This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/16/2020 at 06:10:40 (UTC).

Level Sleep LLC v. Sleep Number Corporation

Case Summary

On 04/17/2020 Level Sleep LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Sleep Number Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1718

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

LEVEL SLEEP LLC

Defendant / Appellees

SELECT COMFORT RETAIL CORPORATION

SLEEP NUMBER CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Laura Pedersen

Attorney at Farella Braun & Martel LLP

235 Montgomery Street

San Francisco, CA 94104

James L. Day Esq. Jr.

Attorney at Farella Braun Martel LLP

235 Montgomery Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Mathias Wetzstein Samuel

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C.

60 South Sixth Street, 3200 Rbc Plaza

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Conrad Gosen

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C.

60 South Sixth Street, 3200 Rbc Plaza

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Robert P. Courtney

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C.

60 South Sixth Street, 3200 Rbc Plaza

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Civil case docketed

1 #3

Confidential Order

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docketing Statement for the Appellees Select Comfort Retail Corporation and Sleep Number Corporation. Service: 05/01/2020 by email. [691585] [20-1718] [Mathias Samuel] [Entered: 05/01/2020 10:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certificate of Interest for Appellees Select Comfort Retail Corporation and Sleep Number Corporation. Service: 05/01/2020 by email. [691582] [20-1718] [Mathias Samuel] [Entered: 05/01/2020 10:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Entry of appearance for Laura K. Pedersen as of counsel for Appellant Level Sleep LLC. Service: 04/21/2020 by email. [688950] [20-1718] [Laura Pedersen] [Entered: 04/21/2020 06:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Level Sleep LLC. Service: 04/21/2020 by email. [688948] [20-1718] [James Day] [Entered: 04/21/2020 05:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Level Sleep LLC. Service: 04/21/2020 by email. [688922] [20-1718] [James Day] [Entered: 04/21/2020 04:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Entry of appearance for James L. Day as principal counsel for Appellant Level Sleep LLC. Service: 04/21/2020 by email. [688917] [20-1718] [James Day] [Entered: 04/21/2020 04:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Entry of appearance for Conrad A. Gosen as of counsel for Appellees Select Comfort Retail Corporation and Sleep Number Corporation. Service: 04/20/2020 by email. [688381] [20-1718] [Conrad Gosen] [Entered: 04/20/2020 03:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Entry of appearance for Robert P. Courtney as of counsel for Appellees Select Comfort Retail Corporation and Sleep Number Corporation. Service: 04/20/2020 by email. [688376] [20-1718] [Robert Courtney] [Entered: 04/20/2020 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for Mathias W. Samuel as principal counsel for Appellees Select Comfort Retail Corporation and Sleep Number Corporation. Service: 04/20/2020 by email. [688373] [20-1718] [Mathias Samuel] [Entered: 04/20/2020 03:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 04/13/2020. [687900] Entry of Appearance is due 05/01/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 05/01/2020. Docketing Statement is due 05/01/2020. Appellant's brief is due 06/16/2020. [LMN] [Entered: 04/17/2020 02:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEVEL SLEEP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SELECT COMFORT RETAIL CORPORATION AKA SLEEP NUMBER A FOREIGN CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mathias Wetzstein Samuel

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert P. Courtney