This case was last updated from PACER on 11/25/2019 at 07:47:37 (UTC).

Little Traverse Bay Bands v. Gretchen Whitmer, et al

Case Summary

On 09/26/2019 Little Traverse Bay Bands filed an Other lawsuit against Gretchen Whitmer. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2107

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit

 

Party Details

Intervenor / Appellees

TOWNSHIP OF LITTLE TRAVERSE

TOWNSHIP OF CENTER

TOWNSHIP OF PLEASANTVIEW

TOWNSHIP OF RESORT

EMMET COUNTY LAKE SHORE ASSOCIATION

CITY OF CHARLEVOIX, MI

THE PROTECTION OF RIGHTS ALLIANCE

TOWNSHIP OF FRIENDSHIP

TOWNSHIP OF WEST TRAVERSE

TOWNSHIP OF BEAR CREEK

TOWNSHIP OF CHARLEVOIX

TOWNSHIP OF BLISS

TOWNSHIP OF CROSS VILLAGE

TOWNSHIP OF READMOND

Not Yet Classified

LITTLE TRAVERSE BAY BANDS OF ODAWA INDIANS

CITY OF PETOSKEY, MI

EMMET COUNTY, MI

CHARLEVOIX COUNTY, MI

CITY OF HARBOR SPRINGS, MI

Defendant / Appellee

GRETCHEN WHITMER, Governor of the State of Michigan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Intervenor / Appellee Attorneys

Ryan K. Kauffman

Attorney at Fraser, Trebilcock, Davis & Dunlap

124 W. Allegan, Suite 1000

Lansing, MI 48933

Thaddeus E. Morgan

Attorney at Fraser Trebilcock

124 W. Allegan Street, Suite 1000

Lansing, MI 48933

Erin Sedmak

Attorney at Dykema

201 Townsend Street, Suite 900

Lansing, MI 48933

R. Lance Boldrey

Attorney at Dykema

201 Townsend Street, Suite 900

Lansing, MI 48933

Jill Margaret Wheaton

Attorney at Dykema Gossett

2723 S. State Street, Suite 400

Ann Arbor, MI 48104

William Rastetter

Attorney at Olson, Bzdok & Howard

420 E. Front Street

Traverse City, MI 49686

Scott W. Howard

Attorney at Olson, Bzdok & Howard

420 E. Front Street

Traverse City, MI 49686

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

James Alan Bransky

Attorney at Law Office

9393 Lake Leelanau Drive

Traverse City, MI 49684-7713

David A. Giampetroni

Attorney at Kanji & Katzen

101 N. Main Street, Suite 555

Ann Arbor, MI 48104

Riyaz A. Kanji

Attorney at Kanji & Katzen

303 Detroit Street, Suite 400

Ann Arbor, MI 48104

Jeffrey Charles Gerish

Attorney at Plunkett Cooney

38505 Woodward Avenue, Suite 100

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jaclyn Shoshana Levine

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 30755

Lansing, MI 48909

Laura Rose LaMore

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 30755

Lansing, MI 48909

Kelly M. Drake

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 30755

Lansing, MI 48909

 

Court Documents

#36

No Description Available

#27

No Description Available

#28

No Description Available

#19

RESTRICTED

21 #1

appearance form

#25

No Description Available

#23

(#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees City of Charlevoix, MI and Township of Charlevoix in 19-2070, 19-2107 by Appearance of Scott W. Howard on behalf of the City of Charlevoix and Charlevoix Township. Certificate of Service: 10/01/2019. [19-2070, 19-2107] (SWH) [Entered: 10/01/2019 02:41 PM]

#26

No Description Available

21 #2

appearance form

#24

No Description Available

#29

No Description Available

#37

No Description Available

#35

No Description Available

#22

(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees City of Charlevoix, MI and Township of Charlevoix in 19-2070, 19-2107 by Appearance of William Rastetter on behalf of the City of Charlevoix and Charlevoix Township. Certificate of Service: 10/01/2019. [19-2070, 19-2107] (WR) [Entered: 10/01/2019 02:38 PM]

#34

No Description Available

#31

No Description Available

#37

(#37) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: first brief due 01/02/2020; second brief due 02/03/2020; third brief due 03/04/2020. [19-2070, 19-2107] (KSF) [Entered: 11/22/2019 04:00 PM]

#30

No Description Available

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: first brief due 01/02/2020; second brief due 02/03/2020; third brief due 03/04/2020. [19-2070, 19-2107] (KSF) [Entered: 11/22/2019 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • (#36) Transcript, [24], has been filed in the District Court on 11/22/2019 ; Court Reporter: Ms. Kathleen Sue Thomas in 19-2070, 19-2107 ; Actual Number of Pages: 360 (12/18/18-62 pgs; 6/24/19-144 pgs.; 6/25/19-154 pgs.) ; Actual Number of Volumes: 3 ; [19-2070, 19-2107] (KST) [Entered: 11/22/2019 03:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • (#35) RULING granting request for extension of time to file transcript [34] filed by Ms. Kathleen Sue Thomas. Transcript now due by 11/25/2019 for Kathleen Sue Thomas. [19-2070, 19-2107] (KSF) [Entered: 11/19/2019 09:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • (#34) Request for extension of time to file transcript filed by Ms. Kathleen Sue Thomas in 19-2070, 19-2107 for transcript, [24]. Date transcript ordered: 10/04/2019 ; Date financial arrangements: 10/16/2019 ; Estimated number of pages: 300 pages ; Number completed pages: 202 pages ; Estimated completion date: 11/25/2019 ; Reasons for Extension: Extremely heavy in-court schedule leaving little time for transcript preparation. [19-2070, 19-2107] (KST) [Entered: 11/18/2019 07:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • (#33) Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. [19-2070, 19-2107] (MLB) [Entered: 10/25/2019 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) Letter sent by Mediation Office REGARDING MEDIATION: The Mediation Conference scheduled for 10/28/2019 is hereby canceled. [19-2070, 19-2107] (MLB) [Entered: 10/25/2019 12:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • (#31) NOTIFICATION: Setting transcript deadline, relating to transcript order, [24] Transcript to be filed in district court by Kathleen Sue Thomas by 11/21/2019. (KSF) [Entered: 10/22/2019 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • (#30) Court Reporter Acknowledgement filed by Ms. Kathleen Sue Thomas in 19-2107, 19-2070, for transcript [24] ; Arrangements for payment were made on 10/22/2019 ; Estimated completion date: 11/22/2019 ; Estimated number of pages: 345 pages . [19-2107, 19-2070] (KST) [Entered: 10/22/2019 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • (#29) NOTIFICATION: Setting transcript deadline, relating to transcript order, [19] , relating to transcript order, [24] Transcript to be filed in district court by Kathleen Sue Thomas by 11/18/2019. [19-2070, 19-2107] (KSF) [Entered: 10/17/2019 07:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • (#28) Court Reporter Acknowledgement filed by Ms. Kathleen Sue Thomas in 19-2070, 19-2107, for transcript [24] ; Arrangements for payment were made on 10/16/2019 ; Estimated completion date: 11/16/2019 ; Estimated number of pages: 300 pages . [19-2070, 19-2107] (KST) [Entered: 10/16/2019 04:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees City of Charlevoix, MI and Township of Charlevoix in 19-2070, 19-2107 by Appearance of Scott W. Howard on behalf of the City of Charlevoix and Charlevoix Township. Certificate of Service: 10/01/2019. [19-2070, 19-2107] (SWH) [Entered: 10/01/2019 02:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees City of Charlevoix, MI and Township of Charlevoix in 19-2070, 19-2107 by Appearance of William Rastetter on behalf of the City of Charlevoix and Charlevoix Township. Certificate of Service: 10/01/2019. [19-2070, 19-2107] (WR) [Entered: 10/01/2019 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ***ENTRY LOCKED - EACH COUNSEL MUST FILE THEIR OWN APPEARANCE FORMS UNDER THEIR OWN PACER ACCOUNTS.*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Township of Charlevoix and City of Charlevoix, MI in 19-2070, Appellees City of Charlevoix, MI and Township of Charlevoix in 19-2107 by Appearances of Scott W. Howard and William Rastetter on behalf of the City of Charlevoix and Charlevoix Township. Certificate of Service: 10/01/2019. [19-2070, 19-2107]--[Edited 10/01/2019 by KSF] (SWH) [Entered: 10/01/2019 02:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: The appearance form , [ # 6 ],, appearance form , [ # 5 ], filed by Mr. Scott W. Howard and Mr. William Rastetter for City of Charlevoix, MI and Township of Charlevoix in 19-2107 is deficient for the reason noted on the attached checklist. Deficiency to be corrected by 10/08/2019. [19-2070, 19-2107] (KSF) [Entered: 10/01/2019 02:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ***ENTRY LOCKED - COUNSEL MUST REFILE THE APPEARANCE FORM USING HIS OWN PACER ACCOUNT AND UNCHECK THE BOX FOR THE CROSS APPEAL OR INCLUDE BOTH CASE NUMBERS ON THE APPEARANCE FORM.*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellees City of Charlevoix, MI and Township of Charlevoix in 19-2070 by Appearance of William Rastetter on behalf of the City of Charlevoix and Charlevoix Township. Certificate of Service: 10/01/2019. [19-2070, 19-2107]--[Edited 10/01/2019 by KSF] (SWH) [Entered: 10/01/2019 10:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ***ENTRY LOCKED - COUNSEL MUST REFILE APPEARANCE FORM AND UNCHECK THE BOX FOR THE CROSS APPEAL OR INCLUDE BOTH CASE NUMBERS ON THE APPEARANCE FORM.*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Township of Charlevoix in 19-2070, Appellees City of Charlevoix, MI and Township of Charlevoix in 19-2107 by Appearance of Scott W. Howard on behalf of the City of Charlevoix and Charlevoix Township. Certificate of Service: 10/01/2019. [19-2070, 19-2107]--[Edited 10/01/2019 by KSF] (SWH) [Entered: 10/01/2019 10:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • (#4) The Telephone Mediation conference scheduled with Rod McFaull will include BOTH CA Nos. 19-2070 and 19-2107. [19-2107, 19-2070] (LMR) [Entered: 09/27/2019 11:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • (#3) Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 09/27/2019 11:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • (#2) The case manager for this case is: Karen Fultz. (KSF) [Entered: 09/26/2019 11:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellees Cross-Appellants Charlevoix County, MI, City of Harbor Springs, MI, City of Petoskey, MI and Emmet County, MI. Transcript needed: y. (KSF) [Entered: 09/26/2019 11:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.