This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/09/2022 at 06:06:05 (UTC).

Lewis v. Greenwood Motor Lines

Case Summary

On 08/10/2022 Lewis filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Greenwood Motor Lines. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-10758

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Patrick Lewis

Defendant / Appellees

Greenwood Motor Lines, Incorporated

R&L Carriers Shared Services, L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Nichole C. Howard

Attorney at Howard Law Firm, P.L.L.C.

15018 Lakefair Drive

Richmond, TX 77406

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Sawnie A. McEntire

Attorney at Parsons McEntire McCleary, P.L.L.C.

1700 Pacific Avenue

Dallas, TX 75201

Anthony C. White

Attorney at Thompson Hine, L.L.P.

41 S. High Street

Columbus, OH 43215-3435

Jarod Douglas Bonine

Attorney at Parsons McEntire McCleary, P.L.L.C.

1 Riverway

Houston, TX 77056

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Patrick Lewis [22-10758] (AS) [Entered: 08/10/2022 12:28 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9914772-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [22-10758] (RSM) [Entered: 08/12/2022 11:30 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-10758] (Nichole C. Howard ) [Entered: 08/16/2022 05:10 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary [22-10758] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Patrick Lewis advising transcript unnecessary Date of Service: 08/16/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Howard; Attorney for Appellees: McEntire, White [22-10758] (Nichole C. Howard ) [Entered: 08/16/2022 05:15 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 10/03/2022 for Appellant Patrick Lewis. [22-10758] (MAS) [Entered: 08/22/2022 01:59 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-10758] (Sawnie A. McEntire ) [Entered: 08/23/2022 09:48 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-10758] (Jarod Douglas Bonine ) [Entered: 08/30/2022 11:03 AM]

Open Document

APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Appellee's Brief due on 11/02/2022 for Appellees Greenwood Motor Lines, Incorporated and R&L Carriers Shared Services, L.L.C. [22-10758] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. Patrick Lewis. Date of service: 10/03/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Bonine, McEntire, White; Attorney for Appellant: Howard [22-10758] (Nichole C. Howard ) [Entered: 10/03/2022 02:57 PM]

Open Document #1

Record Excerpts Filed

Open Document #2

RE-5 Electronic Filers Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORD EXCERPTS FILED. Record Excerpts NOT Sufficient as they require INSUFFICIENT FOR: COVER MUST BE CORRECTED TO STATE RECORD EXCERPTS; EXCESS PAGES. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Record Excerpts due on 10/19/2022 for Appellant Patrick Lewis [22-10758] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant Mr. Patrick Lewis. Date of service: 10/03/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Bonine, McEntire, White; Attorney for Appellant: Howard [22-10758] (Nichole C. Howard ) [Entered: 10/03/2022 04:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Appellee's Brief due on 11/02/2022 for Appellees Greenwood Motor Lines, Incorporated and R&L Carriers Shared Services, L.L.C. [22-10758] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. Patrick Lewis. Date of service: 10/03/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Bonine, McEntire, White; Attorney for Appellant: Howard [22-10758] (Nichole C. Howard ) [Entered: 10/03/2022 02:57 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Jarod Douglas Bonine for party(s) Appellee Greenwood Motor Lines, Incorporated Appellee R&L Carriers Shared Services, L.L.C., in case 22-10758 [22-10758] (RSM) [Entered: 08/30/2022 12:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-10758] (Jarod Douglas Bonine ) [Entered: 08/30/2022 11:03 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Sawnie A. McEntire for Appellee R&L Carriers Shared Services, L.L.C. in 22-10758, Attorney Sawnie A. McEntire for Appellee Greenwood Motor Lines, Incorporated in 22-10758 [22-10758] (RSM) [Entered: 08/24/2022 01:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-10758] (Sawnie A. McEntire ) [Entered: 08/23/2022 09:48 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 10/03/2022 for Appellant Patrick Lewis. [22-10758] (MAS) [Entered: 08/22/2022 01:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [22-10758] (MAS) [Entered: 08/22/2022 01:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Nichole C. Howard for Appellant Patrick Lewis in 22-10758 [22-10758] (MVM) [Entered: 08/17/2022 03:23 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary [22-10758] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Patrick Lewis advising transcript unnecessary Date of Service: 08/16/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Howard; Attorney for Appellees: McEntire, White [22-10758] (Nichole C. Howard ) [Entered: 08/16/2022 05:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-10758] (Nichole C. Howard ) [Entered: 08/16/2022 05:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 3:21-CV-1161. Electronic ROA due on 08/29/2022. [22-10758] (RSM) [Entered: 08/12/2022 11:32 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9914772-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [22-10758] (RSM) [Entered: 08/12/2022 11:30 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Patrick Lewis [22-10758] (AS) [Entered: 08/10/2022 12:28 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc., dba R+L Carriers is a litigant

Latest cases where R&L CARRIERS SHARED SERVICES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jarod Bonine(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sawnie A McEntire