This case was last updated from PACER on 12/30/2019 at 06:05:43 (UTC).

Lorey Lowe v. Lincoln National Life Ins., et al

Case Summary

On 10/31/2019 Lorey Lowe filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Lincoln National Life Ins . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-6249

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

LINCOLN NATIONAL CORPORATION

Plaintiff / Appellant

LOREY LOWE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Edmund Scott Sauer

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings

1600 Division Street, Suite 700

Nashville, TN 37203

Jason Walters

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings

1819 Fifth Avenue, N.

Birmingham, AL 35203

K. Laney Gifford

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings

1819 Fifth Avenue, N.

Birmingham, AL 35203

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Ryan Thomas Russell

Attorney at Alex R. White

908 Minoma Avenue

Louisville, KY 40217

Alex Roberson White

Attorney at Alex R. White PLLC

908 Minoma Avenue

Louisville, KY 40217

David B. Mour

Attorney at Law Office

513 S. Second Street

Louisville, KY 40202

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 01/13/2020. appellee brief now due 02/14/2020. (MLB) [Entered: 12/16/2019 11:51 AM]

#17

(#17) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 12/26/2019. appellee brief now due 01/27/2020. (LMR) [Entered: 12/05/2019 05:27 PM]

#16

(#16) Letter sent by Mediation Office REGARDING MEDIATION: The Mediation Conference scheduled for 11/26/2019 is hereby canceled. (LMR) [Entered: 11/25/2019 11:13 AM]

#15

(#15) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Lorey Lowe by Ryan Thomas Russell. Certificate of Service: 11/20/2019. [19-6249] (RTR) [Entered: 11/20/2019 03:48 PM]

#14

RESTRICTED

#13

(#13) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Lincoln National Corporation and Lincoln National Life Insurance Company by Edmund S. Sauer. Certificate of Service: 11/14/2019. [19-6249] (ESS) [Entered: 11/14/2019 03:53 PM]

#12

(#12) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Lincoln National Corporation and Lincoln National Life Insurance Company by K. Laney Gifford. Certificate of Service: 11/14/2019. [19-6249] (KLG) [Entered: 11/14/2019 03:43 PM]

#11

(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Jason Walters for Appellees Lincoln National Corporation and Lincoln National Life Insurance Company Certificate of Service: 11/14/2019. [19-6249] (JW) [Entered: 11/14/2019 03:39 PM]

#10

(#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Lincoln National Corporation and Lincoln National Life Insurance Company by Jason A. Walters. Certificate of Service: 11/14/2019. [19-6249] (JW) [Entered: 11/14/2019 03:30 PM]

#9

(#9) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. David B. Mour for Appellant Lorey Lowe. Certificate of Service:11/14/2019. [19-6249] (DBM) [Entered: 11/14/2019 01:57 PM]

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. David B. Mour for Appellant Lorey Lowe Certificate of Service: 11/14/2019. [19-6249] (DBM) [Entered: 11/14/2019 01:55 PM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Lorey Lowe by David B Mour. Certificate of Service: 11/14/2019. [19-6249] (DBM) [Entered: 11/14/2019 11:25 AM]

#6

(#6) Copy of Notice of Appeal filed October 31, 2019, at RE #15 from district court filed. (RB) [Entered: 11/04/2019 02:50 PM]

#5

(#5) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 11/26/2019 at 10:00 AM (ET) with Rod McFaull. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 11/01/2019 12:53 PM]

#3

(#3) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 12/10/2019; appellee brief due 01/09/2020. (RLJ) [Entered: 10/31/2019 03:49 PM]

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Lorey Lowe. Transcript needed: n. (RLJ) [Entered: 10/31/2019 03:46 PM]

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 01/13/2020. appellee brief now due 02/14/2020. (MLB) [Entered: 12/16/2019 11:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 12/26/2019. appellee brief now due 01/27/2020. (LMR) [Entered: 12/05/2019 05:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Letter sent by Mediation Office REGARDING MEDIATION: The Mediation Conference scheduled for 11/26/2019 is hereby canceled. (LMR) [Entered: 11/25/2019 11:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Lorey Lowe by Ryan Thomas Russell. Certificate of Service: 11/20/2019. [19-6249] (RTR) [Entered: 11/20/2019 03:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) **LOCKED - DOCUMENT IS BLANK - SEE RE 15 BELOW** APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Lorey Lowe by Ryan Thomas Russell. Certificate of Service: 11/20/2019. [19-6249]--[Edited 11/21/2019 by RLJ] (RTR) [Entered: 11/20/2019 03:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Lincoln National Corporation and Lincoln National Life Insurance Company by Edmund S. Sauer. Certificate of Service: 11/14/2019. [19-6249] (ESS) [Entered: 11/14/2019 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Lincoln National Corporation and Lincoln National Life Insurance Company by K. Laney Gifford. Certificate of Service: 11/14/2019. [19-6249] (KLG) [Entered: 11/14/2019 03:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Jason Walters for Appellees Lincoln National Corporation and Lincoln National Life Insurance Company Certificate of Service: 11/14/2019. [19-6249] (JW) [Entered: 11/14/2019 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Lincoln National Corporation and Lincoln National Life Insurance Company by Jason A. Walters. Certificate of Service: 11/14/2019. [19-6249] (JW) [Entered: 11/14/2019 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. David B. Mour for Appellant Lorey Lowe. Certificate of Service:11/14/2019. [19-6249] (DBM) [Entered: 11/14/2019 01:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. David B. Mour for Appellant Lorey Lowe Certificate of Service: 11/14/2019. [19-6249] (DBM) [Entered: 11/14/2019 01:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Lorey Lowe by David B Mour. Certificate of Service: 11/14/2019. [19-6249] (DBM) [Entered: 11/14/2019 11:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Copy of Notice of Appeal filed October 31, 2019, at RE #15 from district court filed. (RB) [Entered: 11/04/2019 02:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 11/26/2019 at 10:00 AM (ET) with Rod McFaull. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 11/01/2019 12:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • (#4) Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 11/01/2019 12:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 12/10/2019; appellee brief due 01/09/2020. (RLJ) [Entered: 10/31/2019 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • (#2) The case manager for this case is: Robin L. Johnson (RLJ) [Entered: 10/31/2019 03:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Lorey Lowe. Transcript needed: n. (RLJ) [Entered: 10/31/2019 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lincoln National Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David B. Mour

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alex Roberson White