This case was last updated from PACER on 05/26/2019 at 06:09:09 (UTC).

LM Insurance Corporation v. Dubuque Barge and Fleeting Svc

Case Summary

On 03/27/2019 LM Insurance Corporation filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Dubuque Barge and Fleeting Svc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1647

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

LM Insurance Corporation

Defendant / Appellee

Dubuque Barge and Fleeting Service Company, doing business as Newt Marine Service

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Mark William Thomas

Attorney at GREFE & SIDNEY

Suite 200, 500 E. Court Avenue

Des Moines, IA 50309

Aaron Wehde Lindebak

Attorney at GREFE & SIDNEY

Suite 200, 500 E. Court Avenue

Des Moines, IA 50309

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

David J. Dutton

Attorney at DUTTON & BRAUN

3151 Brockway Road, P.O. Box 810

Waterloo, IA 50704-0000

Joshua Matthew Moon

Attorney at DUTTON & BRAUN

3151 Brockway Road, P.O. Box 810

Waterloo, IA 50704-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by LM Insurance Corporation. w/service 05/09/2019 , Length: 3,300 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM LM Insurance Corporation due 05/14/2019 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs . Brief of Appellee Dubuque Barge and Fleeting Service Company due on 06/10/2019 [4785962] [19-1647] (MER) [Entered: 05/09/2019 11:26 AM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellant LM Insurance Corporation , w/service 05/08/2019 [4785836] [19-1647] (MER) [Entered: 05/09/2019 09:49 AM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

Addendum deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Aaron Wehde Lindebak for Appellant LM Insurance Corporation. [4785432] [19-1647] (MER) [Entered: 05/08/2019 10:17 AM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellee Dubuque Barge and Fleeting Service Company. w/service 04/23/2019 [4780330] [19-1647] (JMM) [Entered: 04/23/2019 10:18 AM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant LM Insurance Corporation - w/service 04/17/2019. [4778577] [19-1647] (AWL) [Entered: 04/17/2019 10:12 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Mark W. Thomas for Appellant LM Insurance Corporation w/service 04/01/2019 [4772700] [19-1647] (MWT) [Entered: 04/01/2019 01:31 PM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant LM Insurance Corporation. - FOR CAL [4772651] [19-1647] (AWL) [Entered: 04/01/2019 12:06 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Aaron Wehde Lindebak for Appellant LM Insurance Corporation w/service 03/29/2019 [4772379] [19-1647] (AWL) [Entered: 03/29/2019 04:06 PM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Dubuque Barge and Fleeting Service Company. - FOR CAL [4772362] [19-1647] (JMM) [Entered: 03/29/2019 03:44 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Joshua M. Moon for Appellee Dubuque Barge and Fleeting Service Company w/service 03/29/2019 [4772361] [19-1647] (JMM) [Entered: 03/29/2019 03:42 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by David J. Dutton for Appellee Dubuque Barge and Fleeting Service Company w/service 03/29/2019 [4772281] [19-1647] (DJD) [Entered: 03/29/2019 01:42 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 05/07/2019. BRIEF OF APPELLANT LM Insurance Corporation due 05/07/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4771711] [19-1647] (AEV) [Entered: 03/28/2019 12:14 PM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Ruling on motions for summary judgment 3/8/19, Judgment 3/8/19, docket entries, [4771709] [19-1647] (AEV) [Entered: 03/28/2019 12:12 PM]

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2019
  • Paper copies Appellant/Petitioner Brief, [ # 4785962-2 ] filed by LM Insurance Corporation 10 paper copies received. w/Addendum attached [4788191] [19-1647] (JPP) [Entered: 05/16/2019 10:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • RECORD FILED - JOINT APPENDIX, 1 volume, Location STL, Comments: 3 copies [4786076] [19-1647] (MER) [Entered: 05/09/2019 02:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by LM Insurance Corporation. w/service 05/09/2019 , Length: 3,300 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM LM Insurance Corporation due 05/14/2019 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs . Brief of Appellee Dubuque Barge and Fleeting Service Company due on 06/10/2019 [4785962] [19-1647] (MER) [Entered: 05/09/2019 11:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPELLANT brief of LM Insurance Corporation submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4785925] [19-1647] (AWL) [Entered: 05/09/2019 10:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Brief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Aaron W. Lindebak for Appellant LM Insurance Corporation. [4785839] [19-1647] (MER) [Entered: 05/09/2019 09:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellant LM Insurance Corporation , w/service 05/08/2019 [4785836] [19-1647] (MER) [Entered: 05/09/2019 09:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by LM Insurance Corporation. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [4785751] [19-1647] (AWL) [Entered: 05/08/2019 06:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Addendum deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Aaron Wehde Lindebak for Appellant LM Insurance Corporation. [4785432] [19-1647] (MER) [Entered: 05/08/2019 10:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPELLANT brief of LM Insurance Corporation submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4785187] [19-1647] ATTACHED DOCUMENT REPLACED TO CORRECT COVER--[Edited 05/09/2019 by MER] (AWL) [Entered: 05/07/2019 02:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellee Dubuque Barge and Fleeting Service Company. w/service 04/23/2019 [4780330] [19-1647] (JMM) [Entered: 04/23/2019 10:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant LM Insurance Corporation - w/service 04/17/2019. [4778577] [19-1647] (AWL) [Entered: 04/17/2019 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Mark W. Thomas for Appellant LM Insurance Corporation w/service 04/01/2019 [4772700] [19-1647] (MWT) [Entered: 04/01/2019 01:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant LM Insurance Corporation. - FOR CAL [4772651] [19-1647] (AWL) [Entered: 04/01/2019 12:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Aaron Wehde Lindebak for Appellant LM Insurance Corporation w/service 03/29/2019 [4772379] [19-1647] (AWL) [Entered: 03/29/2019 04:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Dubuque Barge and Fleeting Service Company. - FOR CAL [4772362] [19-1647] (JMM) [Entered: 03/29/2019 03:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Joshua M. Moon for Appellee Dubuque Barge and Fleeting Service Company w/service 03/29/2019 [4772361] [19-1647] (JMM) [Entered: 03/29/2019 03:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by David J. Dutton for Appellee Dubuque Barge and Fleeting Service Company w/service 03/29/2019 [4772281] [19-1647] (DJD) [Entered: 03/29/2019 01:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 05/07/2019. BRIEF OF APPELLANT LM Insurance Corporation due 05/07/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4771711] [19-1647] (AEV) [Entered: 03/28/2019 12:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Ruling on motions for summary judgment 3/8/19, Judgment 3/8/19, docket entries, [4771709] [19-1647] (AEV) [Entered: 03/28/2019 12:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case docketed. [4771708] [19-1647] (AEV) [Entered: 03/28/2019 12:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less