This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/28/2019 at 06:06:48 (UTC).

Linda Nash v. Fifth District Court of Appeal, et al

Case Summary

On 07/30/2019 Linda Nash filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Fifth District Court of Appeal. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-12898

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

LINDA A. NASH

Winter Park, FL 32792

Defendant / Appellees

FIFTH DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS OF FLORIDA

RICHARD B. ORFINGER

WENDY W. BERGER

JAMES A. EDWARDS

BRIAN D. LAMBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Linda A. Nash

2136 Linden Rd

Winter Park, FL 32792

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Robert E. Gregg

11011 Sw 11Th Pl

Davie, FL 33324

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #3

USDC Order- Doc #20

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appendix filed [1 VOLUMES - 2 copies] by Party Linda A. Nash. Service date: 09/19/2019 US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Gregg. [Entered: 09/24/2019 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's brief filed by Linda A. Nash. Service date: 09/19/2019 [19-12898] Attorney for Appellee: Gregg - email. [Entered: 09/24/2019 10:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Party Linda A. Nash. Appellants brief due on 09/09/2019; Extension Granted to 09/23/2019 as to Appellant Linda A. Nash. Appendix due on 09/30/2019 as to Appellant Linda A. Nash. [Entered: 08/29/2019 09:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Robert E. Gregg for Fifth District Court of Appeal, Wendy W. Berger, Jay P. Cohen, James A. Edwards, Brian D. Lambert, Richard B. Orfinger Attorney Robert E. Gregg for Appellees Wendy W. Berger, James A. Edwards, Brian D. Lambert and Richard B. Orfinger. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12898] (ECF: Robert Gregg) [Entered: 08/23/2019 02:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Robert E. Gregg for Wendy W. Berger, James A. Edwards, Brian D. Lambert and Richard B. Orfinger. [19-12898] (ECF: Robert Gregg) [Entered: 08/14/2019 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Linda A. Nash. [Entered: 08/13/2019 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellate fee was paid on 07/29/2019 as to Appellant Linda A. Nash. [Entered: 08/01/2019 02:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Linda A. Nash on 07/29/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 09/09/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/13/2019 as to Appellant Linda A. Nash. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/27/2019 as to Appellee Wendy W. Berger [Entered: 08/01/2019 02:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fifth District Court of Appeal is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Edward Gregg