This case was last updated from PACER on 03/09/2019 at 06:14:36 (UTC).

Lewis Fogle v. John Sokol, et al

Case Summary

On 01/08/2019 Lewis Fogle filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against John Sokol. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1066

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

MICHAEL STEFFEE, Pennsylvania State Police Trooper

JOHN SOKOL, Pennsylvania State Police Trooper

DONALD BECHWITH, Pennsylvania State Police Trooper

GLENN WALP, Lieutenant, in their individual capacities

JOSEPH STEPHEN, Pennsylvania State Police Trooper

Defendant / Appellants

WILLIAM MARTIN, Indiana County Assistant District Attorney, in his inidividual capacity

GREGORY OLSON, Indiana County District Attorney, in his official and individual capacity

COUNTY OF INDIANA

Plaintiff / Appellee

LEWIS J. FOGLE

Defendant / Appellee

JOHN BARDROFF, Corporal

Not Classified By Court

ANDREW MOLLURA, Corporal

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Michael E. Kennedy Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

1251 Waterfront Place

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Mary L. Friedline Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

1251 Waterfront Place

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Michael R. Lettrich Esq.

Attorney at JonesPassodelis

707 Grant Street, Gulf Tower, Suite 3410

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Maria N. Pipak Esq.

Attorney at JonesPassodelis

707 Grant Street, Gulf Tower, Suite 3410

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Marie M. Jones Esq.

Attorney at JonesPassodelis

707 Grant Street, Gulf Tower, Suite 3410

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Thomas J. Farrell Esq.

Attorney at Farrell & Reisinger

300 Koppers Building, 436 Seventh Avenue, Suite 300

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Peter J. Neufeld Esq.

Attorney at Neufeld Scheck & Brustin

99 Hudson Street, 8Th Floor

New York, NY 10013

Mary K. McCarthy Esq.

Attorney at Neufeld Scheck & Brustin

99 Hudson Street, 8Th Floor

New York, NY 10013

Len H. Kamdang Esq.

Attorney at Neufeld Scheck & Brustin

99 Hudson Street, 8Th Floor

New York, NY 10013

Emma K. Freudenberger Esq.

Attorney at Neufeld Scheck & Brustin

99 Hudson Street, 8Th Floor

New York, NY 10013

Anna Benvenutti Hoffmann Esq.

Attorney at Neufeld Scheck & Brustin

99 Hudson Street, 8Th Floor

New York, NY 10013

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

District Court Order

Open Document #1

Notice of Appeal

Open Document #6

Case Opening Letter

Open Document #5

Standing Order Excess Pagination

Open Document #4

Case Caption

Open Document #3

District Court Opinion

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Marie Milie Jones on behalf of Appellant(s) Gregory Olson, William Martin, County of Indiana, Pennsylvania. [19-1066] (MMJ) [Entered: 01/18/2019 09:27 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants William Martin, Gregory Olson and County of Indiana, filed. [19-1066] (MMJ) [Entered: 01/18/2019 09:29 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants County of Indiana, William Martin and Gregory Olson, received. [19-1066] (MMJ) [Entered: 01/18/2019 09:31 AM]

Open Document #1

Briefing Notice Issued

Open Document #2

Briefing and Scheduling Order

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Maria N. Pipak on behalf of Appellant(s) Gregory Olson, William Martin, County of Indiana, Pennsylvania. [19-1066] (MNP) [Entered: 02/06/2019 11:42 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Len Kamdang on behalf of Appellee(s) Lewis Fogle. [19-1066] (EKF) [Entered: 01/30/2019 10:10 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Mary Katherine McCarthy on behalf of Appellee(s) Lewis Fogle. [19-1066] (EKF) [Entered: 01/30/2019 10:09 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Thomas J. Farrell on behalf of Appellee(s) Lewis Fogle. [19-1066] (TJF) [Entered: 01/28/2019 09:33 AM]

Open Document

NONCOMPLIANCE Order sent to Appellee Mr. Lewis J. Fogle requesting Attorney must become admitted to the bar and then register as an elctronic public filer.. Compliance due 02/01/2019. (SB) [Entered: 01/25/2019 03:55 PM]

Open Document

NONCOMPLIANCE Order sent to Appellee Mr. Lewis J. Fogle requesting Attorney must become admitted to the bar and then register as an electroinic public filer.. Compliance due 02/01/2019. (SB) [Entered: 01/25/2019 03:46 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Len Hong Kamdang on behalf of Appellee(s) Lewis Fogle. [19-1066] (EKF) [Entered: 01/25/2019 03:34 PM]

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants County of Indiana, William Martin and Gregory Olson due on or before 03/25/2019. Appendix due on or before 03/25/2019. (SB) [Entered: 02/13/2019 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Maria N. Pipak on behalf of Appellant(s) Gregory Olson, William Martin, County of Indiana, Pennsylvania. [19-1066] (MNP) [Entered: 02/06/2019 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Len Kamdang on behalf of Appellee(s) Lewis Fogle. [19-1066] (EKF) [Entered: 01/30/2019 10:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Mary Katherine McCarthy on behalf of Appellee(s) Lewis Fogle. [19-1066] (EKF) [Entered: 01/30/2019 10:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Thomas J. Farrell on behalf of Appellee(s) Lewis Fogle. [19-1066] (TJF) [Entered: 01/28/2019 09:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NONCOMPLIANCE Order sent to Appellee Mr. Lewis J. Fogle requesting Attorney must become admitted to the bar and then register as an elctronic public filer.. Compliance due 02/01/2019. (SB) [Entered: 01/25/2019 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NONCOMPLIANCE Order sent to Appellee Mr. Lewis J. Fogle requesting Attorney must become admitted to the bar and then register as an electroinic public filer.. Compliance due 02/01/2019. (SB) [Entered: 01/25/2019 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Len Hong Kamdang on behalf of Appellee(s) Lewis Fogle. [19-1066] (EKF) [Entered: 01/25/2019 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Mary Katherine McCarthy on behalf of Appellee(s) Lewis Fogle. [19-1066] (EKF) [Entered: 01/25/2019 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Anna Benvenutti Hoffmann on behalf of Appellee(s) Lewis Fogle. [19-1066] (EKF) [Entered: 01/25/2019 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Emma Freudenberger on behalf of Appellee(s) Lewis Fogle. [19-1066] (EKF) [Entered: 01/25/2019 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOLLOW UP LETTER to Mary L. Friedline, Esq. for Glenn Walp requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 02/07/2019. (SB) [Entered: 01/24/2019 10:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOLLOW UP LETTER to Michael E. Kennedy, Esq. for John Sokol, Michael Steffee, Donald Bechwith, Joseph Stephen and Andrew Mollura requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 02/07/2019. (SB) [Entered: 01/24/2019 10:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOLLOW UP LETTER to Thomas J. Farrell, Esq. for Mr. Lewis J. Fogle, Emma K. Freudenberger, Esq. for Mr. Lewis J. Fogle, Len H. Kamdang, Esq. for Mr. Lewis J. Fogle, Mary K. McCarthy, Esq. for Mr. Lewis J. Fogle and Peter J. Neufeld, Esq. for Mr. Lewis J. Fogle requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 02/07/2019. (SB) [Entered: 01/24/2019 10:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants County of Indiana, William Martin and Gregory Olson advising this court that no transcripts are available. [19-1066] (MMJ) [Entered: 01/18/2019 09:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants County of Indiana, William Martin and Gregory Olson, received. [19-1066] (MMJ) [Entered: 01/18/2019 09:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants William Martin, Gregory Olson and County of Indiana, filed. [19-1066] (MMJ) [Entered: 01/18/2019 09:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Marie Milie Jones on behalf of Appellant(s) Gregory Olson, William Martin, County of Indiana, Pennsylvania. [19-1066] (MMJ) [Entered: 01/18/2019 09:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (SB) [Entered: 01/08/2019 10:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants County of Indiana, William Martin and Gregory Olson in District Court No. 2-17-cv-00194. (SB) [Entered: 01/08/2019 10:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.