This case was last updated from PACER on 07/19/2019 at 06:05:03 (UTC).

Lisa Watson v. Mark Esper

Case Summary

On 05/20/2019 Lisa Watson filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Mark Esper. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-50450

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

MARK ESPER, Secretary, Department of Army

Plaintiff / Appellant

LISA L. WATSON

San Antonio, TX 78212

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

James Dingivan

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

601 N.W. Loop 410

San Antonio, TX 78216-5512

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Lisa L. Watson

P.O. Box 12285

San Antonio, TX 78212

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

BR-5 Paper Filers Letter

Open Document #1

Appellant/Petitioner Brief Filed

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. A/Pet's Brief Due on 07/22/2019 for Appellant Lisa L. Watson. [19-50450] (RLL) [Entered: 06/11/2019 04:21 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9060687-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-50450] (CBW) [Entered: 05/24/2019 10:55 AM]

Open Document

CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Lisa L. Watson [19-50450] (CBW) [Entered: 05/20/2019 02:18 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Ms. Lisa L. Watson. Additionally the Brief is INSUFFICIENT FOR: TITLE/COVER; MISSING CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES; ROA CITATIONS; TABLE OF AUTHORITIES NOT IN PROPER ORDER; HEADER MUST BE REMOVED FROM EACH PAGE; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MISSING DATE; MISSING STANDARD OF REVIEW. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 7 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Record Excerpts due on 07/23/2019 for Appellant Lisa L. Watson. Sufficient Brief due on 07/23/2019 for Appellant Lisa L. Watson.. Appellee's Brief due on 08/08/2019 for Appellee Mark Esper [19-50450] (RSM) [Entered: 07/09/2019 11:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. A/Pet's Brief Due on 07/22/2019 for Appellant Lisa L. Watson. [19-50450] (RLL) [Entered: 06/11/2019 04:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-50450] (RLL) [Entered: 06/11/2019 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 5:17-CV-1280. Electronic ROA due on 06/10/2019. [19-50450] (CBW) [Entered: 05/24/2019 10:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9060687-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-50450] (CBW) [Entered: 05/24/2019 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • FEE PAID by Appellant Ms. Lisa L. Watson. [19-50450] (CBW) [Entered: 05/24/2019 10:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Lisa L. Watson [19-50450] (CBW) [Entered: 05/20/2019 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less