Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/20/2020 at 05:44:35 (UTC).

Lighting Science Group Corp. v. ITC

Case Summary

On 06/18/2020 Lighting Science Group Corp filed an Other lawsuit against ITC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1907

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit

 

Party Details

Appellants

LIGHTING SCIENCE GROUP CORPORATION

HEALTHE, INC.

Appellee

INTERNATIONAL TRADE COMMISSION

Washington, DC 20436

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Kayvan B. Noroozi

Attorney at Noroozi PC

11601 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Appellee Attorney

Assistant General Counsel, International Trade Commission

Attorney at International Trade Commission

500 E Street, Sw

Washington, DC 20436

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) MOTION of Cree, Inc., Cree Hong Kong Limited, and Cree Huizhou Solid State Lighting Company Limited for leave to intervene [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 06/19/2020 by email. [702581] [20-1907] [Richard Erwine] [Entered: 06/19/2020 04:41 PM]

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION of Cree, Inc., Cree Hong Kong Limited, and Cree Huizhou Solid State Lighting Company Limited for leave to intervene [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 06/19/2020 by email. [702581] [20-1907] [Richard Erwine] [Entered: 06/19/2020 04:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 06/05/2020. [702221] Entry of Appearance due 07/02/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 07/02/2020. Docketing Statement due 07/20/2020. Certified List due on 07/28/2020. [MMA] [Entered: 06/18/2020 02:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lighting Science Group Corporation is a litigant