This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/12/2021 at 06:12:44 (UTC).

Lewis, et al v. City of Edmond, et al

Case Summary

On 07/14/2021 Lewis filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Edmond. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-6081

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendants

CITY OF EDMOND, an Oklahoma municipal corporation

POLICE SGT. MILO BOX

Plaintiff / Appellees

VICKY JO. LEWIS, individually and as co-Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF ISAIAH MARK LEWIS, deceased;

TROY LEVET LEWIS, individually and as co-Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF ISAIAH MARK LEWIS, deceased

Defendant / Appellant

POLICE OFFICER DENTON SCHERMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Cody J. Cooper

Attorney at Phillips Murrah

101 North Robinson Avenue, Corporate Tower, 13Th Floor

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Kathryn D. Terry

Attorney at Phillips Murrah

101 North Robinson Avenue, Corporate Tower, 13Th Floor

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Benjamin Taylor Clark

Attorney at Hornbeek Vitali & Braun

3711 North Classen Boulevard

Oklahoma City, OK 73118

Richard E. Hornbeek Esq.

Attorney at Hornbeek Vitali & Braun

3711 North Classen Boulevard

Oklahoma City, OK 73118

Catherine Louise Campbell

Attorney at Phillips Murrah

101 North Robinson Avenue, Corporate Tower, 13Th Floor

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Laurie Lea Schweinle

Attorney at Phillips Murrah

101 North Robinson Avenue, Corporate Tower, 13Th Floor

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Easha Anand

Attorney at Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center

2443 Fillmore Street, Suite 380-15875

San Francisco, CA 94115

Daniel M. Greenfield

Attorney at Northwestern University

375 East Chicago Avenue, 8Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60611

Geoffrey Tabor

Attorney at Ward & Glass

1601 36Th Avenue Nw, Suite 100

Norman, OK 73072

David James Batton

Attorney at Law Office of David J. Batton

P.O. Box 1285

Norman, OK 73070

Woodrow K. Glass Esq.

Attorney at Ward & Glass

1601 36Th Avenue Nw, Suite 100

Norman, OK 73072

Carlton Odim

Attorney at Action Injury Law Group

191 North Wacker Drive, Suite 2300

Chicago, IL 60606

Andrew Martin Stroth

Attorney at Action Injury Law Group

191 North Wacker Drive, Suite 2300

Chicago, IL 60606

Geoffrey A. Tabor

1601 36Th Avenue Nw, Suite 100

Norman, OK 73072

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

ADDENDUM: District Court Order Filed July 6, 2021

Open Document #1

Opening Brief

Open Document

Open Document #3

Volume 3

Open Document #2

Volume 2

Open Document #1

Volume 1

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #2

Mediation Contact Form

Open Document #1

Mediation Conference Notice

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2021
  • Docket[10855095] Paper copies of appellant's brief and appendix received from Denton Scherman. [21-6081] [Entered: 09/02/2021 01:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • Docket[10854655] Minute order filed - Appellant's brief and appendix is accepted for filing. Paper copies shall be filed with the court by 9/9/21. All copies must be exact replicas of the electronic filings, including all attachments and number of volumes filed for appendices. Appellee's brief due 10/01/2021 for Vicky Jo. Lewis and Troy Levet Lewis. (Text Only - No Attachment) [21-6081] [Entered: 09/01/2021 09:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10854647] Appellant/Petitioner's brief filed by Denton Scherman. Served on 09/01/2021 by email. Oral argument requested? Yes. Word/page count: 6128. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [21-6081] CLC [Entered: 09/01/2021 09:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10854604] Notice of appellant's deficient brief received from Denton Scherman. See attached letter for specifics. Appellant's brief due on 09/07/2021 for Denton Scherman. [21-6081] [Entered: 09/01/2021 07:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10854566] Appellant's appendix filed by Denton Scherman. Total number of volumes filed: 3. Served on 08/31/2021. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [21-6081] CLC [Entered: 08/31/2021 04:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketThis entry has been removed from the docket. [KLP] Refiled. [10854537] Appellant/Petitioner's brief filed by Denton Scherman. Served on 08/31/2021 by email. Oral argument requested? Yes. Word/page count: 6128. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [21-6081]--[Edited 09/01/2021 by KLP - cited as deficient.] CLC [Entered: 08/31/2021 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10848261] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Geoffrey Tabor for Vicky Jo. Lewis and Mr. Troy Levet Lewis. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 08/04/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-6081] [Entered: 08/04/2021 01:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • Docket[10848253] Entry of appearance submitted by Geoffrey A. Tabor for Appellees Mr. Troy Levet Lewis and Vicky Jo. Lewis for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 08/04/2021. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 08/04/2021 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 08/04/21][21-6081] GT [Entered: 08/04/2021 12:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10846562] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Carlton Odim and Mr. Andrew Martin Stroth for Vicky Jo. Lewis and Mr. Troy Levet Lewis. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/27/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-6081] [Entered: 07/27/2021 04:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • Docket[10846518] Entry of appearance submitted by Andrew M. Stroth and Carlton Odim for Appellees Mr. Troy Levet Lewis and Vicky Jo. Lewis for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/27/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-6081]--[Edited 07/27/2021 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 7/27/21.] CO [Entered: 07/27/2021 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2021
  • Docket[10844311] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 07/23/2021 for Carmelita Reeder Shinn. (Text Only - No Attachment) [21-6081] [Entered: 07/16/2021 02:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10844306] Notice received from Denton Scherman that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 07/16/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-6081] KDT [Entered: 07/16/2021 02:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10844303] Docketing statement filed by Denton Scherman. Served on 07/16/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-6081] KDT [Entered: 07/16/2021 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketThis entry has been removed from the docket. Duplicate - previously filed. [DD] [10844302] Entry of appearance submitted by Kathryn D. Terry for Appellant Denton Scherman for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 07/16/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-6081] KDT [Entered: 07/16/2021 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10844295] Entry of appearance filed by Kathryn D. Terry for Denton Scherman. Box. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (Previously disclosed.). Served on 07/16/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-6081] [Entered: 07/16/2021 02:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10844291] Entry of appearance filed by Catherine Louise Campbell for Denton Scherman. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 07/16/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-6081] [Entered: 07/16/2021 02:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • Docket[10844285] Entry of appearance submitted by Catherine L. Campbell for Appellant Denton Scherman for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 07/16/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-6081] --[Edited 07/16/2021 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] CLC [Entered: 07/16/2021 02:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • Docket[10844284] Entry of appearance submitted by Cody J. Cooper for Appellant Denton Scherman for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 07/15/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-6081]--[Edited 07/16/2021 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 7/16/21.] CJC [Entered: 07/16/2021 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • Docket[10844279] Entry of appearance submitted by Kathryn Denise Terry for Appellant Denton Scherman for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 07/16/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-6081]--[Edited 07/16/2021 by DJD. removed PDF as pleading filed 7/16/21] KDT [Entered: 07/16/2021 01:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10843570] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/14/2021 Docketing statement due 07/28/2021 for Denton Scherman. Transcript order form due 07/28/2021 for Denton Scherman. Notice of appearance due on 07/28/2021 for Troy Levet Lewis, Vicky Jo. Lewis and Denton Scherman. [21-6081] [Entered: 07/14/2021 09:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kathryn D Terry

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin Taylor Clark

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cody Jarrett Cooper

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard E Hornbeek