This case was last updated from PACER on 05/17/2019 at 06:11:19 (UTC).

Lewis Johnson v. Secretary, Florida Department

Case Summary

On 03/18/2019 Lewis Johnson filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Secretary, Florida Department. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-11001

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

LEWIS JOHNSON

Panama City, FL 32404

Respondent / Appellee

SECRETARY, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Lewis Johnson

Attorney at Bay CF - Inmate Legal Mail

5400 Bayline Dr

Panama City, FL 32404

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Bryan G. Jordan

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

Pl-01 The Capitol

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Ashley Moody

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

Pl-01 The Capitol

Tallahassee, FL 32399

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

DKT-5 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Bryan G. Jordan for Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections. [19-11001] (ECF: Bryan Jordan) [Entered: 04/01/2019 10:22 AM]

Open Document #5

USDC Judgment- Doc #23

Open Document #3

R&R- Doc #21

Open Document

USDC MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis as to Appellant Lewis Johnson was filed on 03/18/2019. Docket Entry 26. [Entered: 03/20/2019 10:19 AM]

Open Document #2

Habeas Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #2

USDC Order denying Motion on IFP

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Lewis Johnson. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 04/05/2019 04:11 PM]

Open Document #1

DKT-6A Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

Receipt

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Lewis Johnson. [Entered: 05/03/2019 01:10 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Bryan G. Jordan for Appellee Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11001] (ECF: Bryan Jordan) [Entered: 04/01/2019 10:23 AM]

Open Document

MOTION for certificate of appealability filed by Appellant Lewis Johnson. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8727168-1] [Entered: 03/25/2019 11:38 AM]

Open Document #1

Fee Paid

Open Document

USDC order denying COA as to Appellant Lewis Johnson was filed on 03/18/2019. Docket Entry 22. [Entered: 03/20/2019 10:18 AM]

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellate fee was paid on 04/23/2019 as to Appellant Lewis Johnson. [Entered: 04/23/2019 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Lewis Johnson. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 04/05/2019 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Lewis Johnson. [Entered: 05/03/2019 01:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Bryan G. Jordan for Appellee Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11001] (ECF: Bryan Jordan) [Entered: 04/01/2019 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Bryan G. Jordan for Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections. [19-11001] (ECF: Bryan Jordan) [Entered: 04/01/2019 10:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for certificate of appealability filed by Appellant Lewis Johnson. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8727168-1] [Entered: 03/25/2019 11:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • USDC order denying IFP as to Appellant Lewis Johnson was filed on 03/21/2019. Docket Entry 29. [Entered: 03/21/2019 03:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • USDC MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis as to Appellant Lewis Johnson was filed on 03/18/2019. Docket Entry 26. [Entered: 03/20/2019 10:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • USDC order denying COA as to Appellant Lewis Johnson was filed on 03/18/2019. Docket Entry 22. [Entered: 03/20/2019 10:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HABEAS APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Lewis Johnson on 03/18/2019 USDC motion pending: Motion to proceeed IFP filed on 03/18/2019. DE# 26. Fee Status: IFP Pending. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 03/20/2019 10:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.