This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/21/2022 at 20:52:59 (UTC).

Litovich v. Bank of America Corporation

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 Litovich filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Bank of America Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2905

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

Isabel Litovich, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated

United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-state Pension Fund, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated

Holdcraft Marital Trust, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated

Michael V. Cottrell, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated

Frank Hirsch, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated

Defendant / Appellees

Bank of America Corporation

Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated

BofA Securities, Inc.

Barclays Capital Inc.

Citigroup Inc.

Citigroup Global Markets Inc.

Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC

Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.

The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc.

Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC

JPMorgan Chase & Co.

J.P. Morgan Securities LLC

Morgan Stanley

Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC

Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

David Charles Frederick

Attorney at Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.

1615 M Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Walter W. Noss Esq.

Attorney at Scott & Scott, Attorneys at Law, LLP

600 West Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101

Gregory G. Rapawy Esq.

Attorney at Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.

1615 M Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Christopher M. Burke Esq.

Attorney at Scott & Scott, Attorneys at Law, LLP

600 West Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Adam Selim Hakki Esq.

Attorney at Shearman & Sterling LLP

599 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Richard F. Schwed Esq.

Attorney at Shearman & Sterling LLP

599 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Anthony Antonelli Esq.

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Barry Gordon Sher

Attorney at Paul Hastings LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Kevin P. Broughel Esq.

Attorney at Paul Hastings LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Jay B. Kasner Esq.

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

One Manhattan West

New York, NY 10001

Karen Hoffman Lent Esq.

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

One Manhattan West

New York, NY 10001

Herbert Scott Washer Esq.

Attorney at Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP

32 Old Slip

New York, NY 10005

Sheila Ramesh Esq.

Attorney at Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP

32 Old Slip

New York, NY 10005

John Francis Terzaken Esq. III

Attorney at Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

900 G Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Adrienne Vollmer Baxley

Attorney at Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

900 G Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Richard C. Pepperman II

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

John Playforth

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

1 Citycenter, 850 10Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Brad S. Karp Esq.

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Other Attorneys

Paul S. Mishkin Esq.

Attorney at Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Jayant W. Tambe Esq.

Attorney at Jones Day

250 Vesey Street

New York, NY 10281

18 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#143

(#143) LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Natwest Markets Securities Inc., effective 05/13/2022 Attorney John M. Briggs will no longer be associated with Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP and requests to be removed as additional counsel in this appeal, RECEIVED. Service date 05/11/2022 by CM/ECF.[3313475] [21-2905]--[Edited 05/12/2022 by EMC] [Entered: 05/11/2022 05:07 PM]

#141

(#141) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC and Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, FILED. Service date 05/03/2022 by CM/ECF. [3308026] [21-2905] [Entered: 05/03/2022 11:29 AM]

#138

(#138) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Bank of America Corporation, Barclays Capital Inc., BofA Securities, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated, Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, Natwest Markets Securities Inc., The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Clearing Services, LLC and Wells Fargo Securities, LLC Brief due date as 06/07/2022, FILED.[3282345] [21-2905] [Entered: 03/22/2022 11:57 AM]

#135

(#135) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Clearing Services, LLC and Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, informing Court of proposed due date 06/07/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 03/21/2022 by CM/ECF.[3281636] [21-2905] [Entered: 03/21/2022 03:36 PM]

#134

(#134) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Citigroup Global Markets Inc. and Citigroup Inc., informing Court of proposed due date 06/07/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 03/18/2022 by CM/ECF.[3280913] [21-2905] [Entered: 03/18/2022 06:16 PM]

#133

(#133) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Capital Inc., informing Court of proposed due date 06/07/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 03/18/2022 by CM/ECF.[3280648] [21-2905] [Entered: 03/18/2022 02:33 PM]

#132

(#132) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., informing Court of proposed due date 06/07/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 03/18/2022 by CM/ECF.[3280629] [21-2905] [Entered: 03/18/2022 02:13 PM]

#131

(#131) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC and Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, informing Court of proposed due date 06/07/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 03/18/2022 by CM/ECF.[3280391] [21-2905] [Entered: 03/18/2022 11:10 AM]

#11

(#11) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Michael V. Cottrell, Frank Hirsch, Holdcraft Marital Trust, Isabel Litovich and United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-state Pension Fund, FILED. Service date 12/07/2021 by CM/ECF.[3224489] [21-2905] [Entered: 12/07/2021 04:36 PM]

#10

(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC and The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., FILED. Service date 12/07/2021 by CM/ECF.[3224347] [21-2905] [Entered: 12/07/2021 02:52 PM]

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Citigroup Global Markets Inc. and Citigroup Inc., FILED. Service date 12/07/2021 by CM/ECF. [3224243] [21-2905] [Entered: 12/07/2021 01:18 PM]

#8

(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Citigroup Global Markets Inc. and Citigroup Inc., FILED. Service date 12/07/2021 by CM/ECF.[3224240] [21-2905] [Entered: 12/07/2021 01:15 PM]

5 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

5 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#3

(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 10/26/2021, RECEIVED.[3217944] [21-2905] [Entered: 11/24/2021 12:21 PM]

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 10/25/2021, RECEIVED.[3217942] [21-2905] [Entered: 11/24/2021 12:20 PM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2022
  • Docket(#144) ATTORNEY, John M. Briggs, for Appellee Natwest Markets Securities Inc., TERMINATED.[3314574] [21-2905] [Entered: 05/13/2022 10:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#143) LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Natwest Markets Securities Inc., effective 05/13/2022 Attorney John M. Briggs will no longer be associated with Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP and requests to be removed as additional counsel in this appeal, RECEIVED. Service date 05/11/2022 by CM/ECF.[3313475] [21-2905]--[Edited 05/12/2022 by EMC] [Entered: 05/11/2022 05:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#142) ATTORNEY, Kannon K. Shanmugam for Morgan Stanley, Smith Barney LLC, Morgan Stanley Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, in case 21-2905, [ # 141 ], ADDED.[3308118] [21-2905] [Entered: 05/03/2022 12:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#141) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC and Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, FILED. Service date 05/03/2022 by CM/ECF. [3308026] [21-2905] [Entered: 05/03/2022 11:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#138) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Bank of America Corporation, Barclays Capital Inc., BofA Securities, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated, Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, Natwest Markets Securities Inc., The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Clearing Services, LLC and Wells Fargo Securities, LLC Brief due date as 06/07/2022, FILED.[3282345] [21-2905] [Entered: 03/22/2022 11:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#135) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Clearing Services, LLC and Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, informing Court of proposed due date 06/07/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 03/21/2022 by CM/ECF.[3281636] [21-2905] [Entered: 03/21/2022 03:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#134) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Citigroup Global Markets Inc. and Citigroup Inc., informing Court of proposed due date 06/07/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 03/18/2022 by CM/ECF.[3280913] [21-2905] [Entered: 03/18/2022 06:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#133) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Capital Inc., informing Court of proposed due date 06/07/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 03/18/2022 by CM/ECF.[3280648] [21-2905] [Entered: 03/18/2022 02:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#132) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., informing Court of proposed due date 06/07/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 03/18/2022 by CM/ECF.[3280629] [21-2905] [Entered: 03/18/2022 02:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#131) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC and Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, informing Court of proposed due date 06/07/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 03/18/2022 by CM/ECF.[3280391] [21-2905] [Entered: 03/18/2022 11:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
90 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Michael V. Cottrell, Frank Hirsch, Holdcraft Marital Trust, Isabel Litovich and United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-state Pension Fund, FILED. Service date 12/07/2021 by CM/ECF.[3224493] [21-2905] [Entered: 12/07/2021 04:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Michael V. Cottrell, Frank Hirsch, Holdcraft Marital Trust, Isabel Litovich and United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-state Pension Fund, FILED. Service date 12/07/2021 by CM/ECF.[3224489] [21-2905] [Entered: 12/07/2021 04:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC and The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., FILED. Service date 12/07/2021 by CM/ECF.[3224347] [21-2905] [Entered: 12/07/2021 02:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Citigroup Global Markets Inc. and Citigroup Inc., FILED. Service date 12/07/2021 by CM/ECF. [3224243] [21-2905] [Entered: 12/07/2021 01:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Citigroup Global Markets Inc. and Citigroup Inc., FILED. Service date 12/07/2021 by CM/ECF.[3224240] [21-2905] [Entered: 12/07/2021 01:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3217948] [21-2905] [Entered: 11/24/2021 12:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • Docket(#4) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Michael V. Cottrell, Frank Hirsch, Holdcraft Marital Trust, Isabel Litovich and United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-state Pension Fund, district court receipt # ANYSDC-25374944, FILED.[3217946] [21-2905] [Entered: 11/24/2021 12:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 10/26/2021, RECEIVED.[3217944] [21-2905] [Entered: 11/24/2021 12:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 10/25/2021, RECEIVED.[3217942] [21-2905] [Entered: 11/24/2021 12:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Michael V. Cottrell, Frank Hirsch, Holdcraft Marital Trust, Isabel Litovich and United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-state Pension Fund, FILED. [3217930] [21-2905] [Entered: 11/24/2021 12:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund is a litigant

Latest cases where BofA Securities, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Citigroup Inc. is a litigant