This case was last updated from PACER on 02/08/2020 at 06:07:09 (UTC).

Louis Del Favero Orchids, Inc. v. Scott Rivkees, et al

Case Summary

On 12/10/2019 Louis Del Favero Orchids, Inc filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Scott Rivkees. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-14930

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

COURTNEY COPPOLA, Individually

CELESTE PHILLIP, Individually

LOUISE ST. LAURENT, Individually

CHRISTIAN BAX, Individually

SCOTT RIVKEES, Individually and in his official capacity as surgeon general and secretary of the Florida Department of Health

Plaintiff / Appellant

LOUIS DEL FAVERO ORCHIDS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Laura McDonald Dennis

Attorney at Radey Law Firm

301 S Bronough St Ste 200

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Eduardo S. Lombard

Attorney at Radey Law Firm

301 S Bronough St Ste 200

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Angela D. Miles

Attorney at Radey Law Firm

301 S Bronough St Ste 200

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Christopher B. Lunny

Attorney at Radey Law Firm

301 S Bronough St Ste 200

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Christopher Brian Lunny

Attorney at Radey Law Firm

301 S Bronough St Ste 200

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Jesse B. Wilkison

Attorney at Sheppard White Kachergus & DeMaggio, PA

215 Washington St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

William J. Sheppard

Attorney at Sheppard White Kachergus & DeMaggio, PA

215 Washington St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Jesse B. Wilkison for Appellant Louis Del Favero Orchids, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-14930] (ECF: Jesse Wilkison) [Entered: 12/23/2019 04:02 PM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Jesse B. Wilkison for Appellant Louis Del Favero Orchids, Inc.. [19-14930] (ECF: Jesse Wilkison) [Entered: 12/23/2019 04:04 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Christopher B. Lunny for Christian Bax, Courtney Coppola, Celeste Phillip, Scott Rivkees and Louise St. Laurent. [19-14930] (ECF: Christopher Lunny) [Entered: 01/07/2020 03:32 PM]

Open Document #3

USDC Order- Doc #42

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document #2

ATTY-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Angela D. Miles for Christian Bax, Courtney Coppola, Celeste Phillip, Scott Rivkees and Louise St. Laurent. [19-14930] (ECF: Angela Miles) [Entered: 01/13/2020 02:52 PM]

Open Document #1

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #1

Appearance of counsel form not processed

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jesse B. Wilkison for Louis Del Favero Orchids, Inc.. [19-14930] (ECF: Jesse Wilkison) [Entered: 12/23/2019 04:03 PM]

Open Document

ORDER: Motion for extension to file appellant brief filed by Appellant Louis Del Favero Orchids, Inc. is GRANTED. [ # 8982198-2 ] Appellants brief due on 03/31/2020, with the appendix due seven days from the filing of the brief. RSR [Entered: 01/15/2020 03:07 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Eduardo S. Lombard for Appellees Christian Bax, Courtney Coppola, Celeste Phillip, Scott Rivkees and Louise St. Laurent. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-14930] (ECF: Eduardo Lombard) [Entered: 01/07/2020 12:48 PM]

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Eduardo S. Lombard for Christian Bax, Courtney Coppola, Celeste Phillip, Scott Rivkees and Louise St. Laurent. [19-14930] (ECF: Eduardo Lombard) [Entered: 01/07/2020 12:37 PM]

Open Document

Appellate fee was paid on 12/04/2019 as to Appellant Louis Del Favero Orchids, Inc.. [Entered: 12/12/2019 07:34 AM]

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: Motion for extension to file appellant brief filed by Appellant Louis Del Favero Orchids, Inc. is GRANTED. [ # 8982198-2 ] Appellants brief due on 03/31/2020, with the appendix due seven days from the filing of the brief. RSR [Entered: 01/15/2020 03:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 03/31/2020 filed by Louis Del Favero Orchids, Inc.. Motion is Unopposed. [8982198-1] [19-14930] (ECF: Jesse Wilkison) [Entered: 01/14/2020 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Angela D. Miles for Christian Bax, Courtney Coppola, Celeste Phillip, Scott Rivkees and Louise St. Laurent. [19-14930] (ECF: Angela Miles) [Entered: 01/13/2020 02:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Appearance of counsel form has not been processed. According to our records, Christopher B. Lunny for Scott Rivkees, Christian Bax, Courtney Coppola, Louise St. Laurent and Celeste Phillip is not a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar. The appearance of counsel form has not been processed allowing fourteen days to complete and submit the required application for admission. [Entered: 01/08/2020 09:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Christopher B. Lunny for Christian Bax, Courtney Coppola, Celeste Phillip, Scott Rivkees and Louise St. Laurent. [19-14930] (ECF: Christopher Lunny) [Entered: 01/07/2020 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Eduardo S. Lombard for Appellees Christian Bax, Courtney Coppola, Celeste Phillip, Scott Rivkees and Louise St. Laurent. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-14930] (ECF: Eduardo Lombard) [Entered: 01/07/2020 12:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Eduardo S. Lombard for Christian Bax, Courtney Coppola, Celeste Phillip, Scott Rivkees and Louise St. Laurent. [19-14930] (ECF: Eduardo Lombard) [Entered: 01/07/2020 12:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 01/02/2020 11:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 01/02/2020 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by William J. Sheppard for Louis Del Favero Orchids, Inc. [19-14930] (ECF: William Sheppard) [Entered: 12/23/2019 04:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Jesse B. Wilkison for Appellant Louis Del Favero Orchids, Inc.. [19-14930] (ECF: Jesse Wilkison) [Entered: 12/23/2019 04:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jesse B. Wilkison for Louis Del Favero Orchids, Inc.. [19-14930] (ECF: Jesse Wilkison) [Entered: 12/23/2019 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Jesse B. Wilkison for Appellant Louis Del Favero Orchids, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-14930] (ECF: Jesse Wilkison) [Entered: 12/23/2019 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellate fee was paid on 12/04/2019 as to Appellant Louis Del Favero Orchids, Inc.. [Entered: 12/12/2019 07:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Louis Del Favero Orchids, Inc. on 12/04/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 01/21/2020. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 12/24/2019 as to Appellant Louis Del Favero Orchids, Inc.. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 01/07/2020 as to Appellee Christian Bax [Entered: 12/12/2019 07:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.