This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/05/2022 at 06:15:59 (UTC).

Lexington Insurance Company, et al v. Cindy Smith, et al

Case Summary

On 10/06/2022 Lexington Insurance Company, filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Cindy Smith,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-35784

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY

HOMELAND INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW YORK

HALLMARK SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

ASPEN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

ASPEN INSURANCE UK LTD

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON AND LONDON MARKET COMPANIES SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO. PJ193647

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO. PJ1900131

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON AND LONDON MARKET COMPANIES SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO. PJ1933021

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NOS. PD-10364-05 AND PD-11091-00

ENDURANCE WORLDWIDE INSURANCE LIMITED T/AS SOMPO INTERNATIONAL SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO. PJ1900134-A

Defendant / Appellees

CINDY SMITH, in her official capacity as Chief Judge for the Suquamish Tribal Court

ERIC NIELSEN, in his official capacity as Chief Judge of the Suquamish Tribal Court of Appeals

BRUCE DIDESCH, in his official capacity as Judge of the Suquamish Tribal Court of Appeals

STEVEN D. AYCOCK, in his official capacity as Judge of the Suquamish Tribal Court of Appeals

Intervenor Defendant / Appellee

SUQUAMISH TRIBE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Bradley Joseph Hamburger

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

333 S Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Kenneth Oshita

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

333 S Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Daniel R. Adler

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

333 S Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Gabriel Baker

Attorney at Jensen Morse Baker PLLC

1809 Seventh Avenue, Suite 410

Seattle, WA 98101

Richard Joseph Doren

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

333 S Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Matthew Allan Hoffman

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

333 S Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Patrick James Fuster

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

333 S Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Michael E. Ricketts

Attorney at Gordon Thomas Honeywell, LLP

520 Pike Street, Suite 2350

Seattle, WA 98101

Kasie Kashimoto

Attorney at Lether Law Group

1848 Westlake Avenue, N, Suite 100

Seattle, WA 98109

Kevin J. Kay

Attorney at Lether Law Group

1848 Westlake Avenue, N, Suite 100

Seattle, WA 98109

Thomas Lether

Attorney at Lether Law Group

1848 Westlake Avenue, N, Suite 100

Seattle, WA 98109

Eric J. Neal

Attorney at Lether Law Group

1848 Westlake Avenue, N, Suite 100

Seattle, WA 98109

Robert W. Novasky

Attorney at Forsberg & Umlauf PS

1102 Broadway, Suite 510

Tacoma, WA 98402

Intervenor Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Benjamin Greenberg

Attorney at Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

701 5Th Avenue, Suite 6100

Seattle, WA 98104-7043

Timothy Ward Woolsey

Attorney at Office of Tribal Attorney

The Suquamish Tribe, P.O. Box 498

Suquamish, WA 98392

Andrew Brantingham

Attorney at Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

50 S 6Th Street, Suite 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Skip Durocher

Attorney at Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

50 S 6Th Street, Suite 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

#6

(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellants Aspen Insurance UK LTD, Aspen Specialty Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London and London Market Companies Subscribing to Policy No. PJ1933021, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London and London Market Companies Subscribing to Policy No. PJ193647, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. PJ1900131, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Nos. PD-10364-05 and PD-11091-00, Endurance Worldwide Insurance Limited T/AS Sompo International Subscribing to Policy No. PJ1900134-A, Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company, Homeland Insurance Company of New York and Lexington Insurance Company Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/13/2022. [12562413] [22-35784] (Hamburger, Bradley) [Entered: 10/13/2022 11:02 AM]

#8

(#8) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 11/03/2022, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12568483] (VS) [Entered: 10/20/2022 09:16 AM]

#9

(#9) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [12582531] (VS) [Entered: 11/08/2022 10:32 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2022
  • Docket(#13) Streamlined request [12] by Appellant Lexington Insurance Company to extend time to file the brief is approved for all Appellants. Amended briefing schedule: Appellants Aspen Insurance UK LTD, Aspen Specialty Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. PJ1900131, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Nos. PD-10364-05 and PD-11091-00, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London and London Market Companies Subscribing to Policy No. PJ1933021, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London and London Market Companies Subscribing to Policy No. PJ193647, Endurance Worldwide Insurance Limited T/AS Sompo International Subscribing to Policy No. PJ1900134-A, Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company, Homeland Insurance Company of New York and Lexington Insurance Company opening brief due 01/09/2023. Appellees Steven D. Aycock, Bruce Didesch, Eric Nielsen, Cindy Smith and Suquamish Tribe answering brief due 02/08/2023. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [12594194] (JN) [Entered: 11/22/2022 01:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • Docket(#12) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Lexington Insurance Company. New requested due date is 01/09/2023. [12591952] [22-35784] (Adler, Daniel) [Entered: 11/18/2022 08:30 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • Docket(#11) Added Attorney(s) Patrick James Fuster for party(s) Appellant Lexington Insurance Company, in case 22-35784. [12591298] (NAC) [Entered: 11/18/2022 12:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • Docket(#10) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Patrick J. Fuster (GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER LLP, 333 South Grand Avenue, Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197) for Appellant Lexington Insurance Company. Date of service: 11/18/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12591294] [22-35784] (Fuster, Patrick) [Entered: 11/18/2022 12:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [12582531] (VS) [Entered: 11/08/2022 10:32 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 11/03/2022, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12568483] (VS) [Entered: 10/20/2022 09:16 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • Docket(#7) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/13/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12562591]. [22-35784] (AD) [Entered: 10/13/2022 12:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellants Aspen Insurance UK LTD, Aspen Specialty Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London and London Market Companies Subscribing to Policy No. PJ1933021, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London and London Market Companies Subscribing to Policy No. PJ193647, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. PJ1900131, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Nos. PD-10364-05 and PD-11091-00, Endurance Worldwide Insurance Limited T/AS Sompo International Subscribing to Policy No. PJ1900134-A, Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company, Homeland Insurance Company of New York and Lexington Insurance Company Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/13/2022. [12562413] [22-35784] (Hamburger, Bradley) [Entered: 10/13/2022 11:02 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • Docket(#5) Added Attorney(s) Andrew Brantingham for party(s) Appellee Suquamish Tribe, in case 22-35784. [12559905] (NAC) [Entered: 10/11/2022 12:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Andrew Baldwin Brantingham (Dorsey & Whitney LLP, 50 South Sixth Street, Suite 1500, Minneapolis, MN 55402) for Appellee Suquamish Tribe. Date of service: 10/11/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12559897] [22-35784] (Brantingham, Andrew) [Entered: 10/11/2022 12:26 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • Docket(#3) Added Attorney(s) Skip Durocher for party(s) Appellee Suquamish Tribe, in case 22-35784. [12559885] (NAC) [Entered: 10/11/2022 12:19 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Vernle C. Durocher, Jr. (Dorsey & Whitney LLP, 50 S. 6th St., Ste. 1500, Minneapolis, MN 55402) for Appellee Suquamish Tribe. Date of service: 10/11/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12559869] [22-35784] (Durocher, Skip) [Entered: 10/11/2022 12:11 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Aspen Insurance UK LTD, Aspen Specialty Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. PJ1900131, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Nos. PD-10364-05 and PD-11091-00, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London and London Market Companies Subscribing to Policy No. PJ1933021, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London and London Market Companies Subscribing to Policy No. PJ193647, Endurance Worldwide Insurance Limited T/AS Sompo International Subscribing to Policy No. PJ1900134-A, Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company, Homeland Insurance Company of New York and Lexington Insurance Company Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/13/2022. Appellants Aspen Insurance UK LTD, Aspen Specialty Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. PJ1900131, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Nos. PD-10364-05 and PD-11091-00, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London and London Market Companies Subscribing to Policy No. PJ1933021, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London and London Market Companies Subscribing to Policy No. PJ193647, Endurance Worldwide Insurance Limited T/AS Sompo International Subscribing to Policy No. PJ1900134-A, Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company, Homeland Insurance Company of New York and Lexington Insurance Company opening brief due 12/08/2022. Appellees Steven D. Aycock, Bruce Didesch, Eric Nielsen, Cindy Smith and Suquamish Tribe answering brief due 01/09/2023. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12557545] (RT) [Entered: 10/06/2022 01:47 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less