Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/21/2020 at 06:15:54 (UTC).

Libertarian Party of Minnesota, et al v. Steve Simon

Case Summary

On 06/22/2020 Libertarian Party of Minnesota filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Steve Simon. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2244

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

Chris Holbrook

Brian McCormick

Mason McElvain

Chris Dock

Libertarian Party, of Minnesota

Defendant / Appellee

Steve Simon, in his official capacity as the Minnesota Secretary of State, or his successor

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Erick G. Kaardal

Attorney at MOHRMAN & KAARDAL

Suite 3100, 150 Fifth Street, S.

Minneapolis, MN 55402-0000

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Nathan J. Hartshorn

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE

Suite 1400, 445 Minnesota Street

Saint Paul, MN 55101-2127

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellants Mr. Chris Dock, Mr. Chris Holbrook, Libertarian Party, Mr. Brian McCormick and Mr. Mason McElvain , w/service 08/11/2020 [4946448] [20-2244] (JPP) [Entered: 08/18/2020 02:45 PM]

Open Document

BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Chris Dock, Mr. Chris Holbrook, Libertarian Party, Mr. Brian McCormick and Mr. Mason McElvain. w/service 08/12/2020 , Length: 6364 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Chris Dock, Chris Holbrook, Libertarian Party, Brian McCormick and Mason McElvain due 08/24/2020 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Brief of Steve Simon due on 09/17/2020 [4946442] [20-2244] (JPP) [Entered: 08/18/2020 02:44 PM]

Open Document

RECORD FILED - APLNT/PET APPENDIX, 1 volumes, Comments: 3 copies of 1 volume Record Deficiency due on 08/24/2020. [4946070] [20-2244] (NDW) [Entered: 08/17/2020 04:10 PM]

Open Restricted Document #2

Certificate of Service

Open Restricted Document #1

Principal Brief (deficiency corrected)

Open Document

Brief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Erick G. Kaardal for Appellants Libertarian Party, Mr. Chris Holbrook, Mr. Mason McElvain, Mr. Chris Dock and Mr. Brian McCormick. [4944545] [20-2244] (JPP) [Entered: 08/12/2020 10:57 AM]

Open Restricted Document #2

Certificate of Service

Open Restricted Document #1

Appellants' Addendum

Open Restricted Document #2

Certificate of Service

Open Restricted Document #1

Principal Brief

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Nathan J. Hartshorn for Appellee Steve Simon w/service 07/17/2020 [4934835] [20-2244] (NJH) [Entered: 07/17/2020 11:18 AM]

Open Document

STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellants Mr. Chris Dock, Mr. Chris Holbrook, Libertarian Party, Mr. Brian McCormick and Mr. Mason McElvain - w/service 07/06/2020. [4930703] [20-2244] (EGK) [Entered: 07/06/2020 04:49 PM]

Open Document

DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellants Mr. Chris Dock, Mr. Chris Holbrook, Libertarian Party, Mr. Brian McCormick and Mr. Mason McElvain. w/service 07/06/2020 [4930699] [20-2244] (EGK) [Entered: 07/06/2020 04:48 PM]

Open Document

METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Mr. Chris Dock, Mr. Chris Holbrook, Libertarian Party, Mr. Brian McCormick and Mr. Mason McElvain - Separate Appendix - w/service 07/06/2020 [4930697] [20-2244] (EGK) [Entered: 07/06/2020 04:46 PM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants Mr. Chris Dock, Mr. Chris Holbrook, Libertarian Party, Mr. Brian McCormick and Mr. Mason McElvain. - FOR CAL [4930692] [20-2244] (EGK) [Entered: 07/06/2020 04:44 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Erick G. Kaardal for Appellants Mr. Chris Dock, Mr. Chris Holbrook, Libertarian Party, Mr. Brian McCormick and Mr. Mason McElvain w/service 07/06/2020 [4930690] [20-2244] (EGK) [Entered: 07/06/2020 04:43 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 08/03/2020. Appendix due 08/11/2020. BRIEF APPELLANT, Chris Dock, Chris Holbrook, Libertarian Party, Brian McCormick and Mason McElvain due 08/11/2020 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4926020] [20-2244] (CYZ) [Entered: 06/22/2020 02:33 PM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of docket entries, order of 5/29/2020, notice of appeal [4926018] [20-2244] (CYZ) [Entered: 06/22/2020 02:31 PM]

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellants Mr. Chris Dock, Mr. Chris Holbrook, Libertarian Party, Mr. Brian McCormick and Mr. Mason McElvain , w/service 08/11/2020 [4946448] [20-2244] (JPP) [Entered: 08/18/2020 02:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Chris Dock, Mr. Chris Holbrook, Libertarian Party, Mr. Brian McCormick and Mr. Mason McElvain. w/service 08/12/2020 , Length: 6364 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Chris Dock, Chris Holbrook, Libertarian Party, Brian McCormick and Mason McElvain due 08/24/2020 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Brief of Steve Simon due on 09/17/2020 [4946442] [20-2244] (JPP) [Entered: 08/18/2020 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORD FILED - APLNT/PET APPENDIX, 1 volumes, Comments: 3 copies of 1 volume Record Deficiency due on 08/24/2020. [4946070] [20-2244] (NDW) [Entered: 08/17/2020 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLANT brief of Mr. Chris Dock, Mr. Chris Holbrook, Libertarian Party, Mr. Brian McCormick and Mr. Mason McElvain submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4944895] [20-2244] (EGK) [Entered: 08/12/2020 06:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Erick G. Kaardal for Appellants Libertarian Party, Mr. Chris Holbrook, Mr. Mason McElvain, Mr. Chris Dock and Mr. Brian McCormick. [4944545] [20-2244] (JPP) [Entered: 08/12/2020 10:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Mr. Chris Dock, Mr. Chris Holbrook, Libertarian Party, Mr. Brian McCormick and Mr. Mason McElvain. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [4944413] [20-2244] (EGK) [Entered: 08/11/2020 06:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLANT brief of Mr. Chris Dock, Mr. Chris Holbrook, Libertarian Party, Mr. Brian McCormick and Mr. Mason McElvain submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4944412] [20-2244] (EGK) [Entered: 08/11/2020 06:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Nathan J. Hartshorn for Appellee Steve Simon w/service 07/17/2020 [4934835] [20-2244] (NJH) [Entered: 07/17/2020 11:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT of issues filed by Appellants Mr. Chris Dock, Mr. Chris Holbrook, Libertarian Party, Mr. Brian McCormick and Mr. Mason McElvain - w/service 07/06/2020. [4930703] [20-2244] (EGK) [Entered: 07/06/2020 04:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION of record filed by Appellants Mr. Chris Dock, Mr. Chris Holbrook, Libertarian Party, Mr. Brian McCormick and Mr. Mason McElvain. w/service 07/06/2020 [4930699] [20-2244] (EGK) [Entered: 07/06/2020 04:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMETHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Mr. Chris Dock, Mr. Chris Holbrook, Libertarian Party, Mr. Brian McCormick and Mr. Mason McElvain - Separate Appendix - w/service 07/06/2020 [4930697] [20-2244] (EGK) [Entered: 07/06/2020 04:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants Mr. Chris Dock, Mr. Chris Holbrook, Libertarian Party, Mr. Brian McCormick and Mr. Mason McElvain. - FOR CAL [4930692] [20-2244] (EGK) [Entered: 07/06/2020 04:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Erick G. Kaardal for Appellants Mr. Chris Dock, Mr. Chris Holbrook, Libertarian Party, Mr. Brian McCormick and Mr. Mason McElvain w/service 07/06/2020 [4930690] [20-2244] (EGK) [Entered: 07/06/2020 04:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 08/03/2020. Appendix due 08/11/2020. BRIEF APPELLANT, Chris Dock, Chris Holbrook, Libertarian Party, Brian McCormick and Mason McElvain due 08/11/2020 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4926020] [20-2244] (CYZ) [Entered: 06/22/2020 02:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of docket entries, order of 5/29/2020, notice of appeal [4926018] [20-2244] (CYZ) [Entered: 06/22/2020 02:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [4926014] [20-2244] (CYZ) [Entered: 06/22/2020 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathan J. Hartshorn