on the Correspondence - Office of the Clerk received from Appellant Mr. Lowell Quincy Green because Addressed to Office of theClerk, Franklin Crowley Courts Building, referencing district court No. 3:18-CV-1459 [19-10322] (CNF) [Entered: 04/30/2019 08:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Correspondence received from Appellant Mr. Lowell Quincy Greenthe document is captioned to the Tenth Court of Appeals [19-10322] (MRW) [Entered: 04/15/2019 12:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-10322] (RAJ) [Entered: 04/10/2019 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Correspondence received from Appellant Mr. Lowell Quincy Green because the case is under jurisdictional review [19-10322] (MRW) [Entered: 04/10/2019 02:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Lowell Quincy Green [19-10322] (SMC) [Entered: 03/21/2019 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.