This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:01:31 (UTC).

LoanDepot.com LLC v. CrossCountry Mortgage Inc, et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 LoanDepot com LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CrossCountry Mortgage Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2566

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants and Defendant / Appellees

MATTHEW REID

ANDREA MANARA

Defendant / Appellant

CROSSCOUNTRY MORTGAGE INC

Defendant / Appellees

JUSTIN LIEBERMAN

MATTHEW REID

ANDREA MANARA

Plaintiff / Appellee

LOANDEPOT.COM LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee and Defendant Attorneys

Leigh A. Decotiis Esq.

Attorney at Gibbons

One Gateway Center

Newark, NJ 07102

Kevin W. Weber Esq.

Attorney at Gibbons

One Gateway Center

Newark, NJ 07102

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Jennifer L. Del Medico Esq.

Attorney at Jones Day

250 Vesey Street

New York, NY 10281

Michael A. Platt Esq.

Attorney at Jones Day

901 Lakeside Avenue, North Point

Cleveland, OH 44114

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Kathleen M. Caminiti Esq.

Attorney at Fisher & Phillips

430 Mountain Avenue, Suite 303

Murray Hill, NJ 07974

Sarah Wieselthier Esq.

Attorney at Fisher & Phillips

430 Mountain Avenue, Suite 303

Murray Hill, NJ 07974

David J. Treibman Esq.

Attorney at Fisher & Phillips

430 Mountain Avenue, Suite 303

Murray Hill, NJ 07974

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kevin W. Weber, Esq. on behalf of Appellant(s) Justin Lieberman. [19-2565, 19-2566] (KWW) [Entered: 08/01/2019 01:39 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Megan M. Admire, Esq. on behalf of Appellant(s) Justin Lieberman. [19-2565, 19-2566] (MMA) [Entered: 08/01/2019 01:36 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee LoanDepot.com LLC, filed. [19-2566] (KMC) [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:57 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from David J. Treibman on behalf of Appellee(s) loanDepot.com, LLC. [19-2565, 19-2566] (DJT) [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:34 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: DUPLICATE Joint Response filed by Appellants Justin Lieberman and CrossCountry Mortgage Inc to clerk order. Certificate of Service dated 07/29/2019. [19-2565, 19-2566]--[Edited 07/30/2019 by CJG] (KWW) [Entered: 07/29/2019 03:49 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Joint Response filed by Appellants Justin Lieberman and CrossCountry Mortgage Inc to clerk order advising of possible dismissal. Certificate of Service dated 07/29/2019. [19-2565, 19-2566]--[Edited 07/30/2019 by CJG to spread to both appeals.] (MAP) [Entered: 07/29/2019 03:07 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant CrossCountry Mortgage Inc advising this court that transcripts are not needed. [19-2566] (MAP) [Entered: 07/29/2019 03:00 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant CrossCountry Mortgage Inc, received. [19-2566] (MAP) [Entered: 07/29/2019 02:59 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant CrossCountry Mortgage Inc, filed. [19-2566] (MAP) [Entered: 07/29/2019 02:57 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant CrossCountry Mortgage Inc, filed. [19-2566] (MAP) [Entered: 07/29/2019 02:55 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: RESPONSE filed by Appellee LoanDepot.com LLC in 19-2565, 19-2566 addressing jurisdictional issue, filed. Certificate of Service dated 07/29/2019 by ECF. [19-2565, 19-2566]--[Edited 07/30/2019 by CJG] (KMC) [Entered: 07/29/2019 02:51 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael A. Platt on behalf of Appellant(s) CrossCountry Mortgage, Inc.. [19-2566] (MAP) [Entered: 07/25/2019 02:34 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER Appellants seek review of the portion of the District Courts order entered June 26, 2019, that denied the motion to stay the claims against the remaining defendants pending arbitration. The order on appeal may not be final within the meaning of 9 U.S.C. 16 and may not be otherwise immediately appealable. All parties must file written responses addressing this issue, with a certificate of service attached, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order., filed. [19-2565, 19-2566] (LMR) [Entered: 07/15/2019 01:22 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER The appeals at Nos. 19-2565 and 19-2566 are hereby consolidated for purposes of scheduling, joint appendix, Appellees brief, and disposition. Appellants are encouraged to consult with one another regarding the contents of their briefs as the Court disfavors repetitive briefs. Appellants may file a consolidated brief or join in or adopt portions by reference. See Fed. R. App. P. 28(i). Appellees brief must be filed and served within thirty (30) days of the date of service of the last Appellants brief., filed. [19-2565, 19-2566] (LMR) [Entered: 07/15/2019 01:18 PM]

Open Document

Appendix Citation Notice sent to Leigh A. Decotiis, Esq., Kevin W. Weber, Esq., Kathleen M. Caminiti, Esq., Leigh A. Decotiis, Esq., Jennifer L. Del Medico, Esq., Sarah Wieselthier, Esq. in 19-2565, Jennifer L. Del Medico, Esq., Kathleen M. Caminiti, Esq., Leigh A. Decotiis, Esq., Kevin W. Weber, Esq., Sarah Wieselthier, Esq. in 19-2566. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 07/29/2019. [19-2565, 19-2566] (LMR) [Entered: 07/15/2019 01:12 PM]

Open Document #1

Case Opening Letter

Open Document #4

Notice of Appeal

Open Document #5

ORDER

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kevin W. Weber, Esq. on behalf of Appellant(s) Justin Lieberman. [19-2565, 19-2566] (KWW) [Entered: 08/01/2019 01:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Megan M. Admire, Esq. on behalf of Appellant(s) Justin Lieberman. [19-2565, 19-2566] (MMA) [Entered: 08/01/2019 01:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee LoanDepot.com LLC, filed. [19-2566] (KMC) [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from David J. Treibman on behalf of Appellee(s) loanDepot.com, LLC. [19-2565, 19-2566] (DJT) [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DUPLICATE Joint Response filed by Appellants Justin Lieberman and CrossCountry Mortgage Inc to clerk order. Certificate of Service dated 07/29/2019. [19-2565, 19-2566]--[Edited 07/30/2019 by CJG] (KWW) [Entered: 07/29/2019 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Joint Response filed by Appellants Justin Lieberman and CrossCountry Mortgage Inc to clerk order advising of possible dismissal. Certificate of Service dated 07/29/2019. [19-2565, 19-2566]--[Edited 07/30/2019 by CJG to spread to both appeals.] (MAP) [Entered: 07/29/2019 03:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant CrossCountry Mortgage Inc advising this court that transcripts are not needed. [19-2566] (MAP) [Entered: 07/29/2019 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant CrossCountry Mortgage Inc, received. [19-2566] (MAP) [Entered: 07/29/2019 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant CrossCountry Mortgage Inc, filed. [19-2566] (MAP) [Entered: 07/29/2019 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant CrossCountry Mortgage Inc, filed. [19-2566] (MAP) [Entered: 07/29/2019 02:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: RESPONSE filed by Appellee LoanDepot.com LLC in 19-2565, 19-2566 addressing jurisdictional issue, filed. Certificate of Service dated 07/29/2019 by ECF. [19-2565, 19-2566]--[Edited 07/30/2019 by CJG] (KMC) [Entered: 07/29/2019 02:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael A. Platt on behalf of Appellant(s) CrossCountry Mortgage, Inc.. [19-2566] (MAP) [Entered: 07/25/2019 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER Appellants seek review of the portion of the District Courts order entered June 26, 2019, that denied the motion to stay the claims against the remaining defendants pending arbitration. The order on appeal may not be final within the meaning of 9 U.S.C. 16 and may not be otherwise immediately appealable. All parties must file written responses addressing this issue, with a certificate of service attached, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order., filed. [19-2565, 19-2566] (LMR) [Entered: 07/15/2019 01:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER The appeals at Nos. 19-2565 and 19-2566 are hereby consolidated for purposes of scheduling, joint appendix, Appellees brief, and disposition. Appellants are encouraged to consult with one another regarding the contents of their briefs as the Court disfavors repetitive briefs. Appellants may file a consolidated brief or join in or adopt portions by reference. See Fed. R. App. P. 28(i). Appellees brief must be filed and served within thirty (30) days of the date of service of the last Appellants brief., filed. [19-2565, 19-2566] (LMR) [Entered: 07/15/2019 01:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appendix Citation Notice sent to Leigh A. Decotiis, Esq., Kevin W. Weber, Esq., Kathleen M. Caminiti, Esq., Leigh A. Decotiis, Esq., Jennifer L. Del Medico, Esq., Sarah Wieselthier, Esq. in 19-2565, Jennifer L. Del Medico, Esq., Kathleen M. Caminiti, Esq., Leigh A. Decotiis, Esq., Kevin W. Weber, Esq., Sarah Wieselthier, Esq. in 19-2566. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 07/29/2019. [19-2565, 19-2566] (LMR) [Entered: 07/15/2019 01:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (LMR) [Entered: 07/15/2019 01:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant CrossCountry Mortgage Inc in District Court No. 2-18-cv-12091. (LMR) [Entered: 07/15/2019 01:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.