This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 06:01:28

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 a Contract - Other Contract case was filed by LoanDepot com LLC against CrossCountry Mortgage Inc, in the jurisdiction of U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit.

Case Details

  • Case Number 19-2565
  • Filing Date 07/15/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Contract - Other Contract
  • Jurisdiction U.S. Courts Of Appeals
  • Courthouse U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

Party Details

  • Defendant / Appellee CROSSCOUNTRY MORTGAGE INC
  • Represented By
    • Jennifer L. Del Medico Esq.
  • Defendant / Appellee MATTHEW REID
  • Represented By
    • Leigh A. Decotiis Esq.
    • Kevin W. Weber Esq.
  • Plaintiff / Appellee LOANDEPOT.COM LLC
  • Represented By
    • Kathleen M. Caminiti Esq.
    • Sarah Wieselthier Esq.
    • David J. Treibman Esq.
  • Defendant / Appellant JUSTIN LIEBERMAN
  • Represented By
    • Leigh A. Decotiis Esq.
    • Kevin W. Weber Esq.
    • Megan M. Admire Esq.
  • Defendant / Appellee ANDREA MANARA
  • Represented By
    • Leigh A. Decotiis Esq.
    • Kevin W. Weber Esq.
  • Defendant ANDREA MANARA
  • Represented By
    • Leigh A. Decotiis Esq.
    • Kevin W. Weber Esq.
    • Megan M. Admire Esq.
  • Defendant MATTHEW REID
  • Represented By
    • Leigh A. Decotiis Esq.
    • Kevin W. Weber Esq.
    • Megan M. Admire Esq.

Court Documents

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Megan M. Admire, Esq. on...

Fees Apply
Open Document

ECF FILER: DUPLICATE Joint Response filed by Appellants Just...

Fees Apply
Open Document

ECF FILER: Joint Response filed by Appellants Justin Lieberm...

Fees Apply
Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kevin W. Weber, Esq. on ...

Fees Apply
Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from David J. Treibman on beh...

Fees Apply
Open Document

ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by ...

Fees Apply
Open Document

FOLLOW UP LETTER to Jennifer L. Del Medico, Esq. for CrossCo...

Fees Apply
Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kevin W. Weber on behalf...

Fees Apply
Open Document

ECF FILER: RESPONSE filed by Appellee LoanDepot.com LLC in 1...

Fees Apply
Open Document

ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellan...

Fees Apply
Open Document

ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee LoanDe...

Fees Apply
Open Document

ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Ju...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2019
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kevin W. Weber, Esq. on behalf of Appellant(s) Justin Lieberman. [19-2565, 19-2566] (KWW) [Entered: 08/01/2019 01:39 PM]
  • 08/01/2019
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Megan M. Admire, Esq. on behalf of Appellant(s) Justin Lieberman. [19-2565, 19-2566] (MMA) [Entered: 08/01/2019 01:36 PM]
  • 08/01/2019
  • FOLLOW UP LETTER to Jennifer L. Del Medico, Esq. for CrossCountry Mortgage Inc requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form and Disclosure Statement on or before 08/15/2019. (LMR) [Entered: 08/01/2019 11:08 AM]
  • 07/30/2019
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee LoanDepot.com LLC, filed. [19-2565] (KMC) [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:56 PM]
  • 07/30/2019
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from David J. Treibman on behalf of Appellee(s) loanDepot.com, LLC. [19-2565, 19-2566] (DJT) [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:34 PM]
  • 07/29/2019
  • ECF FILER: Joint Response filed by Appellants Justin Lieberman and CrossCountry Mortgage Inc to clerk order advising of possible dismissal. Certificate of Service dated 07/29/2019. [19-2565, 19-2566]--[Edited 07/30/2019 by CJG to spread to both appeals.] (MAP) [Entered: 07/29/2019 03:07 PM]
  • 07/29/2019
  • ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Justin Lieberman in 19-2565, received. (KWW) [Entered: 07/29/2019 04:00 PM]
  • 07/29/2019
  • ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Justin Lieberman in 19-2565, filed. (KWW) [Entered: 07/29/2019 03:58 PM]
  • 07/29/2019
  • ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Justin Lieberman in 19-2565 advising this court that transcripts are not needed. (KWW) [Entered: 07/29/2019 03:55 PM]
  • 07/29/2019
  • ECF FILER: DUPLICATE Joint Response filed by Appellants Justin Lieberman and CrossCountry Mortgage Inc to clerk order. Certificate of Service dated 07/29/2019. [19-2565, 19-2566]--[Edited 07/30/2019 by CJG] (KWW) [Entered: 07/29/2019 03:49 PM]
  • 07/29/2019
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kevin W. Weber on behalf of Appellant Justin Lieberman, & Appellees Matthew Reid, Andrea Manara.--[Edited 07/30/2019 by CJG] (KWW) [Entered: 07/29/2019 03:17 PM]
  • 07/29/2019
  • ECF FILER: RESPONSE filed by Appellee LoanDepot.com LLC in 19-2565, 19-2566 addressing jurisdictional issue, filed. Certificate of Service dated 07/29/2019 by ECF. [19-2565, 19-2566]--[Edited 07/30/2019 by CJG] (KMC) [Entered: 07/29/2019 02:51 PM]
  • 07/19/2019
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kathleen McLeod Caminiti, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) loanDepot.com LLC. [19-2565] (KMC) [Entered: 07/19/2019 03:12 PM]
  • 07/17/2019
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Megan M. Admire on behalf of Appellant(s) Justin Lieberman, Matthew Reid, and Andrea Manara. [19-2565] (MMA) [Entered: 07/17/2019 11:25 AM]
  • 07/15/2019
  • CLERK ORDER Appellants seek review of the portion of the District Courts order entered June 26, 2019, that denied the motion to stay the claims against the remaining defendants pending arbitration. The order on appeal may not be final within the meaning of 9 U.S.C. 16 and may not be otherwise immediately appealable. All parties must file written responses addressing this issue, with a certificate of service attached, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order., filed. [19-2565, 19-2566] (LMR) [Entered: 07/15/2019 01:22 PM]
  • 07/15/2019
  • CLERK ORDER The appeals at Nos. 19-2565 and 19-2566 are hereby consolidated for purposes of scheduling, joint appendix, Appellees brief, and disposition. Appellants are encouraged to consult with one another regarding the contents of their briefs as the Court disfavors repetitive briefs. Appellants may file a consolidated brief or join in or adopt portions by reference. See Fed. R. App. P. 28(i). Appellees brief must be filed and served within thirty (30) days of the date of service of the last Appellants brief., filed. [19-2565, 19-2566] (LMR) [Entered: 07/15/2019 01:18 PM]
  • 07/15/2019
  • Appendix Citation Notice sent to Leigh A. Decotiis, Esq., Kevin W. Weber, Esq., Kathleen M. Caminiti, Esq., Leigh A. Decotiis, Esq., Jennifer L. Del Medico, Esq., Sarah Wieselthier, Esq. in 19-2565, Jennifer L. Del Medico, Esq., Kathleen M. Caminiti, Esq., Leigh A. Decotiis, Esq., Kevin W. Weber, Esq., Sarah Wieselthier, Esq. in 19-2566. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 07/29/2019. [19-2565, 19-2566] (LMR) [Entered: 07/15/2019 01:12 PM]
  • 07/15/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (LMR) [Entered: 07/15/2019 12:34 PM]
  • 07/15/2019
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Justin Lieberman in District Court No. 2-18-cv-12091. (LMR) [Entered: 07/15/2019 12:28 PM]

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.