This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/23/2021 at 06:12:28 (UTC).

Local Union 97, International v. Niagara Mohawk Power Corporati

Case Summary

On 09/24/2021 Local Union 97, International filed a Labor - National Labor Relations Act lawsuit against Niagara Mohawk Power Corporati. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2443

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - National Labor Relations Act

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

Local Union 97, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO

Defendant / Appellant

Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation, DBA National Grid

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Brian J. LaClair

Attorney at Blitman & King LLP

Franklin Center, 443 North Franklin Street

Syracuse, NY 13204

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Robert A. LaBerge

Attorney at Bond, Schoeneck & King, PLLC

1 Lincoln Center, 110 West Fayette Street

Syracuse, NY 13202

Hannah K. Redmond Esq.

Attorney at Bond, Schoeneck & King, PLLC

1 Lincoln Center, 110 West Fayette Street

Syracuse, NY 13202

 

Court Documents

#31

(#31) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Amended Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 11/30/2021, Start Time: 5:00 PM, Required Attendees: Counsel, with Dean W.M. Leslie, ENTERED.[3206919] [21-2443] [Entered: 11/08/2021 08:49 AM]

#30

(#30) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Amended Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 11/10/2021, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Counsel, with Dean W.M. Leslie, ENTERED.[3203730] [21-2443] [Entered: 11/02/2021 10:24 AM]

#29

(#29) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Amended Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 11/08/2021, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Counsel, with Dean W.M. Leslie, ENTERED.[3196860] [21-2443] [Entered: 10/21/2021 11:24 AM]

#28

(#28) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation Brief due date as 01/04/2022. Joint Appendix due date as 01/04/2022, FILED.[3190605] [21-2443] [Entered: 10/12/2021 03:13 PM]

#26

(#26) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation, FILED. Service date 10/12/2021 by CM/ECF. [3190154] [21-2443] [Entered: 10/12/2021 10:03 AM]

#23

(#23) NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[3188661] [21-2443] [Entered: 10/07/2021 01:14 PM]

20 #2

Supporting Document

20 #1

Form C FILED

#19

(#19) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [11], on behalf of Appellant Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation, FILED.[3188474] [21-2443] [Entered: 10/07/2021 11:05 AM]

10 #2

Supporting Document

10 #1

Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance FILED

#9

5 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

5 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#4

#3

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Amended Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 11/30/2021, Start Time: 5:00 PM, Required Attendees: Counsel, with Dean W.M. Leslie, ENTERED.[3206919] [21-2443] [Entered: 11/08/2021 08:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Amended Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 11/10/2021, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Counsel, with Dean W.M. Leslie, ENTERED.[3203730] [21-2443] [Entered: 11/02/2021 10:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Amended Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 11/08/2021, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Counsel, with Dean W.M. Leslie, ENTERED.[3196860] [21-2443] [Entered: 10/21/2021 11:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation Brief due date as 01/04/2022. Joint Appendix due date as 01/04/2022, FILED.[3190605] [21-2443] [Entered: 10/12/2021 03:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ATTORNEY, Hannah K. Redmond for Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation, in case 21-2443, [ # 26 ], ADDED.[3190594] [21-2443] [Entered: 10/12/2021 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation, FILED. Service date 10/12/2021 by CM/ECF. [3190154] [21-2443] [Entered: 10/12/2021 10:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[3188661] [21-2443] [Entered: 10/07/2021 01:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) CURED DEFECTIVE Form C [ # 19 ], [ # 20 ], on behalf of Appellant Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation, FILED.[3188651] [21-2443] [Entered: 10/07/2021 01:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation, FILED. Service date 10/07/2021 by CM/ECF.[3188564] [21-2443] [Entered: 10/07/2021 11:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [11], on behalf of Appellant Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation, FILED.[3188474] [21-2443] [Entered: 10/07/2021 11:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation, informing Court of proposed due date 01/04/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 10/06/2021 by CM/ECF.[3187579] [21-2443] [Entered: 10/06/2021 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation, FILED. Service date 10/06/2021 by CM/ECF.[3187576] [21-2443] [Entered: 10/06/2021 10:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • Docket(#11) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation, FILED. Service date 10/06/2021 by CM/ECF.[3187573] [21-2443] [Entered: 10/06/2021 10:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation, FILED. Service date 10/06/2021 by CM/ECF.[3187567] [21-2443] [Entered: 10/06/2021 10:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Local Union 97, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO, FILED. Service date 09/29/2021 by CM/ECF.[3183124] [21-2443] [Entered: 09/29/2021 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3182904] [21-2443] [Entered: 09/29/2021 08:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 08/25/2021, RECEIVED.[3182900] [21-2443] [Entered: 09/29/2021 08:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER, dated 08/25/2021, RECEIVED.[3182892] [21-2443] [Entered: 09/29/2021 08:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • Docket(#2) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation, district court receipt # ANYNDC-5657854, FILED.[3182891] [21-2443] [Entered: 09/29/2021 08:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation, FILED. [3182885] [21-2443] [Entered: 09/29/2021 08:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Niagara Mohawk Power Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where Local Union No. 139 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers and Employers Labor Managment Cooperative Trust is a litigant