This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:01:02 (UTC).

Lora Simons v. Andrew Saul

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Lora Simons filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Andrew Saul. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2332

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

LORA S. SIMONS

Defendant / Appellee

ANDREW M. SAUL, Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

David W. Sutterfield

Attorney at SUTTERFIELD LAW OFFICES, P.C.

208 S. Second Street

Effingham, IL 62401-3629

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Lu Han

Attorney at SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION

200 W. Adams Street

Chicago, IL 60606-0000

 

Court Documents

#3

RESTRICTED

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

Civil Case

#4

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #3

Notice to District Court

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Monday, August 19, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. RJS [6] [7021296] [19-2332] (PS) [Entered: 08/02/2019 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Appearance form filed by Attorney Lu Han for Appellee Andrew M. Saul. [5] [7018414] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2332] (Han, Lu) [Entered: 07/19/2019 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Lora S. Simons. [4] [7018410] [19-2332] (Sutterfield, David) [Entered: 07/19/2019 03:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Lora S. Simons. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [3] [7018408] [19-2332] (Sutterfield, David) [Entered: 07/19/2019 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney David Sutterfield for Appellant Lora S. Simons. [2] [7018405] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2332] (Sutterfield, David) [Entered: 07/19/2019 03:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) U.S. civil case docketed. IFP pending in the District Court. Transcript information sheet due by 07/29/2019. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Lora S. Simons by 07/19/2019. [1] [7017304] [19-2332] (AD) [Entered: 07/15/2019 03:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.