Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/26/2020 at 06:27:36 (UTC).

Lopez v. The City of Belen, et al

Case Summary

On 07/28/2020 Lopez filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against The City of Belen. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2104

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

ANA LOPEZ, as the personal representative of the estate of Luis Lopez, deceased

Defendant / Appellees

SCOTT CONNER

LEONA VIGIL, in their individual and official capacities

THE CITY OF BELEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Shane Youtz

Attorney at Youtz & Valdez

900 Gold Avenue, Sw

Albuquerque, NM 87102-0000

James Montalbano

Attorney at Youtz & Valdez

900 Gold Avenue, Sw

Albuquerque, NM 87102-0000

Stephen Curtice

Attorney at Youtz & Valdez

900 Gold Avenue, Sw

Albuquerque, NM 87102-0000

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Paula Maynes

Attorney at Miller Stratvert

200 West Devargas Street, Suite 9, P.O. Box 1986

Santa Fe, NM 87504-1986

Virginia Anderman

Attorney at Miller Stratvert

500 Marquette Nw, Suite 1100

Albuquerque, NM 87102

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10765114] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellant's brief and appendix until 10/08/2020 for Ana Lopez. [20-2104] [Entered: 08/24/2020 03:24 PM]

Open Document #2

Mediation Contact Form

Open Document #1

Mediation Conference Notice

Open Document

[10762094] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Virginia Anderman and Ms. Paula Maynes for Leona Vigil, The City of Belen and Scott Conner. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 08/11/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-2104] [Entered: 08/11/2020 01:30 PM]

Open Document

[10762041] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 08/11/2020. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 09/21/2020 for Ana Lopez. [20-2104] [Entered: 08/11/2020 11:36 AM]

Open Document

[10762032] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Stephen Curtice and Mr. Shane Youtz for Ana Lopez. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 08/11/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-2104] [Entered: 08/11/2020 11:28 AM]

Open Document

[10761966] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by Ana Lopez. Transcript ordered: None. Served on: 08/11/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-2104] SC [Entered: 08/11/2020 10:13 AM]

Open Document

[10761962] Docketing statement filed by Ana Lopez. Served on 08/11/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-2104] SC [Entered: 08/11/2020 10:10 AM]

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document #1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10765114] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellant's brief and appendix until 10/08/2020 for Ana Lopez. [20-2104] [Entered: 08/24/2020 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10765095] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Telephone conference scheduled for 09/17/2020 at 10:00 am (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [20-2104] [Entered: 08/24/2020 02:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10762094] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Virginia Anderman and Ms. Paula Maynes for Leona Vigil, The City of Belen and Scott Conner. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 08/11/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-2104] [Entered: 08/11/2020 01:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • Docket[10762073] Entry of appearance submitted by Paula G. Maynes and Virginia Anderman for Appellees Scott Conner, Leona Vigil and The City of Belen for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 08/11/2020. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 08/11/2020 by JJH to remove pdf as pleading filed on 08/11/2020] [20-2104] PM [Entered: 08/11/2020 12:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10762041] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 08/11/2020. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 09/21/2020 for Ana Lopez. [20-2104] [Entered: 08/11/2020 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10762032] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Stephen Curtice and Mr. Shane Youtz for Ana Lopez. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 08/11/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-2104] [Entered: 08/11/2020 11:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • Docket[10761975] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 08/18/2020 for Mitchell R. Elfers, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [20-2104] [Entered: 08/11/2020 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10761966] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by Ana Lopez. Transcript ordered: None. Served on: 08/11/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-2104] SC [Entered: 08/11/2020 10:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • Docket[10761965] Entry of appearance submitted by Shane Youtz, Stephen Curtice for Appellant Ana Lopez for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 08/11/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-2104] --[Edited 08/11/2020 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 8/11/2020.] SC [Entered: 08/11/2020 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10761962] Docketing statement filed by Ana Lopez. Served on 08/11/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-2104] SC [Entered: 08/11/2020 10:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10758601] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/28/2020 Notice of appearance due on 08/11/2020 for Scott Conner,The City of Belen and Leona Vigil. Transcript order form, notice of appearance, and docketing statement due 08/11/2020 for Ana Lopez. [20-2104] [Entered: 07/28/2020 01:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Virginia Anderman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paula Grace Maynes