This case was last updated from PACER on 10/20/2020 at 06:11:38 (UTC).

Los Padres Forestwatch, et al v. USFS, et al

Case Summary

On 08/21/2020 Los Padres Forestwatch filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against USFS. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-55859

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

LOS PADRES FORESTWATCH

EARTH ISLAND INSTITUTE

CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY

Intervenor Defendant / Appellees

CALIFORNIA FORESTRY ASSOCIATION

AMERICAN FOREST RESOURCE COUNCIL

ASSOCIATED CALIFORNIA LOGGERS

Defendant / Appellees

UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE

UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE

KEVIN ELLIOTT, Supervisor, Los Padres National Forest

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Brian Segee

Attorney at Center for Biological Diversity

660 S. Figueroa Street, Suite 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Justin Augustine

Attorney at Law Office of Justin Augustine

1212 Broadway, Suite 800

Oakland, CA 94612

Intervenor Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Sara Ghafouri

Attorney at American Forest Resource Council

700 Ne Multnomah St., Suite 320

Portland, OR 97232

Lawson Emmett Fite

Attorney at American Forest Resource Council

700 Ne Multnomah St., Suite 320

Portland, OR 97232

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Nicole M. Smith

Attorney at DOJ - US Department of Justice

310 A Street Ne

Washington, DC 20002

Bridget McNeil

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

999 18Th Street, Suite 370 - South Terrace

Denver, CO 80202

Sean Christian Duffy

Attorney at DOJ

150 M Street Ne

Washington, DC 20002

Jeffrey S. Beelaert

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 7415, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-7415

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel is no longer required to file a status report. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11856894] (BLS) [Entered: 10/13/2020 03:53 PM]

#8

(#8) MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 10/28/2020. See order for details. [11849801] (BLS) [Entered: 10/06/2020 04:18 PM]

#7

(#7) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 10/06/2020, 11:30 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11819813] (BLS) [Entered: 09/11/2020 04:24 AM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 09/09/2020, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [11803277] (BLS) [Entered: 08/26/2020 10:43 AM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Center for Biological Diversity, Earth Island Institute and Los Padres Forestwatch Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/24/2020. [11800122] [20-55859] (Augustine, Justin) [Entered: 08/24/2020 12:31 PM]

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel is no longer required to file a status report. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11856894] (BLS) [Entered: 10/13/2020 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 10/28/2020. See order for details. [11849801] (BLS) [Entered: 10/06/2020 04:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 10/06/2020, 11:30 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11819813] (BLS) [Entered: 09/11/2020 04:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • Docket(#6) Added Attorney(s) Jeffrey S. Beelaert for party(s) Appellee USFWS Appellee USFS Appellee Kevin Elliott. [11817105] (RL) [Entered: 09/09/2020 09:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jeffrey S. Beelaert (U.S. Department of Justice, PO Box 7415, Washington, DC 20044) for Appellees Kevin Elliott, USFS and USFWS. Date of service: 09/09/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11816963] [20-55859] (Beelaert, Jeffrey) [Entered: 09/09/2020 08:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 09/09/2020, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [11803277] (BLS) [Entered: 08/26/2020 10:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 08/24/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11800164]. [20-55859] (AD) [Entered: 08/24/2020 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Center for Biological Diversity, Earth Island Institute and Los Padres Forestwatch Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/24/2020. [11800122] [20-55859] (Augustine, Justin) [Entered: 08/24/2020 12:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Center for Biological Diversity, Earth Island Institute and Los Padres Forestwatch Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/28/2020. Transcript ordered by 09/21/2020. Transcript due 10/19/2020. Appellants Center for Biological Diversity, Earth Island Institute and Los Padres Forestwatch opening brief due 11/30/2020. Appellees American Forest Resource Council, Associated California Loggers, California Forestry Association, Kevin Elliott, United States Fish and Wildlife Service and United States Forest Service answering brief due 12/30/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11797967] (JBS) [Entered: 08/21/2020 12:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Forest Resource Council is a litigant

Latest cases where EARTH ISLAND INSTITUTE is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant