This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/05/2020 at 05:32:43 (UTC).

Lewis v. Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 12/01/2020 Lewis filed an Other lawsuit against Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-4023

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Regina Lewis

Newburgh, NY 12550

Respondents

Orange County Department of Social Services

Dough Hovey, Chief Executive Officer

Gallagher, Social Secuirty Administrative Judge

Darcie Miller, Orange County Commissioner, LCSWR

Independent Living Inc.

Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Regina Lewis

21 Kenney Court

Newburgh, NY 12550

Respondent Attorneys

Andrew R. Kass

Attorney at Orange County District Attorney's Office

County Government Center, 255-275 Main Street

Goshen, NY 10924

Benjamin H. Torrance

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York

86 Chambers Street

New York, NY 10007

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER, dated 12/03/2020, dismissing appeal by 12/24/2020, unless Petitioner Petitioner Regina Lewis, submits a motion for leave to file, copy to pro se, FILED.[2985619] [20-4023] [Entered: 12/03/2020 10:53 AM]

#7

(#7) PAPERS, MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS ON APPEAL, RECEIVED.[2985613] [20-4023] [Entered: 12/03/2020 10:49 AM]

6 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

6 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER OF DISMISSAL, dated 11/10/2020, RECEIVED.[2985595] [20-4023] [Entered: 12/03/2020 10:40 AM]

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, and district court docket, on behalf of Petitioner Regina Lewis, RECEIVED.[2985590] [20-4023] [Entered: 12/03/2020 10:38 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER, dated 12/03/2020, dismissing appeal by 12/24/2020, unless Petitioner Petitioner Regina Lewis, submits a motion for leave to file, copy to pro se, FILED.[2985619] [20-4023] [Entered: 12/03/2020 10:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PAPERS, MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS ON APPEAL, RECEIVED.[2985613] [20-4023] [Entered: 12/03/2020 10:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2985609] [20-4023] [Entered: 12/03/2020 10:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER OF DISMISSAL, dated 11/10/2020, RECEIVED.[2985595] [20-4023] [Entered: 12/03/2020 10:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, and district court docket, on behalf of Petitioner Regina Lewis, RECEIVED.[2985590] [20-4023] [Entered: 12/03/2020 10:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Independent Living, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Social Security Administrative Record is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Regina Hollins Lewis