This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/12/2022 at 06:39:16 (UTC).

Lisa Christmann v. Cynthia Link, et al

Case Summary

On 01/11/2022 Lisa Christmann filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Cynthia Link. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1060

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees and Defendants

CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS

WELLPATH LLC, as successor corporation to and Formerly known as CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS

CYNTHIA LINK

OFFICER BROOKE DAVISON

LT. MCCLAIN

SAIQA MUSHTAQ, M.D.

BARBARA BUZDYGON

KRIS MARTIN

Plaintiff / Appellant

LISA CHRISTMANN, In her capacity as Administrator of The estate of Charles Christmann, and on behalf of his heirs

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee and Defendant Attorneys

Caitlin J. Goodrich Esq.

Attorney at Weber Gallagher Simpson Stapleton Fires & Newby

2000 Market Street, Suite 1300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Kenneth D. Powell Esq. Jr.

Attorney at Weber Gallagher Simpson Stapleton Fires & Newby

2000 Market Street, Suite 1300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Emily B. Ryan-Fiore Esq.

Attorney at Weber Gallagher Simpson Stapleton Fires & Newby

2000 Market Street, Suite 1300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Kevin R. Bradford Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

21 South 12Th Street, 3Rd Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19107

Howard G. Hopkirk Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

Strawberry Square

Harrisburg, PA 17120

Jeffrey Mozdziock

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

21 South 12Th Street, 3Rd Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19107

Cassidy L. Neal Esq.

Attorney at Matis Baum & O'Connor

912 Fort Duquesne Boulevard

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Mark B. Frost Esq.

Attorney at Mark B. Frost & Associates

One South Broad Street, Suite 1510

Philadelphia, PA 19107

Dylan T. Hastings Esq.

Attorney at Williams Cedar

One South Broad Street, Suite 1510

Philadelphia, PA 19107

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ECF FILER: NOT PARTICIPATING: Caitlin J. Goodrich, Esq. for Correct Care Solutions and Wellpath LLC, Kenneth D. Powell, Jr., Esq. for Correct Care Solutions and Emily B. Ryan-Fiore, Esq. for Correct Care Solutions Appellees Correct Care Solutions and Wellpath LLC will not participate in this appeal, received. [22-1060] (CJG) [Entered: 03/11/2022 02:25 PM]

#12

(#12) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Cassidy L. Neal, Esq. for Saiqa Mushtaq requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form within 14 days. (TMM) [Entered: 03/10/2022 03:14 PM]

#11

(#11) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Caitlin J. Goodrich, Esq., Kenneth D. Powell, Jr., Esq. and Emily B. Ryan-Fiore, Esq. for Correct Care Solutions and Wellpath LLC requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form within 14 days. Disclosure Statement on or before 03/24/2022. (TMM) [Entered: 03/10/2022 03:12 PM]

#9

(#9) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Dylan T. Hastings, Esq. for Lisa Christmann requesting the following document(s):. Fees--[Edited 03/01/2022 by TMM] (TMM) [Entered: 03/01/2022 11:13 AM]

8 #2

Transcript Scheduling Order

8 #1

Transcript Scheduling Order Issued

#7

(#7) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Howard G Hopkirk on behalf of Appellee(s) Cynthia Link, Brooke Davison, Michael McClain, Barbara Buzdygon, and Kris Martin. [22-1060] (HGH) [Entered: 01/22/2022 04:04 PM]

#6

(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Dylan T. Hastings, Esquire on behalf of Appellant(s) Lisa Christmann as administratrix of the Estate of Charles Christmann. [22-1060] (DTH) [Entered: 01/21/2022 05:21 PM]

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Lisa Christmann. [22-1060] (DTH) [Entered: 01/21/2022 05:20 PM]

#4

(#4) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Lisa Christmann advising this court that transcripts are needed. Requested date(s) are: March 20, 2021, to be filed by [22-1060] (DTH) [Entered: 01/21/2022 05:19 PM]

#3

(#3) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Lisa Christmann. [22-1060] (DTH) [Entered: 01/21/2022 05:16 PM]

1 #6

Case Opening Letter

1 #5

Standing Order

1 #4

caption

1 #3

DC Memorandum 4/7/21

1 #2

DC Order 4/7/21

#1

Civil Case Docketed

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ECF FILER: NOT PARTICIPATING: Caitlin J. Goodrich, Esq. for Correct Care Solutions and Wellpath LLC, Kenneth D. Powell, Jr., Esq. for Correct Care Solutions and Emily B. Ryan-Fiore, Esq. for Correct Care Solutions Appellees Correct Care Solutions and Wellpath LLC will not participate in this appeal, received. [22-1060] (CJG) [Entered: 03/11/2022 02:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Cassidy L. Neal, Esq. for Saiqa Mushtaq requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form within 14 days. (TMM) [Entered: 03/10/2022 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Caitlin J. Goodrich, Esq., Kenneth D. Powell, Jr., Esq. and Emily B. Ryan-Fiore, Esq. for Correct Care Solutions and Wellpath LLC requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form within 14 days. Disclosure Statement on or before 03/24/2022. (TMM) [Entered: 03/10/2022 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • Docket(#10) Notice received from the district court that the docketing and filing fees were paid by the appellant on 03/10/2022. (TMM) [Entered: 03/10/2022 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Dylan T. Hastings, Esq. for Lisa Christmann requesting the following document(s):. Fees--[Edited 03/01/2022 by TMM] (TMM) [Entered: 03/01/2022 11:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER to Court Reporter Mike Finney directing transcripts, ordered on 01/21/2022 , to be filed by 02/23/2022. (TMM) [Entered: 01/24/2022 08:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Howard G Hopkirk on behalf of Appellee(s) Cynthia Link, Brooke Davison, Michael McClain, Barbara Buzdygon, and Kris Martin. [22-1060] (HGH) [Entered: 01/22/2022 04:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Dylan T. Hastings, Esquire on behalf of Appellant(s) Lisa Christmann as administratrix of the Estate of Charles Christmann. [22-1060] (DTH) [Entered: 01/21/2022 05:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Lisa Christmann. [22-1060] (DTH) [Entered: 01/21/2022 05:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Lisa Christmann advising this court that transcripts are needed. Requested date(s) are: March 20, 2021, to be filed by [22-1060] (DTH) [Entered: 01/21/2022 05:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Lisa Christmann. [22-1060] (DTH) [Entered: 01/21/2022 05:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (TMM) [Entered: 01/11/2022 11:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Lisa Christmann in District Court No. 2-19-cv-01707. (TMM) [Entered: 01/11/2022 10:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wellpath LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth D. Powell Esq. Jr.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emily B. Ryan-Fiore Esq.