This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/01/2021 at 06:48:13 (UTC).

Lisa Garcia v. Sameh Fawzy

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 Lisa Garcia filed an Other lawsuit against Sameh Fawzy. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals - Bankruptcy, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1041

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

LISA M. GARCIA

Debtor

In re: LISA M. GARCIA

Appellee

SAMEH FAWZY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Stephen R. Wade

Attorney at Law Offices of Stephen R. Wade

405 N. Indian Hill Blvd.

Claremont, CA 91711-4733

Appellee Attorney

Rebecca G. Durham Esquire

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

101 Second Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#1

2 #1

Opening Letter

#2

form(s) sent

2 #3

Bankruptcy Court Notice Form

#3

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docketing error. Wrong case. [EOD] Date:.--[Edited 04/27/2021 by PI] (PI) [Entered: 04/27/2021 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed order (Deputy Clerk: pci) Motion is GRANTED extending time to file appellant's opening brief until 05/19/2021 Appellant Lisa M. Garcia's opening brief due 05/19/2021.; Motion is GRANTED extending time to file appellee's brief until 06/22/2021 Appellee Sameh Fawzy's opening brief due 06/22/2021. ; dated: 04/19/2021. (PI) [Entered: 04/19/2021 01:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Attorney Mr. Stephen R. Wade for Appellant Lisa M. Garcia's motion to extend time until 05/19/2021 to file opening brief and excerpts of the record appeal BAP decision to the Circuit ; served on 04/15/2021 served by: US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Durham. [21-1041]--[Edited 04/15/2021 by SS] (SRW) [Entered: 04/15/2021 02:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Sent BRIEFING ORDER to appellant Lisa M. Garcia. Copies to all parties. Appellant Lisa M. Garcia's opening brief due 04/19/2021. (PI) [Entered: 03/05/2021 11:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice to all parties and Bankruptcy Court RE: BAP Case number assigned: CC-21-1041. Sent Bankruptcy Record Request Form to Bankruptcy Court. (PI) [Entered: 03/04/2021 12:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Received notice of appeal filed in Bankruptcy Court on 03/01/2021, and copy of order. (PI) [Entered: 03/04/2021 12:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rebecca G. Durham Esquire