This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/13/2023 at 06:13:37 (UTC).

Louis Feola, et al v. Westin Operator, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 11/14/2022 Louis Feola, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Westin Operator, LLC,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-16760

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

LOUIS FEOLA

GRETCHEN GRUBEL

Defendant / Appellees

WESTIN OPERATOR, LLC, DBA Westin Maui Resport & Spa

AQUALANI RECREATION TWO CORPORATION

MAUI OPERATING, LLC

WM LESSEE, LLC

CAMPBELL HAWAII INVESTOR, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Dennis Ardi

James Krueger Esquire

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Stefan Reinke

Thomas E. Cook Esquire

Sheree Kon-Herrera Esquire

Wesley H.H. Ching Esquire

Jeffrey Portnoy

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to all Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

1 #4

Mediation Letter

#3

(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellant Louis Feola Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/18/2022. [12591246] [22-16760] (Ardi, Dennis) [Entered: 11/18/2022 12:20 PM]

#5

(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 12/16/2022, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12603234] (CL) [Entered: 12/06/2022 10:45 AM]

6 #1

Main Document

6 #2

Exhibit A

6 #3

Exhibit B

6 #4

Exhibit C

6 #5

Exhibit D

#7

(#7) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference w/ counsel for appellee Aqualani Recreation Two Corporation only, 01/09/2023, 1:30 p.m. Pacific Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: Appellants Louis Feola and Gretchen Grubel opening brief due 02/08/2023. Appellees Aqualani Recreation Two Corporation, Campbell Hawaii Investor, LLC, Maui Operating, LLC, WM Lessee, LLC and Westin Operator, LLC answering brief due 03/10/2023. Appellants optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. See order for details. [12613748] (CL) [Entered: 12/19/2022 11:20 AM]

 

Docket Entries

12/19/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference w/ counsel for appellee Aqualani Recreation Two Corporation only, 01/09/2023, 1:30 p.m. Pacific Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: Appellants Louis Feola and Gretchen Grubel opening brief due 02/08/2023. Appellees Aqualani Recreation Two Corporation, Campbell Hawaii Investor, LLC, Maui Operating, LLC, WM Lessee, LLC and Westin Operator, LLC answering brief due 03/10/2023. Appellants optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. See order for details. [12613748] (CL) [Entered: 12/19/2022 11:20 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/15/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellee Westin Operator, LLC Motion to dismiss party from case. Date of service: 12/15/2022. [12611598] [22-16760] (Reinke, Stefan) [Entered: 12/15/2022 12:42 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 12/16/2022, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12603234] (CL) [Entered: 12/06/2022 10:45 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2022

Docket(#4) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 11/18/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12591290]. [22-16760] (AD) [Entered: 11/18/2022 12:44 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellant Louis Feola Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/18/2022. [12591246] [22-16760] (Ardi, Dennis) [Entered: 11/18/2022 12:20 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2022

Docket(#2) Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 11/10/2022. [12587336] (RT) [Entered: 11/15/2022 09:16 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Louis Feola and Gretchen Grubel Mediation Questionnaire due on 11/21/2022. Appellants Louis Feola and Gretchen Grubel opening brief due 01/09/2023. Appellees Aqualani Recreation Two Corporation, Campbell Hawaii Investor, LLC, Maui Operating, LLC, WM Lessee, LLC and Westin Operator, LLC answering brief due 02/08/2023. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12585880] (JMR) [Entered: 11/14/2022 09:52 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less