This case was last updated from PACER on 04/06/2019 at 06:03:38 (UTC).

Lester J. Babino, Jr. v. United States, et al

Case Summary

On 02/05/2019 Lester J Babino, Jr filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against United States. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1243

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Arch Ins

Sioux Falls, South Dakota Department of Veterans Affairs

Janssen and Son

South Dakota Department of Labor

Peoplease Corp.

South Dakota State Bar

South Dakota Medical Board

United States

Plaintiff / Appellant

Lester J. Babino, Jr.

Mansura, LA 71350

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Lester J. Babino Jr.

1918 Escude Street, P.O. Box 747

Mansura, LA 71350

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document #2

Envelope

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4753400] [19-1243] (CYZ) [Entered: 02/05/2019 03:17 PM]

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Restricted Document #3

ProSe NDA

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, order of 12/21/2018, judgment of 12/21/2018 [4753396] [19-1243] (CYZ) [Entered: 02/05/2019 03:17 PM]

Open Restricted Document #1

Pro se document of medical examiners certificate

Open Document #1

ProSe Docketing Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCUMENT FILED - Providing copy of Medical Examiners Certificate date 5/2/2007 filed by Mr. Lester J. Babino, Jr.. w/service 03/12/2019. [4765796] [19-1243] (CMH) [Entered: 03/12/2019 03:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4753400] [19-1243] (CYZ) [Entered: 02/05/2019 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, order of 12/21/2018, judgment of 12/21/2018 [4753396] [19-1243] (CYZ) [Entered: 02/05/2019 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case docketed. [4753389] [19-1243] (CYZ) [Entered: 02/05/2019 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.