This case was last updated from PACER on 06/07/2019 at 06:11:13 (UTC).

Lomix Limited Partnership, et al v. BBVA Compass Bank, N.A.

Case Summary

On 04/08/2019 Lomix Limited Partnership filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BBVA Compass Bank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-40308

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Intervenor Plaintiff

MADHAVAN PISHARODI

Plaintiff / Appellants

ROBERT LEKACH

SHE LING WONG

VIKKI MILES RODRIQUEZ

MIGUEL A. MOLINAS

CHARLES W. ZAVALA

BRADLEY W. NORDYKE

LOMIX LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

C. LYNN ANDERSON

GUAJARDO FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

MANUEL G. GUAJARDO

BROWNSVILLE MD VENTURES, L.L.C.

Defendant / Appellee

BBVA COMPASS BANK, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorney

Richard Edward Zayas Esq.

Attorney at Zayas & Hernandez, P.C.

950 E. Van Buren Street

Brownsville, TX 78520

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Christopher Herbert Boswell

Attorney at Curtis & Boswell, L.L.P.

515 E. Harrison

Harlingen, TX 78550-0000

Craig Matthew Sico

Attorney at Sico, Hoelscher, Harris & Braugh, L.L.P.

802 N. Carancahua Street, Frost Bank Plaza

Corpus Christi, TX 78401-0000

Jeffrey H. Richter

Attorney at Sico, Hoelscher, Harris & Braugh, L.L.P.

802 N. Carancahua Street, Frost Bank Plaza

Corpus Christi, TX 78401-0000

Shelby Arthur Jordan

Attorney at Jordan, Hyden, Womble, Culbreth & Holzer, P.C.

500 N. Shoreline Drive

Corpus Christi, TX 78401

Emily Ann Gearhart

Attorney at Ellis, Koeneke & Ramirez, L.L.P.

1101 Chicago Avenue

Mcallen, TX 78501-4822

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Adriana Hernandez Cardenas

Attorney at Atlas, Hall & Rodriguez, L.L.P.

818 Pecan Boulevard

Mcallen, TX 78501

Charles C. Murray

Attorney at Atlas, Hall & Rodriguez, L.L.P.

818 Pecan Boulevard

Mcallen, TX 78501

Joel Joseph Vale Jr.

Attorney at Atlas, Hall & Rodriguez, L.L.P.

818 Pecan Boulevard

Mcallen, TX 78501

 

Court Documents

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Shelby Arthur Jordan for Ms. C. Lynn Anderson and Ms. Vikki Miles Rodriquez for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-40308] (Shelby Arthur Jordan ) [Entered: 04/23/2019 03:35 PM]

Open Document

ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellants Ms. C. Lynn Anderson, Brownsville MD Ventures, L.L.C., Mr. Robert Lekach, Lomix Limited Partnership, Mr. Miguel A. Molinas, Mr. Bradley W. Nordyke, Ms. Vikki Miles Rodriquez, Mr. She Ling Wong and Mr. Charles W. Zavalafor the Court to process. Date of service: 05/09/2019 via US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Boswell; email - Attorney for Appellees: Cardenas, Murray, Vale; Attorney for Appellants: Gearhart, Jordan, Richter, Sico, Zayas. [19-40308] (Craig Matthew Sico ) [Entered: 05/09/2019 04:41 PM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

LETTER filed by Appellants Ms. C. Lynn Anderson, Brownsville MD Ventures, L.L.C., Mr. Robert Lekach, Lomix Limited Partnership, Mr. Miguel A. Molinas, Mr. Bradley W. Nordyke, Ms. Vikki Miles Rodriquez, Mr. She Ling Wong and Mr. Charles W. Zavala Date of Service: 05/10/2019 via US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Boswell; email - Attorney for Appellees: Cardenas, Murray, Vale; Attorney for Appellants: Gearhart, Jordan, Richter, Sico, Zayas [19-40308] (Craig Matthew Sico ) [Entered: 05/10/2019 08:15 AM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: OK to Process with Special Issues to be Briefed. [9028997-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 04/30/2019 for Appellants C. Lynn Anderson, Manuel G. Guajardo, Guajardo Family Limited Partnership, Robert Lekach, Lomix Limited Partnership, Miguel A. Molinas, Bradley W. Nordyke, Madhavan Pisharodi, Vikki Miles Rodriquez, She Ling Wong and Charles W. Zavala [19-40308] (CCR) [Entered: 04/15/2019 09:09 AM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9048965-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 05/24/2019 for Appellant Brownsville MD Ventures, L.L.C. [19-40308] (DMS) [Entered: 05/09/2019 11:29 AM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT received from Court Reporter Ms. Toni Hudson. [19-40308] (Sarah Iris Bejarano Castillo ) [Entered: 05/10/2019 03:19 PM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Ms. C. Lynn Anderson, Mr. Manuel G. Guajardo, Guajardo Family Limited Partnership, Mr. Robert Lekach, Lomix Limited Partnership, Mr. Bradley W. Nordyke, Mr. Madhavan Pisharodi, Ms. Vikki Miles Rodriquez, Mr. She Ling Wong and Mr. Charles W. Zavala [19-40308] (CCR) [Entered: 04/08/2019 12:36 PM]

Open Document #2

BR-9 Letter

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-40308] (Joel Joseph Vale Jr.) [Entered: 04/26/2019 01:18 PM]

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2019
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Toni Hudson, Est. Completion Dt: 06/07/2019, Dt. Fin Arrangements Made: 05/10/2019, Dt. Trans. to be Filed: 06/07/2019, Proceeding Type and Date: Final Pre-Trial Conference 03/05/2019. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment ddl satisfied. Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date is 06/07/2019 for Toni Hudson, Court Reporter [19-40308] (DMS) [Entered: 05/15/2019 11:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT received for court reporter Toni Hudson on 5/10/2019, stating no financial arrangements have been made. [19-40308] (DMS) [Entered: 05/15/2019 11:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT received from Court Reporter Ms. Toni Hudson. from Court Reporter Acknowledgment. [19-40308] (Sarah Iris Bejarano Castillo ) [Entered: 05/13/2019 04:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT received from Court Reporter Ms. Toni Hudson. [19-40308] (Sarah Iris Bejarano Castillo ) [Entered: 05/10/2019 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER filed by Appellants Ms. C. Lynn Anderson, Brownsville MD Ventures, L.L.C., Mr. Robert Lekach, Lomix Limited Partnership, Mr. Miguel A. Molinas, Mr. Bradley W. Nordyke, Ms. Vikki Miles Rodriquez, Mr. She Ling Wong and Mr. Charles W. Zavala Date of Service: 05/10/2019 via US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Boswell; email - Attorney for Appellees: Cardenas, Murray, Vale; Attorney for Appellants: Gearhart, Jordan, Richter, Sico, Zayas [19-40308] (Craig Matthew Sico ) [Entered: 05/10/2019 08:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • TRANSCRIPT FILED IN DISTRICT COURT Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Sheila Elaine Perales Heinz, Dt. Filed in Dist. Ct: 05/08/2019 Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date canceled [19-40308] (DMS) [Entered: 05/10/2019 08:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Ms. C. Lynn Anderson, Brownsville MD Ventures, L.L.C., Mr. Robert Lekach, Lomix Limited Partnership, Mr. Miguel A. Molinas, Mr. Bradley W. Nordyke, Ms. Vikki Miles Rodriquez, Mr. She Ling Wong and Mr. Charles W. Zavala. DETAILS: Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Toni Hudson, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Conference 03/05/2019. Transcript Order ddl satisfied. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment due on 05/20/2019 for Toni Elaine Perales Hudson, Court Reporter. Electronic Filing Processed: [ # 9049538-2 ] [19-40308] (DMS) [Entered: 05/10/2019 08:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellants Ms. C. Lynn Anderson, Brownsville MD Ventures, L.L.C., Mr. Robert Lekach, Lomix Limited Partnership, Mr. Miguel A. Molinas, Mr. Bradley W. Nordyke, Ms. Vikki Miles Rodriquez, Mr. She Ling Wong and Mr. Charles W. Zavalafor the Court to process. Date of service: 05/09/2019 via US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Boswell; email - Attorney for Appellees: Cardenas, Murray, Vale; Attorney for Appellants: Gearhart, Jordan, Richter, Sico, Zayas. [19-40308] (Craig Matthew Sico ) [Entered: 05/09/2019 04:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9048965-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 05/24/2019 for Appellant Brownsville MD Ventures, L.L.C. [19-40308] (DMS) [Entered: 05/09/2019 11:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Jeffrey H. Richter for party(s) Appellant Lomix Limited Partnership Appellant Charles W. Zavala Appellant Brownsville MD Ventures, L.L.C. Appellant Bradley W. Nordyke Appellant Vikki Miles Rodriquez Appellant C. Lynn Anderson Appellant She Ling Wong Appellant Miguel A. Molinas Appellant Robert Lekach, in case 19-40308 [19-40308] (Noticing info changed from Lead to Co-Counsel in light of letter filed on 5/10/19.) (DMS) [Entered: 05/09/2019 09:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-40308] (Joel Joseph Vale Jr.) [Entered: 04/26/2019 01:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Emily Ann Gearhart for Appellant Manuel G. Guajardo in 19-40308, Attorney Emily Ann Gearhart for Appellant Guajardo Family Limited Partnership in 19-40308 [19-40308] (CB) [Entered: 04/26/2019 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Ms. C. Lynn Anderson, Mr. Robert Lekach, Lomix Limited Partnership, Mr. Miguel A. Molinas, Mr. Bradley W. Nordyke, Ms. Vikki Miles Rodriquez, Mr. She Ling Wong and Mr. Charles W. Zavala. DETAILS: Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Sheila Elaine Perales Heinz, Proceeding Type and Date: Motion Hearing 08/15/2016 , Telephone Conference 11/14/2016 , Telephone Conference 01/09/2017 , Motion Hearing 08/01/2018 , Pre-Trial Conference 03/05/2019. Transcript Order ddl satisfied. Electronic Filing Processed: [ # 9033252-2 ] [19-40308] (DMS) [Entered: 04/25/2019 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Shelby Arthur Jordan for Appellant Vikki Miles Rodriquez in 19-40308, Attorney Shelby Arthur Jordan for Appellant C. Lynn Anderson in 19-40308 [19-40308] (DMS) [Entered: 04/25/2019 08:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Emily Ann Gearhart for Guajardo Family Limited Partnership and Mr. Manuel G. Guajardo for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-40308] (Emily Ann Gearhart ) [Entered: 04/24/2019 02:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Shelby Arthur Jordan for Ms. C. Lynn Anderson and Ms. Vikki Miles Rodriquez for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-40308] (Shelby Arthur Jordan ) [Entered: 04/23/2019 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Appearance Form filed 4/19/2019 because Attorney, Mr. Sico listed a party that is not a party on our docket (Brownsivlle MD Ventures) [19-40308] (DMS) [Entered: 04/25/2019 03:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellants Ms. C. Lynn Anderson, Mr. Robert Lekach, Lomix Limited Partnership, Mr. Miguel A. Molinas, Mr. Bradley W. Nordyke, Ms. Vikki Miles Rodriquez, Mr. She Ling Wong and Mr. Charles W. Zavalafor the Court to process. Date of service: 04/19/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Boswell, Gearhart, Jordan, Sico, Zayas; Attorney for Appellees: Cardenas, Murray; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Boswell. [19-40308] (Craig Matthew Sico ) [Entered: 04/19/2019 08:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: OK to Process with Special Issues to be Briefed. [9028997-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 04/30/2019 for Appellants C. Lynn Anderson, Manuel G. Guajardo, Guajardo Family Limited Partnership, Robert Lekach, Lomix Limited Partnership, Miguel A. Molinas, Bradley W. Nordyke, Madhavan Pisharodi, Vikki Miles Rodriquez, She Ling Wong and Charles W. Zavala [19-40308] (CCR) [Entered: 04/15/2019 09:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Ms. C. Lynn Anderson, Mr. Manuel G. Guajardo, Guajardo Family Limited Partnership, Mr. Robert Lekach, Lomix Limited Partnership, Mr. Bradley W. Nordyke, Mr. Madhavan Pisharodi, Ms. Vikki Miles Rodriquez, Mr. She Ling Wong and Mr. Charles W. Zavala [19-40308] (CCR) [Entered: 04/08/2019 12:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.