This case was last updated from PACER on 11/23/2019 at 05:52:44 (UTC).

LG Electronics, Inc. v. Wi-LAN Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/15/2019 a Other case was filed by LG Electronics, Inc against Wi-LAN Inc in the jurisdiction of U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1156

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit

 

Party Details

Appellants

LG ELECTRONICS, INC.

LG ELECTRONICS MOBILECOMM U.S.A., INC.

LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC.

Appellees

WI-LAN LABS, INC.

WI-LAN USA, INC.

WI-LAN INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

David L. McCombs Esq.

Attorney at Haynes & Boone, LLP

2323 Victory Avenue

Dallas, TX 75219

Appellee Attorney

Douglas R. Wilson

Attorney at Armond Wilson LLP

9442 Capital Of Texas Highway North

Austin, TX 78759

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 11/05/2019. [649600] Entry of Appearance due 12/02/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 12/02/2019. Docketing Statement due 12/02/2019. Certified List due on 12/26/2019. [TAM] [Entered: 11/15/2019 10:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.