This case was last updated from PACER on 03/07/2019 at 07:12:54 (UTC).

Li v. Chinatown Take-Out Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/04/2019 Li filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Chinatown Take-Out Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-78

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

Guiming Shao

Shanfa Li, on behalf of himself and others similarly situated

Defendant / Appellees

Yechiel Meiteles

Chinatown Take-Out Inc., DBA China Town Take Out

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

John Troy

Attorney at John Troy & Associates, PLLC

41-25 Kissena Boulevard

Flushing, NY 11355

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Bernard Weinreb Esq.

Attorney at Bernard Weinreb, Esq.

2 Perlman Drive

Spring Valley, NY 10977

 

Court Documents

26 #2

Motion to Hold Appeal in Abeyance

26 #1

Motion Cover Sheet

#24

(#24) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Shanfa Li Brief due date as 04/09/2019. Joint Appendix due date as 04/09/2019, FILED.[2496914] [19-78] [Entered: 02/14/2019 12:36 PM]

#20

(#20) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Shanfa Li and Guiming Shao, informing Court of proposed due date 04/09/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 02/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2494394] [19-78] [Entered: 02/11/2019 08:12 PM]

#18

(#18) NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[2493817] [19-78] [Entered: 02/11/2019 12:29 PM]

#14

(#14) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Amended Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 02/12/2019, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[2482173] [19-78] [Entered: 01/25/2019 09:32 AM]

#13

(#13) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: In-Person, Scheduled Date of Conference: 02/12/2019, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[2472946] [19-78] [Entered: 01/11/2019 09:45 AM]

#10

(#10) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Shanfa Li and Guiming Shao, FILED. Service date 01/09/2019 by CM/ECF.[2471633] [19-78] [Entered: 01/09/2019 07:56 PM]

#9

(#9) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Shanfa Li and Guiming Shao, FILED. Service date 01/09/2019 by CM/ECF.[2471632] [19-78] [Entered: 01/09/2019 07:47 PM]

#8

(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Shanfa Li and Guiming Shao, FILED. Service date 01/09/2019 by CM/ECF.[2471631] [19-78] [Entered: 01/09/2019 07:40 PM]

5 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#3

(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 12/06/2018, RECEIVED.[2471196] [19-78] [Entered: 01/09/2019 02:05 PM]

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 12/04/2018, RECEIVED.[2471194] [19-78] [Entered: 01/09/2019 02:04 PM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) MOTION, to hold appeal in abeyance, on behalf of Appellant Shanfa Li and Guiming Shao, FILED. Service date 03/05/2019 by CM/ECF. [2510755] [19-78] [Entered: 03/05/2019 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Shanfa Li Brief due date as 04/09/2019. Joint Appendix due date as 04/09/2019, FILED.[2496914] [19-78] [Entered: 02/14/2019 12:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Shanfa Li and Guiming Shao, informing Court of proposed due date 04/09/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 02/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2494394] [19-78] [Entered: 02/11/2019 08:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[2493817] [19-78] [Entered: 02/11/2019 12:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE, to Appellee Chinatown Take-Out Inc. and Yechiel Meiteles, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2493270] [19-78] [Entered: 02/08/2019 05:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Amended Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 02/12/2019, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[2482173] [19-78] [Entered: 01/25/2019 09:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: In-Person, Scheduled Date of Conference: 02/12/2019, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[2472946] [19-78] [Entered: 01/11/2019 09:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Shanfa Li and Guiming Shao, FILED. Service date 01/09/2019 by CM/ECF.[2471633] [19-78] [Entered: 01/09/2019 07:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Shanfa Li and Guiming Shao, FILED. Service date 01/09/2019 by CM/ECF.[2471632] [19-78] [Entered: 01/09/2019 07:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Shanfa Li and Guiming Shao, FILED. Service date 01/09/2019 by CM/ECF.[2471631] [19-78] [Entered: 01/09/2019 07:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2471199] [19-78] [Entered: 01/09/2019 02:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • (#4) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Shanfa Li and Guiming Shao, district court receipt # ANYSDC-16137818, FILED.[2471198] [19-78] [Entered: 01/09/2019 02:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 12/06/2018, RECEIVED.[2471196] [19-78] [Entered: 01/09/2019 02:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 12/04/2018, RECEIVED.[2471194] [19-78] [Entered: 01/09/2019 02:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Shanfa Li and Guiming Shao, FILED. [2471187] [19-78] [Entered: 01/09/2019 02:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less