This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/14/2022 at 06:11:09 (UTC).

Louise Andrich, et al v. Gus Kostas, et al

Case Summary

On 08/15/2022 Louise Andrich, filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Gus Kostas,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-16226

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MARY GOSS

JESSICA ANDRICH

Defendant

ANGELA HERNANDEZ

Plaintiff / Appellant

LOUISE ANDRICH, an individual

Defendant / Appellees

GUS KOSTAS, Officer, #5854

BRIAN PETERS, Officer, #5822

CITY OF PHOENIX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Kevin S. Conlogue Esquire

Attorney at Conlogue Law, LLP

292 S La Cienega Boulevard, Suite 207

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Christina Gail Retts

Attorney at Wieneke Law Group

1225 W Washington Street, Suite 313

Tempe, AZ 85288

Kathleen L. Wieneke

Attorney at Wieneke Law Group

1225 W Washington Street, Suite 313

Tempe, AZ 85288

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Louise Andrich Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/22/2022. [12522311] [22-16226] (Conlogue, Kevin) [Entered: 08/22/2022 10:27 AM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 09/07/2022, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12524305] (CL) [Entered: 08/23/2022 03:28 PM]

#5

(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: Appellant Louise Andrich opening brief due 12/01/2022. Appellees City of Phoenix, Gus Kostas and Brian Peters answering brief due 01/30/2023. Appellants optional reply brief is due within 21 days afer service of the answering brief. [12537246] (MS) [Entered: 09/09/2022 03:19 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: Appellant Louise Andrich opening brief due 12/01/2022. Appellees City of Phoenix, Gus Kostas and Brian Peters answering brief due 01/30/2023. Appellants optional reply brief is due within 21 days afer service of the answering brief. [12537246] (MS) [Entered: 09/09/2022 03:19 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 09/07/2022, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12524305] (CL) [Entered: 08/23/2022 03:28 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 08/22/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12522587]. [22-16226] (AD) [Entered: 08/22/2022 12:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Louise Andrich Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/22/2022. [12522311] [22-16226] (Conlogue, Kevin) [Entered: 08/22/2022 10:27 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Louise Andrich Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/22/2022. Appellant Louise Andrich opening brief due 10/17/2022. Appellees City of Phoenix, Gus Kostas and Brian Peters answering brief due 11/17/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12517125] (RT) [Entered: 08/15/2022 02:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christina Gail Retts

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kathleen L Wieneke