This case was last updated from PACER on 05/07/2019 at 06:04:35 (UTC).

Liviz v. Baker, et al

Case Summary

On 03/08/2019 Liviz filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Baker. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1224

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

MICHAEL L. PARSON, Governor

DAVID IGE, Governor

JAY ROBERT PRITZKER, Governor

WILLIAM ASA HUTCHINSON, Governor

KAY E. IVEY, Governor

RONALD D. DESANTIS, Governor

GARY R. HERBERT, Governor

JANET T. MILLS, Governor

JOHN KEVIN STITT, Governor

CHARLES D. BAKER, Governor

GAVIN NEWSOM, Governor

ERIC J. HOLCOMB, Governor

MATT G. BEVIN, Governor

STEVE C. BULLOCK, Governor

HENRY D. MCMASTER, Governor

BRADLEY J. LITTLE, Governor

JAMES C. JUSTICE, Governor

JOHN BEL EDWARDS, Governor

MARK GORDON, Governor

STEVE F. SISOLAK, Governor

28 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Kwame Raoul

Attorney at Office of the Illinois Attorney General

100 W. Randolph St.

Chicago, IL 60601-0000

Steve Marshall

Attorney at Office of Attorney General

11 S. Union St.

Montgomery, AL 36130-0000

Aaron M. Frey

Attorney at ME Attorney General's Office

6 State House Station

Augusta, ME 04333-0006

Maura T. Healey

Attorney at MA Attorney General's Office

1 Ashburton Pl

Boston, MA 02108-0000

Lawrence G. Wasden

P.O. Box 83720

Boise, ID 83720-0010

Patrick Morrisey

Attorney at Attorney General

1900 Kanawha Blvd.

Charleston, WV 25305-0000

Jeff Landry

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

Po Box 94005

Baton Rouge, LA 70804

Bridget Hill

Attorney at Wyoming Attorney General's Office

123 State Capital

Cheyenne, WY 82002

Aaron D. Ford

Attorney at NV Attorney General's Office

100 N Carson St

Carson City, NV 89701-4717

Other Attorneys

Ilya Liviz Sr.

Attorney at Liviz Law Office

200 Central St, Unit 1

Lowell, MA 01852

David A. Yost

Attorney at OH Attorney General's Office

30 E Broad St

Columbus, OH 43215

Dana Nessel

Attorney at MI Office of Attorney General

525 W. Ottawa St., P.O. Box 30212

Lansing, MI 48909-0212

Peter F. Neronha

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

50 Kennedy Plaza, 8Th Flr

Providence, RI 02903-0000

Thomas J. Miller

Attorney at IA Attorney General's Office

1305 E. Walnut St.

Des Moines, IA 50319-0000

Hector H. Balderas

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

408 Galisteo St, Villagra Building

Santa Fe, NM 87501

Kenneth Paxton Jr.

Attorney at TX Attorney General's Office

209 W 14Th St, Po Box 12548

Austin, TX 78711-2548

Josh Stein

Attorney at North Carolina Department of Justice

9001 Mail Service Cntr

Raleigh, NC 27699

Jason Ravnsborg

Attorney at South Dakota Attorney General's Office

1302 E Highway 14, Ste 1

Pierre, SD 57501-8501

Gordon J. MacDonald

Attorney at NH Attorney General's Office

33 Capitol St

Concord, NH 03301-0000

Gurbir S. Grewal

Attorney at New Jersey Attorney General's Office

Po Box 080

Trenton, NJ 08625-0080

28 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

NOTICE issued. After 05/06/2019, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Hector H. Balderas for Michelle Lujan Grisham, Xavier Becerra for Gavin Newsom, Andrew Beshear for Matt G. Bevin, Mark Brnovich for Douglas A. Ducey, Christopher M. Carr for Brian Kemp, Kevin G. Clarkson for Michael J. Dunleavy, Clare E. Connors for David Ige, Thomas J. Donovan, Jr. for Philip B. Scott, Keith Ellison for Timothy J. Walz, Bob Ferguson for Jay Inslee, Aaron D. Ford for Steve F. Sisolak, Timothy Charles Fox for Steve C. Bullock, Aaron M. Frey for Janet T. Mills, Brian E. Frosh for Lawrence J. Hogan, Gurbir S. Grewal for Philip D. Murphy, Mark R. Herring for Ralph S. Northam, Bridget Hill for Mark Gordon, Curtis Theophilus Hill, Jr. for Eric J. Holcomb, Jim Hood for Dewey P. Bryant, Mike Hunter for John Kevin Stitt, Letitia James for Andrew M. Cuomo, Kathy Jennings for John Charles Carney, Joshua L. Kaul for Anthony S. Evers, Jeff Landry for John Bel Edwards, Steve Marshall for Kay E. Ivey, Thomas J. Miller for Kim K. Reynolds, Ashley Moody for Ronald D. DeSantis, Patrick Morrisey for James C. Justice, Dana Nessel for Gretchen E. Whitmer, Kenneth Paxton, Jr. for Greg Abbott, Kwame Raoul for Jay Robert Pritzker, Jason Ravnsborg for Kristi Noem, Sean D. Reyes for Gary R. Herbert, Leslie Rutledge for William Asa Hutchinson, Derek Schmidt for Laura Kelly, Eric Schmitt for Michael L. Parson, Josh Shapiro for Thomas Wolf, Herbert H. Slatery, III for William B. Lee, Josh Stein for Roy Cooper, William M. Tong for Edward M. Lamont, Lawrence G. Wasden for Bradley J. Little, Philip J. Weiser for Jared Polis, Alan Wilson for Henry D. McMaster and David A. Yost for Mike DeWine. [19-1224] (AL) [Entered: 04/22/2019 08:43 AM]

Open Document

ORDER entered: In an electronic order entered on February 27, 2019 in No. 1:19-cv-10304-WGY (D. Mass.), the district court certified pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) and Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(3)(A) that the appeal is not taken in good faith. If appellant seeks to challenge the district courts certification, plaintiff-appellant must file a motion pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(5) provided that appellant does so before May 10, 2019 . Accordingly, on or before May 10, 2019 , appellant must either pay the $505 filing fee to the district court or file a motion in this court pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(5). Failure to take either action will lead to dismissal of the appeal for lack of prosecution. See 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). [19-1224] (AL) [Entered: 04/10/2019 01:38 PM]

Open Document

CORRECTED NOTICE* of default and intent to dismiss issued. The appellant is directed to file an appearance form and docketing statement or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). *Corrected order issued to amend the text of the order. [19-1224] (AL) [Entered: 04/05/2019 10:00 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued. The appellant is directed to file an appearance form and docketing statement or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). Appearance form and Docketing Statement due 04/12/2019. [19-1224] (AL) [Entered: 03/29/2019 04:42 PM]

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE issued. After 05/06/2019, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Hector H. Balderas for Michelle Lujan Grisham, Xavier Becerra for Gavin Newsom, Andrew Beshear for Matt G. Bevin, Mark Brnovich for Douglas A. Ducey, Christopher M. Carr for Brian Kemp, Kevin G. Clarkson for Michael J. Dunleavy, Clare E. Connors for David Ige, Thomas J. Donovan, Jr. for Philip B. Scott, Keith Ellison for Timothy J. Walz, Bob Ferguson for Jay Inslee, Aaron D. Ford for Steve F. Sisolak, Timothy Charles Fox for Steve C. Bullock, Aaron M. Frey for Janet T. Mills, Brian E. Frosh for Lawrence J. Hogan, Gurbir S. Grewal for Philip D. Murphy, Mark R. Herring for Ralph S. Northam, Bridget Hill for Mark Gordon, Curtis Theophilus Hill, Jr. for Eric J. Holcomb, Jim Hood for Dewey P. Bryant, Mike Hunter for John Kevin Stitt, Letitia James for Andrew M. Cuomo, Kathy Jennings for John Charles Carney, Joshua L. Kaul for Anthony S. Evers, Jeff Landry for John Bel Edwards, Steve Marshall for Kay E. Ivey, Thomas J. Miller for Kim K. Reynolds, Ashley Moody for Ronald D. DeSantis, Patrick Morrisey for James C. Justice, Dana Nessel for Gretchen E. Whitmer, Kenneth Paxton, Jr. for Greg Abbott, Kwame Raoul for Jay Robert Pritzker, Jason Ravnsborg for Kristi Noem, Sean D. Reyes for Gary R. Herbert, Leslie Rutledge for William Asa Hutchinson, Derek Schmidt for Laura Kelly, Eric Schmitt for Michael L. Parson, Josh Shapiro for Thomas Wolf, Herbert H. Slatery, III for William B. Lee, Josh Stein for Roy Cooper, William M. Tong for Edward M. Lamont, Lawrence G. Wasden for Bradley J. Little, Philip J. Weiser for Jared Polis, Alan Wilson for Henry D. McMaster and David A. Yost for Mike DeWine. [19-1224] (AL) [Entered: 04/22/2019 08:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER entered: In an electronic order entered on February 27, 2019 in No. 1:19-cv-10304-WGY (D. Mass.), the district court certified pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) and Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(3)(A) that the appeal is not taken in good faith. If appellant seeks to challenge the district courts certification, plaintiff-appellant must file a motion pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(5) provided that appellant does so before May 10, 2019 . Accordingly, on or before May 10, 2019 , appellant must either pay the $505 filing fee to the district court or file a motion in this court pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(5). Failure to take either action will lead to dismissal of the appeal for lack of prosecution. See 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). [19-1224] (AL) [Entered: 04/10/2019 01:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORRECTED NOTICE* of default and intent to dismiss issued. The appellant is directed to file an appearance form and docketing statement or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). *Corrected order issued to amend the text of the order. [19-1224] (AL) [Entered: 04/05/2019 10:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued. The appellant is directed to file an appearance form and docketing statement or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). Appearance form and Docketing Statement due 04/12/2019. [19-1224] (AL) [Entered: 03/29/2019 04:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #15) filed by Appellant Ilya Liviz, Sr.. Docketing Statement due 03/25/2019. Appearance form due 03/25/2019. [19-1224] (AL) [Entered: 03/11/2019 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less