This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/25/2021 at 19:44:54 (UTC).

Lisa Bernal v. Providence Health, et al

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 Lisa Bernal filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Providence Health,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-55661

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

JESSICA BENTLEY

BRIAN J. MCNAMARA

KATELYN MICHEL HICKS

COVENANT HEALTH NETWORK, INC.

BRANDON LOOP

XIOMARA SELENA GOMEZ

PILAR DIZON LLANES

GLORIA MARTINEZ

BRODERICK GOENS

SARAH NICOLE EGAR

ANGELINA ENDSLEY

LOPEZ AND ASSOCIATES

CITY OF DOWNEY

MICHAEL M. MENDOZA

KRISTEN ANN LLALANAS

WESTON ALLEN WINN

COLLEEN WILCOXEN

ARTURO MACIAS

MICAH LYNN BERUL

NORWALK COURTHOUSE

115 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Lisa M. Bernal

P.O. Box 5106

Bellflower, CA 90706

 

Court Documents

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

8 #4

Additional Document

8 #3

Additional Document

8 #2

Additional Document

8 #1

Main Document

#7

6 #2

Additional Document

6 #1

Main Document

#5

#4

#3

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Filed Appellant Lisa M. Bernal supplemental to emergency order for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction . Deficiencies: None. [12208760] (JFF) [Entered: 08/23/2021 01:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Filed Appellant Lisa M. Bernal order for writ of execution. Deficiencies: None. Served on 08/04/2021. [12196195] (RL) [Entered: 08/09/2021 04:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Filed Appellant Lisa M. Bernal FORM 4 motion and affidavit for permission to proceed in forma pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 07/14/2021. [12185511] (RL) [Entered: 07/28/2021 12:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Filed Appellant Lisa M. Bernal order to add newer defendants in addition to all previous defendants listed in previous documents to also pay and award plaintiff all items listed in the prayer section of the most recent opening brief/complaint affidavit. Deficiencies: None. Served on 07/22/2021. [12184545] (RL) [Entered: 07/27/2021 03:01 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Filed Appellant Lisa M. Bernal tenth emergency order for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction and order to award plaintiff all items listed in the prayer section of the most recent opening brief/compalint affidavit. Deficiencies: None. Served on 07/22/2021. [12183534] (RL) [Entered: 07/26/2021 05:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): Appellants motion for reconsideration [ # 5 ] of the June 25, 2021, clerk order is denied. The district court has certified that this appeal is not taken in good faith and has revoked appellants in forma pauperis status. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a). This court may dismiss a case at any time, if the court determines the case is frivolous. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Within 35 days of this order, appellant must: (1) file a motion to dismiss this appeal, see Fed. R. App. P. 42(b), or (2) file a statement explaining why the appeal is not frivolous and should go forward. If appellant files a statement that the appeal should go forward, appellant also must: (1) file in this court a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, OR (2) pay to the district court $505.00 for the filing and docketing fees for this appeal AND file in this court proof that the $505.00 was paid. If appellant does not respond to this order, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal for failure to prosecute, without further notice. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. If appellant files a motion to dismiss the appeal, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal, pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). If appellant submits any response to this order other than a motion to dismiss the appeal, the court may dismiss this appeal as frivolous, without further notice. The briefing schedule for this appeal is stayed. All pending motions will be addressed after appellant complies with this order. The Clerk will serve on appellant: (1) a form motion to voluntarily dismiss the appeal, (2) a form statement that the appeal should go forward, and (3) a Form 4 financial affidavit. Appellant may use the enclosed forms for any motion to dismiss the appeal, statement that the appeal should go forward, and/or motion to proceed in forma pauperis. (Pro Se) [12183105] (CKP) [Entered: 07/26/2021 02:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed Appellant Lisa M. Bernal EMERGENCY motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction. Deficiencies: None. Served on 07/12/2021. [12175201] (QDL) [Entered: 07/16/2021 03:50 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed original and 0 copies of Appellant Lisa M. Bernal opening brief of 3 pages (Informal: No). Served on 07/07/2021. [12172151] (KWG) [Entered: 07/14/2021 10:41 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed Appellant Lisa M. Bernal writ order to crrect 9th Circuit Order. Deficiencies: None. Served on 07/07/2021. [12171651] (RL) [Entered: 07/13/2021 04:24 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed Appellant Lisa M. Bernal emergency order for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction. Deficiencies: None. Served on 07/06/2021. [12171502] (RL) [Entered: 07/13/2021 03:28 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed referral notice (Deputy Clerk:CKP): Referring to the district court for determination whether in forma pauperis status should continue for this appeal. [12154061] (CKP) [Entered: 06/25/2021 12:38 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • Docket(#2) Fee status changed ( [Case Number 21-55661: IFP] ). [12154060] (CKP) [Entered: 06/25/2021 12:38 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Lisa M. Bernal opening brief due 08/25/2021. [12152562] (RT) [Entered: 06/23/2021 03:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOPEZ & ASSOCIATES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where COVENANT HEALTH NETWORK, INC. is a litigant