This case was last updated from PACER on 04/24/2021 at 06:15:08 (UTC).

Lincoln Benefit Life Company v. Alexander Dallal, et al

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 Lincoln Benefit Life Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Alexander Dallal. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-55152

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellants

ALEXANDER DALLAL, an individual

CLAIRE DALLAL, an individual

Plaintiff / Appellee

LINCOLN BENEFIT LIFE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

John Collingwood Seals Esquire

Attorney at The Law Offices of Collin Seals

790 E. Colorado Boulevard, Suite 900

Pasadena, CA 91101

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Keiko Jennifer Kojima Esquire

Attorney at Burke, Williams & Sorensen, LLP

444 South Flower Street, Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Melissa Michelle Cowan Esquire

Attorney at Burke, Williams & Sorensen, LLP

444 South Flower Street, Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Edith Sanchez Shea Esquire

Attorney at Burke, Williams & Sorensen, LLP

444 South Flower Street, Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [12075273] (VS) [Entered: 04/15/2021 09:56 AM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 03/23/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12028789] (VS) [Entered: 03/09/2021 08:44 AM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Alexander Dallal and Claire Dallal Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/01/2021. [12019572] [21-55152] (Seals, John) [Entered: 03/01/2021 11:09 AM]

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [12075273] (VS) [Entered: 04/15/2021 09:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 03/23/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12028789] (VS) [Entered: 03/09/2021 08:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 03/01/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12019823]. [21-55152] (AD) [Entered: 03/01/2021 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Alexander Dallal and Claire Dallal Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/01/2021. [12019572] [21-55152] (Seals, John) [Entered: 03/01/2021 11:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Alexander Dallal and Claire Dallal Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/02/2021. Transcript ordered by 03/22/2021. Transcript due 04/19/2021. Appellants Alexander Dallal and Claire Dallal opening brief due 06/01/2021. Appellee Lincoln Benefit Life Company answering brief due 07/01/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12013909] (JBS) [Entered: 02/23/2021 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lincoln Benefit Life Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melissa M Cowan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edith S Shea

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Keiko J Kojima