This case was last updated from PACER on 05/11/2019 at 06:10:32 (UTC).

Linda Cork, et al v. CC-Palo Alto, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 03/12/2019 Linda Cork filed an Other lawsuit against CC-Palo Alto, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-15441

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

CLASSIC RESIDENCE MANAGEMENT LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

BILL SCIORTINO

CC-PALO ALTO, INC.

STEPHANIE FIELDS

JOHN KEVIN POORMAN

PENNY PRITZKER

GARY SMITH

CC-DEVELOPMENT GROUP, INC.

NICHOLAS J. PRITZKER

Plaintiff / Appellants

JANICE R. ANDERSON

LINDA C. CORK

THOMAS MERIGAN

GEORGIA L. MAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

William Faulkner

Attorney at Mcmanis Faulkner

50 W. San Fernando Street

San Jose, CA 95113

James McManis

Attorney at Mcmanis Faulkner

50 W. San Fernando Street

San Jose, CA 95113

Gilbert R. Serota

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

Three Embarcadero Center, 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-4024

Hilary Weddell

Attorney at Mcmanis Faulkner

50 W. San Fernando Street

San Jose, CA 95113

Jeremy T. Kamras

Attorney at Howard Rice Nemerovski Canady Falk & Rabkin PC

Three Embarcadero Center, Seventh Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-4024

John Muse-Fisher

Attorney at Arnold & Porter

Three Embarcadero Center, 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-4024

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Anne Marie Murphy

Attorney at Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

840 Malcolm Road

Burlingame, CA 94010

Sarvenaz Josephine Fahimi

Attorney at Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

840 Malcolm Road

Burlingame, CA 94010

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Mediation Letter

#5

(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 04/12/2019, 2:00 p.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 04/04/2019 ). [11239963] (CL) [Entered: 03/22/2019 04:54 PM]

#1

Docketing Letter

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Janice R. Anderson, Linda C. Cork, Georgia L. May and Thomas Merigan Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/19/2019. [11233285] [19-15441] (Murphy, Anne) [Entered: 03/19/2019 09:45 AM]

#10

(#10) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11262522] (CL) [Entered: 04/12/2019 02:54 PM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 04/04/2019, 2:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11238364] (CL) [Entered: 03/21/2019 05:29 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11262522] (CL) [Entered: 04/12/2019 02:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • (#9) Added attorney John Muse-Fisher for Gary Smith, Stephanie Fields, Nicholas J. Pritzker, John Kevin Poorman, Bill Sciortino and Penny Pritzker, in case 19-15441. [11246763] (QDL) [Entered: 03/29/2019 01:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • (#8) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of John William Muse-Fisher for Appellees Stephanie Fields, John Kevin Poorman, Nicholas J. Pritzker, Penny Pritzker, Bill Sciortino and Gary Smith. Date of service: 03/29/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11246638] [19-15441] (Muse-Fisher, John) [Entered: 03/29/2019 12:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • (#7) Added attorney Sarvenaz Josephine Fahimi for Janice R. Anderson Linda C. Cork Thomas Merigan Georgia L. May, in case 19-15441. [11241432] (JFF) [Entered: 03/25/2019 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • (#6) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Sarvenaz Josephine Fahimi for Appellants Janice R. Anderson, Linda C. Cork, Georgia L. May and Thomas Merigan. Date of service: 03/25/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11241342] [19-15441] (Fahimi, Sarvenaz) [Entered: 03/25/2019 02:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 04/12/2019, 2:00 p.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 04/04/2019 ). [11239963] (CL) [Entered: 03/22/2019 04:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 04/04/2019, 2:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11238364] (CL) [Entered: 03/21/2019 05:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • (#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 03/19/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11233920] (AD) [Entered: 03/19/2019 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Janice R. Anderson, Linda C. Cork, Georgia L. May and Thomas Merigan Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/19/2019. [11233285] [19-15441] (Murphy, Anne) [Entered: 03/19/2019 09:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/19/2019. Transcript ordered by 04/10/2019. Transcript due 05/10/2019. Appellants Janice R. Anderson, Linda C. Cork, Georgia L. May and Thomas Merigan opening brief due 06/19/2019. Appellees CC-Development Group, Inc., CC-Palo Alto, Inc., Classic Residence Management Limited Partnership, Stephanie Fields, John Kevin Poorman, Nicholas J. Pritzker, Penny Pritzker, Bill Sciortino and Gary Smith answering brief due 07/19/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11224294] (JBS) [Entered: 03/12/2019 10:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less