This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:02:33 (UTC).

Lisa Kim, et al v. Tinder, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Lisa Kim filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Tinder, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-55807

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

MATCH GROUP, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company

MATCH GROUP, INC., a Delaware corporation

TINDER, INC., a Delaware corporation

Not Yet Classified

RICH ALLISON

STEVE FRYE

Plaintiff / Appellee

LISA KIM, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Donald R. Brown Esquire

Attorney at Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP

11355 West Olympic Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Robert H. Platt

Attorney at Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP

11355 West Olympic Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Kimberly A. Kralowec

Attorney at Kralowec Law, P.C.

750 Battery Street, Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94111

Danielle Leonard

Attorney at Altshuler Berzon LLP

177 Post Street, Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94108

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Christina Le Esquire

Attorney at Kristensen Weisberg, LLP

12540 Beatrice Street, Suite 200

Los Angeles, CA 90066

John P. Kristensen Esquire

Attorney at Kristensen Weisberg, LLP

12540 Beatrice Street, Suite 200

Los Angeles, CA 90066

Todd M. Friedman

Attorney at Law Offices of Todd M. Friedman

21550 Oxnard Street, Suite 780

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Adrian Bacon Esquire

Attorney at Law Offices of Todd Friedman PC

21550 Oxnard Street, Suite 780

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellee Lisa Kim Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/16/2019. [11365760] [19-55807] (Friedman, Todd) [Entered: 07/16/2019 05:20 PM]

1 #2

Mediation Letter

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

#6

(#6) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 08/27/2019, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11389228] (CL) [Entered: 08/06/2019 04:41 PM]

#7

(#7) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED -DIAL-IN Conference w/ counsel for appellants only, 09/05/2019, 1:00 p.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11414524] (CL) [Entered: 08/29/2019 07:21 AM]

#8

(#8) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 12/05/2019, 11:00 a.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11420454] (CL) [Entered: 09/04/2019 11:46 AM]

#1

Docketing Letter

#4

(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellants Rich Allison and Steve Frye Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/23/2019. [11373260] [19-55807] (Kralowec, Kimberly) [Entered: 07/23/2019 10:59 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 12/05/2019, 11:00 a.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11420454] (CL) [Entered: 09/04/2019 11:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED -DIAL-IN Conference w/ counsel for appellants only, 09/05/2019, 1:00 p.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11414524] (CL) [Entered: 08/29/2019 07:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 08/27/2019, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11389228] (CL) [Entered: 08/06/2019 04:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • (#5) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 07/23/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11373582][19-55807] (AD) [Entered: 07/23/2019 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed (ECF) Appellants Rich Allison and Steve Frye Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/23/2019. [11373260] [19-55807] (Kralowec, Kimberly) [Entered: 07/23/2019 10:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • (#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 07/16/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11365791][19-55807] (AD) [Entered: 07/16/2019 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) Appellee Lisa Kim Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/16/2019. [11365760] [19-55807] (Friedman, Todd) [Entered: 07/16/2019 05:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/23/2019. Transcript ordered by 08/12/2019. Transcript due 09/09/2019. Appellants Rich Allison and Steve Frye opening brief due 10/21/2019. Appellees Lisa Kim, Match Group, Inc., Match Group, LLC and Tinder, Inc. answering brief due 11/21/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11364625] (RT) [Entered: 07/16/2019 10:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.