This case was last updated from PACER on 05/28/2019 at 06:10:32 (UTC).

Lorine Mitchell v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co.

Case Summary

On 03/29/2019 Lorine Mitchell filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Fire Casualty Co. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-60201

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

LORINE MITCHELL

Defendant / Appellant

STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY

Amicus Curiae

UNITED POLICYHOLDERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Thomas Joseph Snodgrass

Attorney at Larson King, L.L.P.

30 E. 7Th Street

St. Paul, MN 55101

David Malcolm McMullan Jr.

Attorney at Don Barrett, P.A.

404 Court Square, N.

Lexington, MS 39095

James Brandon McWherter

Attorney at Gilbert McWherter Scott Bobbitt, P.L.C.

341 Cool Springs Boulevard

Franklin, TN 37067

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Hal Scot Spragins Esq.

Attorney at Hickman, Goza & Spragins, P.L.L.C.

1305 Madison Avenue, P.O. Box 668

Oxford, MS 38655

Heidi Dalenberg

Attorney at Riley Safer Holmes & Cancila, L.L.P.

70 W. Madison Street

Chicago, IL 60602

Jacob Kahn

Attorney at Riley Safer Holmes & Cancila, L.L.P.

70 W. Madison Street

Chicago, IL 60602

Joseph A. Cancila Jr.

Attorney at Riley Safer Holmes & Cancila, L.L.P.

70 W. Madison Street

Chicago, IL 60602

Amicus Curiae Attorney

Gerald Moses Abdalla Jr.

105 Olympia Fields Drive

Jackson, MS 39211

 

Court Documents

Open Document

PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. [19-60201] (SEP) [Entered: 03/29/2019 07:53 AM]

Open Document #1

MOT-11 Letter

Open Document #2

Transfer from Miscellaneous Docket

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

Redacted Appellant's Brief brief is adopted from 18-60776 on behalf of Appellant State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. Number of copies provided: 7 [19-60201] (MAS) [Entered: 04/09/2019 02:41 PM]

Open Document

The Redacted Record Excerpts brief is adopted from 18-60776 on behalf of Appellant State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. Number of copies provided: 4 [19-60201] (MAS) [Entered: 04/09/2019 02:43 PM]

Open Document

The AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF brief is adopted from 18-60776 on behalf of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America Number of copies provided: 7 [19-60201] (MAS) [Entered: 04/09/2019 03:21 PM]

Open Document

The AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF brief is adopted from 18-60776 on behalf of American Property Casualty Insurance Association, Insurance Coalition of Mississippi and National Association of Mutual Insurance Companies Number of copies provided: 7 [19-60201] (MAS) [Entered: 04/09/2019 03:25 PM]

Open Document #1

BR-9 Letter

Open Document #2

Unfiled Addendum

Open Document #2

Brief Paper Copies Form

Open Document #1

Supplemental Reply Brief Filed

Open Document #1

Redacted Appellee's Supplemental Brief Filed

Open Document #2

Brief Paper Copies Form

Open Document #2

MOT-2 Letter

Open Document #1

Non Dispositive Court Order

Open Document #2

BR-9 Letter

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2019
  • Paper copies of Supplemental Reply Brief filed by Appellant State Farm Fire & Casualty Company in 18-60776, 19-60201 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [18-60776, 19-60201] (SBS) [Entered: 05/21/2019 02:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the addendum to supplemental reply brief received from Appellant State Farm Fire & Casualty Company in 18-60776, 19-60201 because it does not comply with the requirements of Frap 28(f) and 5th Cir. R. 28.7. [18-60776, 19-60201] (AGL) [Entered: 05/17/2019 09:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY BRIEF FILED Date of service: 05/16/2019 # of Copies Provided: 0 Supplemental Reply Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 05/22/2019 for Appellant State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. [18-60776, 19-60201] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY BRIEF FILED by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company in 18-60776, 19-60201 Date of service: 05/16/2019 [18-60776, 19-60201] (Heidi Dalenberg ) [Entered: 05/16/2019 04:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Paper copies of Appellee's Unredacted Supplement Brief filed by Appellee Ms. Lorine Mitchell in 18-60776, 19-60201 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. [18-60776, 19-60201] (SBS) [Entered: 05/15/2019 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REDACTED APPELLEE'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF FILED by Ms. Lorine Mitchell in 18-60776, 19-60201 # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Redacted Brief due on 05/20/2019 for Appellee Lorine Mitchell. [18-60776, 19-60201] (MAS) [Entered: 05/13/2019 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT ORDER granting Motion to place appellee's supplemental brief under seal filed by Appellee Ms. Lorine Mitchell [ # 9050103-2 ]; granting Motion to file redacted appellee's supplemental brief filed by Appellee Ms. Lorine Mitchell [ # 9050103-3 ] [18-60776, 19-60201] (MAS) [Entered: 05/13/2019 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Addendum to Supplemental Appellee's Brief because addendum does not comply with the requirements of Frap32(b), 32(a)(1),(2),(3),(4) and 5th Cir. R. 32 [18-60776, 19-60201] (MAS) [Entered: 05/10/2019 01:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the redacted appellee's supplemental brief received from Appellee Ms. Lorine Mitchell in 18-60776 because you cannot file without leave of court. Your motion to file a redacted supplemental appellee's brief is pending with the court [18-60776, 19-60201] (MAS) [Entered: 05/10/2019 01:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPELLEE'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF FILED by Ms. Lorine Mitchell in 18-60776, 19-60201 # of Copies Provided: 0 E/Res's Supplemental Brief deadline satisfied. Supplemental Reply Brief due on 05/16/2019 for Appellant State Farm Fire & Casualty Company.. Paper Copies of Brief due on 05/15/2019 for Appellee Lorine Mitchell. [18-60776, 19-60201] (MAS) [Entered: 05/10/2019 01:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellee Ms. Lorine Mitchell in 18-60776 to place brief under seal [9050103-2], to file redacted supplemental appellee brief [9050103-3]. Date of service: 05/09/2019 [18-60776, 19-60201] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellee Ms. Lorine Mitchell in 18-60776 to place supplemental brief under seal [9050103-2]. Date of service: 05/09/2019 [18-60776, 19-60201] (MAS) [Entered: 05/10/2019 12:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • The Appellee's Brief brief is adopted from 18-60776 on behalf of Appellee Ms. Lorine Mitchell. Number of copies provided: 7 [19-60201] (MAS) [Entered: 04/09/2019 02:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • The AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF brief is adopted from 18-60776 on behalf of American Property Casualty Insurance Association, Insurance Coalition of Mississippi and National Association of Mutual Insurance Companies Number of copies provided: 7 [19-60201] (MAS) [Entered: 04/09/2019 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • The AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF brief is adopted from 18-60776 on behalf of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America Number of copies provided: 7 [19-60201] (MAS) [Entered: 04/09/2019 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • The Redacted Record Excerpts brief is adopted from 18-60776 on behalf of Appellant State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. Number of copies provided: 4 [19-60201] (MAS) [Entered: 04/09/2019 02:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Redacted Appellant's Brief brief is adopted from 18-60776 on behalf of Appellant State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. Number of copies provided: 7 [19-60201] (MAS) [Entered: 04/09/2019 02:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Record Excerpts unredacted record excerpts is adopted from 18-60776 on behalf of Appellant State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. Number of copies provided: 4 [19-60201] (MAS) [Entered: 04/09/2019 02:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's unredated brief is adopted from 18-60776 on behalf of Appellant State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. Number of copies provided: 7 [19-60201] (MAS) [Entered: 04/09/2019 02:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 3:17-CV-170. Supplemental Electronic ROA due on 04/15/2019. [19-60201] (SEP) [Entered: 03/29/2019 08:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PERMISSION TO APPEAL GRANTED. Case transferred from miscellaneous case number 18-90049. Fee due on 04/12/2019 for Appellant State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. [19-60201] (SEP) [Entered: 03/29/2019 08:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. [19-60201] (SEP) [Entered: 03/29/2019 07:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.